Gonzalez v. United States of America
Petitioner: Belinda Gonzalez
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2020cv00040
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John A Kazen
Referring Judge: Marina Garcia Marmolejo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 SEALED RESPONSE, filed. (EricaLopez, 5)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(gsalinas, 5)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER "Petitioner's attorney, Uriel Drucker, is ORDER to file a detailed affidavit responding to Petitioner's allegations by April 8, 2020." Affidavit Response due by 4/8/2020.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(FernandoVilla, 5)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (CindyMiranda, 5)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Letter from Belinda Gonzalez re: Obligations, filed. (CindyMiranda, 5)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) as to Criminal Case No. 5:19-cr-94 (Defendant No. 2) filed by Belinda Gonzalez.(CindyMiranda, 5) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2020: #1 Envelope) (CindyMiranda, 5).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Appellate Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Belinda Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?