U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee v. Lightner et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee
Defendant: Leslie R Lightner, Oscar Lightner, Oscar N Lightner, Dr. Oscar Lightner, First Lan Corporation f/k/a Advantage Medical Supply, International Bancshares Corporation a/k/a Commerce Bank, WRI Trautmann, L.P., Commerce Bank, Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Servic, Unifund CCR, LLC, YP Advertising, L.P. f/k/a At&t Advertising, L.P. f/k/a YP Texas Region Yellow Pages, LLC f/k/a Southwestern Bell Yellow Pages, Inc., International Bancshares Corporation, Medheads, Inc. d/b/a Healthcare Solutions Consulting, Physician Sales & Service Limited Partnership and Professional Performance Development Group, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv00103
Filed: May 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Laredo Office
County: Webb
Presiding Judge: Marina Garcia Marmolejo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Moha P. Yepuri on behalf of Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Servic, filed. (Yepuri, Moha)
August 16, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Voluntary Partial Dismissal without Prejudice by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark)
August 13, 2019 Filing 72 Service Member Declaration by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
August 13, 2019 Filing 71 BILL OF COSTS in total amount $2471.15 by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
August 12, 2019 Filing 70 FINAL JUDGMENT (Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(dmorales, 5)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(dmorales, 5)
April 25, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of attorney substitution by Oscar N Lightner. Attorney Alison White Haynes terminated, filed. (DeWood, Nizar)
February 15, 2019 Filing 67 AMENDED ANSWER to #65 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Commerce Bank, International Bancshares Corporation, filed. (Bartek, Diann)
February 12, 2019 Filing 66 ANSWER to #65 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Leslie R Lightner, filed.(DeWood, Nizar)
January 17, 2019 Filing 65 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee.(dmorales, 5)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Leave to File its Second Amended Complaint. Additionally, #54 Plaintiff sought to abate consideration of its summary judgment motion until such time as the Court rules on the Motion for Leave to Amend. As this order renders the Motion to Abate moot.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified.(gsalinas, 5)
December 26, 2018 Filing 63 REPLY in Support of #52 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee. (Cronenwett, Mark)
December 26, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of No Response re: #54 MOTION to Abate by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed. (Cronenwett, Mark)
December 19, 2018 Filing 61 JOINDER in #60 Response in Opposition to Motion , filed by Oscar N Lightner. (Haynes, Alison)
December 19, 2018 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition to #52 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, filed by Commerce Bank, International Bancshares Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bartek, Diann)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/18/2018.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified.(gsalinas, 5)
December 11, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of No Opposition to Motion to Permit Late Filing of Response by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed. (Cronenwett, Mark)
December 10, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION for Extension of Time Filing of Response by Oscar N Lightner, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeWood, Nizar)
December 10, 2018 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee. (Cronenwett, Mark)
December 7, 2018 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition to #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Oscar N Lightner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(DeWood, Nizar)
November 28, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION to Abate by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark)
November 28, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Military Service by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed. (Cronenwett, Mark)
November 28, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Plaintiffs #33 Motion for Default Judgment and #34 Motion for Leave to File Supplement to its First Amended Complaint are DENIED without prejudice and subject to refiling, and #48 Defendants Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Late Filed Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(gsalinas, 5)
November 20, 2018 Filing 50 REPLY in Support of #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee. (Cronenwett, Mark)
November 12, 2018 Filing 49 RESPONSE to #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Commerce Bank, International Bancshares Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Long, Jeana)
October 29, 2018 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Late Filed Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Commerce Bank, International Bancshares Corporation, Oscar N Lightner, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Long, Jeana)
October 26, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of No Response by Defendants to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed. (Cronenwett, Mark)
October 3, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Nizar A. DeWood on behalf of Oscar N Lightner, filed. (DeWood, Nizar)
October 1, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark)
October 1, 2018 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT of Non Military Affidavit, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
September 11, 2018 Filing 43 REPLY in Support of #33 MOTION for Default Judgment against First Lan Corporation f/k/a Advantage Medical Supply, Leslie R Lightner, Medheads, Inc. d/b/a Healthcare Solutions Consulting, Physician Sales & Service Limited Partnership, Professional Performance Development G, filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee. (Cronenwett, Mark)
