Cortez v. Quality Carriers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Juan Francisco Cortez
Defendant: Phillip Adams and Quality Carriers, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00127
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marina Garcia Marmolejo
Referring Judge: Diana Song Quiroga
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 03:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga Parties notified.(dmorales, 5)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Quality Carriers, Inc., filed.(Bair, Ronald)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Quality Carriers, Inc. served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019, filed.(Cowen, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to Phillip Adams, Quality Carriers, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dmorales, 5)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Phillip Adams, filed.(Cowen, Michael)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Quality Carriers, Inc., filed.(Cowen, Michael)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Phillip Adams, Quality Carriers, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23047147) filed by Juan Francisco Cortez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cowen, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortez v. Quality Carriers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Bradley Johnson
Represented By: Ronald Lee Bair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Francisco Cortez
Represented By: Michael R Cowen
Represented By: Averie Eleanor Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?