Sandoval v. Commissioner Of Social Security

Plaintiff: Mariana M. Sandoval
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2019cv00081
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marina Garcia Marmolejo
Referring Judge: Diana Song Quiroga
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Commissioner Of Social Security served on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019, filed.(ehernandez, 5)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Commissioner Of Social Security served on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019, filed.(ehernandez, 5)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to U.S. Attorneys Office served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019, filed.(agould, 3)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service Executed as to Attorney General of the United States, Department of Justice on 7/17/19 re: Summons in a Civil Case, filed.(nortiz, 5)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 USM Receipt of #1 Complaint and #4 Order, filed. (Attachments: #1 Receipt of Complaint)(gsalinas, 5)
June 25, 2019 Summons Issued as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region VI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons delivered to USM in person, filed.(gsalinas, 5)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified.(gsalinas, 5)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Commissioner Of Social Security, Attorney General of the United States, US Attorney for the Southern District of Texas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons USAG, #2 Proposed Summons USAO)(Chermol, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mariana M. Sandoval, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/3/2019. (Chermol, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security filed by Mariana M. Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chermol, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoval v. Commissioner Of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana M. Sandoval
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?