International Bancshares Corporation v. Ochoa
Petitioner: International Bancshares Corporation d/b/a International Bank of Commerce d/b/a IBC Bank and International Bancshares Corportation
Respondent: Paola Ochoa
Case Number: 5:2019cv00062
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John A Kazen
Referring Judge: Marina Garcia Marmolejo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This case is therefore DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to CLOSE this case. Case terminated on 5/22/2019 (Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(sgonzalez, 5)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Motions referred to John A Kazen. by International Bancshares Corportation, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McElroy, Donna)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING HEARING. The Court SETS a telephonic hearing for May 29, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. on the parties' #1 Joint Motion for Court Approval of Confidential Settlement and Dismissal with Prejudice before Magistrate Judge John A. Kazen. Prior to the hearing, the parties are ORDERED to brief the Court's authority or jurisdiction to grant the relief requested by the parties and whether a justiciable dispute exists, in the context of the procedural background of this case. The parties must file their briefs by 5/22/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A. Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Joint SEALED MOTION (Jt. Motion for Leave to File Confidential Settlement Agreement Under Seal) by International Bancshares Corportation, Paola Ochoa, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit EXH. 1 -- CONF. SETT. AGR.) (McElroy, Donna)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 ***ENTERED IN ERROR**Joint SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Confidential Settlement Agreement Under Seal by International Bancshares Corporation d/b/a International Bank of Commerce d/b/a IBC Bank, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to File Confidential Settlement Agreement Under Seal) (McElroy, Donna) Modified on 5/9/2019 (dflores, 5).
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 Joint Motion for Court Approval of Confidential Settlement and Dismissal w/Prejudice/Other Miscellaneous Relief ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0541-22392007.) filed by International Bancshares Corporation d/b/a International Bank of Commerce d/b/a IBC Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Order Approving Confidential Settlement Agreement and Dismissal w/Prejudice)(McElroy, Donna) Modified on 5/13/2019 (JessicaGRodriguez, 5).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Bancshares Corporation v. Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: International Bancshares Corporation d/b/a International Bank of Commerce d/b/a IBC Bank
Represented By: Donna K McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: International Bancshares Corportation
Represented By: Donna K McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paola Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?