September 11, 2018 Filing 42 REPLY in Support of #34 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to First Amended Complaint, filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee. (Cronenwett, Mark)
September 5, 2018 Filing 41 JOINDER in #39 Response, , filed by Commerce Bank, International Bancshares Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bartek, Diann)
September 4, 2018 Filing 40 PROPOSED ORDER re: #39 Response,, filed.(Haynes, Alison)
September 4, 2018 Filing 39 RESPONSE to #32 Request for Entry of Default,, , filed by Oscar N Lightner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 1C, #4 Exhibit 2B, #5 Exhibit 2C, #6 Exhibit 2D, #7 Exhibit 2E, #8 Exhibit 2F, #9 Exhibit 3A, #10 Exhibit 3C, #11 Exhibit 3D, #12 Exhibit 3E)(Haynes, Alison)
September 4, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition to #34 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to First Amended Complaint, filed by Commerce Bank, International Bancshares Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bartek, Diann)
September 4, 2018 Filing 37 PROPOSED ORDER re: #36 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed.(Haynes, Alison)
September 4, 2018 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition to #34 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to First Amended Complaint, filed by Oscar N Lightner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 1C, #4 Exhibit 2A, #5 Exhibit 2B, #6 Exhibit 2C, #7 Exhibit 2D, #8 Exhibit 2E, #9 Exhibit 2F, #10 Exhibit 3A, #11 Exhibit 3B, #12 Exhibit 3C, #13 Exhibit 3D, #14 Exhibit 3E)(Haynes, Alison)
August 13, 2018 Filing 35 SUPPLEMENT to #4 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
August 13, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to First Amended Complaint by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark)
August 13, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for Default Judgment against First Lan Corporation f/k/a Advantage Medical Supply, Leslie R Lightner, Medheads, Inc. d/b/a Healthcare Solutions Consulting, Physician Sales & Service Limited Partnership, Professional Performance Development Group, Inc., YP Advertising, L.P. f/k/a At&t Advertising, L.P. f/k/a YP Texas Region Yellow Pages, LLC f/k/a Southwestern Bell Yellow Pages, Inc. by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark)
August 13, 2018 Filing 32 REQUEST for Entry of Default against First Lan Corporation f/k/a Advantage Medical Supply, Leslie R Lightner, Medheads, Inc. d/b/a Healthcare Solutions Consulting, Physician Sales & Service Limited Partnership, Professional Performance Development Group, Inc., YP Advertising, L.P. f/k/a At&t Advertising, L.P. f/k/a YP Texas Region Yellow Pages, LLC f/k/a Southwestern Bell Yellow Pages, Inc. by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark)
August 13, 2018 Filing 31 ADVISORY by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Plaintiff is ORDERED to file, by no later than August 13, 2018, an Advisory explaining the current status of this litigation.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified.(gsalinas, 5)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying #26 MOTION Amended Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Partial Judgment as to Defendant Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Service by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(gsalinas, 5)
May 2, 2018 Filing 28 REPLY in Support of #26 MOTION Amened Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Partial Judgment as to Defendant Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Service, filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Modric, Stephen)
April 18, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #25 Order,, and Objection to Amended Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Partial Judgment as to Defendant Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Service [Doc No. 26], filed by Commerce Bank, International Bancshares Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bartek, Diann)
March 28, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION Amened Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Partial Judgment as to Defendant Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Service by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER If Plaintiff and the IRS wish to pursue #22 Joint MOTION Entry of Agreed Partial Judgment as to Defendant Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Service they must brief the Court on (1) whether the agreement represents a reasonable factual and legal determination based on facts in the record, and (2) whether entering the judgment would unreasonably affect third parties. Such briefing shall be filed by 3/28/2018. All other Defendants may respond to Plaintiff and the IRS's brief by 4/18/2018. (Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(nortiz, 5)
February 28, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Commerce Bank, International Bancshares Corporation, filed.(Bartek, Diann)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by International Bancshares Corporation, Commerce Bank and #14 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of a Required Party.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(gsalinas, 5)
January 31, 2018 Filing 22 Joint MOTION Entry of Agreed Partial Judgment as to Defendant Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Service by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Cronenwett, Mark)
January 22, 2018 Filing 21 RETURN of Service, filed.(Modric, Stephen)
January 10, 2018 Filing 20 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Servic served on 6/22/2017, answer due 7/13/2017, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Modric, Stephen)
October 6, 2017 Filing 19 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to YP Advertising, L.P. f/k/a At&t Advertising, L.P. f/k/a YP Texas Region Yellow Pages, LLC f/k/a Southwestern Bell Yellow Pages, Inc. served on 10/2/2017, answer due 10/23/2017, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
