Morrison v. Harris Health System
Plaintiff: Nelwyn Morrison and James Routt
Defendant: Harris County Hospital District doing business as Harris Health System
Case Number: 4:2024cv05109
Filed: December 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Renu Tandale on behalf of Harris County Hospital District, filed. (Tandale, Renu)
February 10, 2025 Filing 10 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Harris County Hospital District, filed. (Ramirez, Daniel)
February 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for FLSA. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified. (gmh4)
February 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference with the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 3/28/2025 at 11:20 AM by video before Judge Lee H Rosenthal. ***The Zoom information can be located on Judge Rosenthal's home page, at the bottom of the page, in the Interactive calendar link. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified. (gmh4)
February 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. For the reason stated, the motion to dismiss is dismissed as moot #3 . (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified. (gmh4)
January 27, 2025 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Breach of Contract Claims, filed by James Routt, Nelwyn Morrison. (Foty, Don)
January 27, 2025 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by James Routt, Nelwyn Morrison. (Foty, Don)
January 6, 2025 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Harris County Hospital District, filed. (Ramirez, Daniel)
January 6, 2025 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Breach of Contract Claims by Harris County Hospital District, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/27/2025. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Ramirez, Daniel)
December 31, 2024 Filing 2 CLERKS NOTICE Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Parties notified, filed. (bmn4)
December 31, 2024 Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo randomly selected to receive referrals. The selected Magistrate Judge is not assigned to this case until a District Judge refers the case or a motion or the parties consent to jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Once a referral has been made, the name of the referral judge will appear at the top of the docket sheet. (bmn4)
December 30, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2024-52148 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-32687827) filed by Harris Health System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Ramirez, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison v. Harris Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelwyn Morrison
Represented By: Don J Foty
Represented By: David Wayne Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Routt
Represented By: Don J Foty
Represented By: David Wayne Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris County Hospital District doing business as Harris Health System
Represented By: Daniel N Ramirez
Represented By: Renu Tandale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?