Dizdarevic et al v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company

Plaintiff: Asim Dizdarevic, MTM Transportation and MTN Transportation, Inc.
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company and The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00005
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marina Garcia Marmolejo
Referring Judge: Diana Song Quiroga
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. INITIAL PRETRIAL AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 2/27/2019. Plaintiffs appeared through counsel Paul Clarence Murphy, IV. Defendant appeared through counsel Alexcis Nell and Jack Edward Little, Jr. The Court began by summarizing the procedural history of the case and noted the Parties intent to file a motion for transfer to Houston. Both Counsel believe that since they are located in Houston, it will be more convenient if the case is transferred to a court there. As to the convenience of Counsel, the Court emphasized its willingness to accommodate them by allowing telephonic pretrial appearances. The motion to transfer will be ruled upon by the District Court. As such, Counsel should address the effect of transfer on the convenience of witnesses. Additionally, Counsel should show why transfer to Houston would advance the interests of justice given that the allegedly faulty auto repair took place in Laredo and the accident allegedly occurred south of Dallas. The Court set a two-week deadline of March 13, 2019, for the Parties to either file a motion for transfer or file an advisory if they plan to stay in Laredo. The Court thanked the Parties for their participation today and ended the conference. Telephonic Appearances: Attorneys: Paul Clarence Murphy, IV f/PLAINTIFFS; Attorney: Alexcis Nell and Jack Edward Little, Jr. f/DEFENDANT. (9:07 - 9:19) (ERO: Mayra Ramirez) (IBruce, 5)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, filed.(Little, Jack)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, filed.(Little, Jack)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/27/2019 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified.(dmorales, 5)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 111th JD Webb County TX, case number 2018-CVF-002366D2 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21620661) filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Case Summary, #3 Exhibit 3 - Original Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Original Answer, #5 Exhibit 5 - Process orders served on GY, #6 Exhibit 6 - List of all counsel, #7 Exhibit 7 - Index of Matters filed under local rule 81, #8 Exhibit 8 - Notice of filing notice of removal)(Little, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dizdarevic et al v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Jack Edward Little, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Jack Edward Little, Jr
Represented By: Alexcis Nell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asim Dizdarevic
Represented By: Paul Clarence Murphy, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MTM Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MTN Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Clarence Murphy, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?