Hurt v. USA
Petitioner: Charles Francis Hurt
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 5:2019cv00169
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Sand on behalf of USA, filed. (Sand, Andrew)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Mr. Hurt re: Clarification, filed. (hlerma, 4)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER RESPONSE to #4 Order on Motion, filed by Charles Francis Hurt. (ehernandez, 5)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO ANSWER (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion For Docket Entry Communication For Every Entry Copy To Be Sent As Receipt Copy.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION For Docket Entry Communication For Every Entry Copy To Be Sent As Receipt Copy to Charles Francis Hurt by Charles Francis Hurt, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(mmarquez, 5)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Charles Francis Hurt, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(dmorales, 5) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2019: #2 Inmate Inquiry) (dmorales, 5).
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) as to Criminal Case No. 5:15-CR-662 (Defendant No. 1) by Charles Francis Hurt, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Unredacted attachment, #3 Continuation, #4 Motion of First Formal Filing of 28 USC 2255)(dmorales, 5) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2019: #5 PSR) (dmorales, 5).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurt v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: U.S. Attorney's Office
Represented By: Andrew Ceejay Sand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Francis Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?