USA v. ONE 1973 SHRIMP BOAT "LINDA LABIN" DOC#547803 HULL#7437666
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: ONE 1973 SHRIMP BOAT "LINDA LABIN" DOC#547803 HULL#7437666
Case Number: 5:2018cv00112
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Laredo Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: John A Kazen
Referring Judge: Diana Saldana
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 CLAIM TO THE RES AND APPEARANCE filed by ONE 1973 SHRIMP BOAT "LINDA LABIN" DOC#547803 HULL#7437666.(Sanchez, Dennis)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 RETURN of Service Executed as to 1973 Shrimp Boat "Linda Labin" on 8/23/2018 re: Warrant of Arrest In REM, filed.(bmendoza, 5)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by USA, filed.(Smyth, Mary)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ONE 1973 SHRIMP BOAT "LINDA LABIN" DOC#547803 HULL#7437666 filed by USA.(Smyth, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. ONE 1973 SHRIMP BOAT "LINDA LABIN" DOC#547803 HULL#7437666
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Mary Ellen Smyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE 1973 SHRIMP BOAT "LINDA LABIN" DOC#547803 HULL#7437666
Represented By: Dennis M Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?