September 26, 2017 Filing 18 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Oscar N Lightner, filed.(Haynes, Alison)
September 20, 2017 Summons Issued as to YP Texas Region Yellow Pages, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dmorales, 5)
September 19, 2017 Filing 17 Request for Issuance of Summons as to YP Advertising, L.P. f/k/a At&t Advertising, L.P. f/k/a YP Texas Region Yellow Pages, LLC f/k/a Southwestern Bell Yellow Pages, Inc., filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
September 13, 2017 Filing 16 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Oscar N Lightner served on 9/6/2017, answer due 9/27/2017, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
August 25, 2017 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #14 Objections , filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Modric, Stephen)
August 18, 2017 Filing 14 OBJECTIONS to #12 Notice of Dismissal and Motion to Strike, filed by Commerce Bank, International Bancshares Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bartek, Diann)
August 16, 2017 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss #4 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Modric, Stephen)
August 4, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Unifund CCR, LLC by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Modric, Stephen)
July 26, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss #4 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by International Bancshares Corporation, Commerce Bank, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bartek, Diann)
July 21, 2017 Filing 10 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by WRI Trautmann, L.P., filed.(Ramos, Donato)
July 20, 2017 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to First Lan Corporation f/k/a Advantage Medical Supply served on 6/26/2017, answer due 7/17/2017; Professional Performance Development Group, Inc. served on 6/26/2017, answer due 7/17/2017, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Cronenwett, Mark)
July 14, 2017 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to International Bancshares Corporation a/k/a Commerce Bank served on 7/5/2017, answer due 7/26/2017; Medheads, Inc. d/b/a Healthcare Solutions Consulting served on 6/24/2017, answer due 7/17/2017; WRI Trautmann, L.P. served on 6/30/2017, answer due 7/21/2017, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(Cronenwett, Mark)
June 28, 2017 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Physician Sales & Service Limited Partnership served on 6/23/2017, answer due 7/14/2017; Unifund CCR, LLC served on 6/23/2017, answer due 7/14/2017, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Modric, Stephen)
June 21, 2017 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Leslie R Lightner served on 6/6/2017, answer due 6/27/2017, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
June 15, 2017 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(vcantu, 5)
June 14, 2017 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Professional Performance Development Group, Inc., Physician Sales & Service Limited Partnership, First Lan Corporation f/k/a Advantage Medical Supply, YP Advertising, L.P. f/k/a At&t Advertising, L.P. f/k/a YP Texas Region Yellow Pages, LLC f/k/a Southwestern Bell Yellow Pages, Inc., WRI Trautmann, L.P., Medheads, Inc. d/b/a Healthcare Solutions Consulting, Unifund CCR, LLC, International Bancshares Corporation a/k/a Commerce Bank, Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Servic, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Cronenwett, Mark)
June 14, 2017 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Leslie R Lightner, Oscar N Lightner filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee.(Cronenwett, Mark)
May 18, 2017 Summons Issued as to Leslie R Lightner, Oscar N Lightner. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(vcantu, 5)
May 17, 2017 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Leslie R Lightner, Oscar Lightner, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Cronenwett, Mark)
May 17, 2017 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
May 17, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Leslie R Lightner, Oscar Lightner (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-18384259) filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee v. Lightner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Modric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie R Lightner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar Lightner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar N Lightner
Represented By: Nizar Amin DeWood
Represented By: Alison White Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Oscar Lightner
Represented By: Nizar Amin DeWood
Represented By: Alison White Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Lan Corporation f/k/a Advantage Medical Supply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Bancshares Corporation a/k/a Commerce Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WRI Trautmann, L.P.
Represented By: Donato D Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerce Bank
Represented By: Jeana Rae Long
Represented By: Diann Marie Bartek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Servic
Represented By: Moha Pradhan Yepuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unifund CCR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YP Advertising, L.P. f/k/a At&t Advertising, L.P. f/k/a YP Texas Region Yellow Pages, LLC f/k/a Southwestern Bell Yellow Pages, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Bancshares Corporation
Represented By: Jeana Rae Long
Represented By: Diann Marie Bartek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medheads, Inc. d/b/a Healthcare Solutions Consulting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physician Sales & Service Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Performance Development Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?