Garza Marroquin et al v. Garcia Longoria et al
Petitioner: Raul Garza Marroquin, Rafael Olvera Amezcua and Giorge Gonzalez
Respondent: Daniel Bible, Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr., United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mario Garcia, Matthew T. Albence, Javier Aleman and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 5:2020cv00054
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John A Kazen
Referring Judge: Marina Garcia Marmolejo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Matthew T. Albence, Javier Aleman, Daniel Bible, Mario Garcia, Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wiley, Ariel)
May 29, 2020 Filing 30 REPLY in Support of #14 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Response to Gonzalez's and Olvera's Petitions for Immediate Injunctive Relief, filed by Matthew T. Albence, Javier Aleman, Daniel Bible, Mario Garcia, Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wiley, Ariel)
May 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(EricaLopez, 5)
May 15, 2020 Filing 28 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #27 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Giorge Gonzalez, Rafael Olvera Amezcua, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D) (McGraw, Peter) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/21/2020) (JessicaGRodriguez, 5).
May 15, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition to #14 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Response to Gonzalez's and Olvera's Petitions for Immediate Injunctive Relief, filed by Giorge Gonzalez, Rafael Olvera Amezcua. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McGraw, Peter)
May 15, 2020 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess PagesMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Giorge Gonzalez, Rafael Olvera Amezcua, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McGraw, Peter)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Sever. Petitioner Raul Garza Marroquin's case is TRANSFERRED to the Brownsville Division of the Southern District of Texas. Petitioner's Amezcua and Gonzalez's claims remain pending in this Court..(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(sgonzalez, 5)
May 13, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition to #12 Opposed MOTION for Discovery, filed by Matthew T. Albence, Javier Aleman, Daniel Bible, Mario Garcia, Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wiley, Ariel)
May 5, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Sheff on behalf of Giorge Gonzalez, filed. (McGraw, Peter)
April 27, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Supplemental Declaration by Robert L. Cerna by Matthew T. Albence, Javier Aleman, Daniel Bible, Mario Garcia, Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration by Robert L. Cerna)(Cravens, Annalisa)
April 27, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to #13 Opposed MOTION to Sever Mr. Garza Marroquin and Transfer His Petition to the Brownsville Division, filed by Raul Garza Marroquin, Giorge Gonzalez, Rafael Olvera Amezcua. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Olivares, Efren)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioners may file a response to Respondents motion to dismiss by May 15, 2020. Respondents may file a reply by May 29, 2020..(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(EricaLopez, 5)
April 27, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE GOVERNMENTS MOTION TO DISMISSMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Raul Garza Marroquin, Giorge Gonzalez, Rafael Olvera Amezcua, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
April 25, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Javier N. Maldonado on behalf of Rafael Olvera Amezcua, filed. (Maldonado, Javier)
April 24, 2020 Filing 17 SEALED EXHIBITS 1 through 5 re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Response to Garza's Petition for Immediate Injunctive Relief by Matthew T. Albence, Javier Aleman, Daniel Bible, Mario Garcia, Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Garza A-File, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Garza Criminal Records, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 Garza Medical Records, #4 Affidavit Ex. 4 Dr. Cantu Declaration, #5 Affidavit Ex. 5 Longoria Declaration) (Wiley, Ariel)
April 24, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Response to Garza's Petition for Immediate Injunctive Relief Motions referred to John A Kazen. by Matthew T. Albence, Javier Aleman, Daniel Bible, Mario Garcia, Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 6 (Unsealed), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 7 (Unsealed), #3 Proposed Order)(Wiley, Ariel)
April 24, 2020 Filing 15 SEALED EXHIBITS 1 through 12 re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Response to Gonzalez's and Olvera's Petitions for Immediate Injunctive Relief by Matthew T. Albence, Javier Aleman, Daniel Bible, Mario Garcia, Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Gonzalez Medical Records, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Gonzalez Letter Dated 4-6-2020, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 Gonzalez Immigration Files, #4 Affidavit Ex. 4 Cerna Declaration, #5 Affidavit Ex. 5 Aleman Declaration, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 Olvera Webb County Medical Records, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 Olvera Pearsall Medical Records, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 Olvera Immigration Files, #9 Affidavit Ex. 9 Cerna Declaration II, #10 Affidavit Ex. 10 Warden Garcia Declaration and Attachments, Part I, #11 Affidavit Ex. 10 Warden Garcia Declaration Attachments Part II, #12 Affidavit Ex. 11 Dr. Ivens Declaration, #13 Affidavit Ex. 12 Huron Declaration) (Wiley, Ariel)
April 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Response to Gonzalez's and Olvera's Petitions for Immediate Injunctive Relief Motions referred to John A Kazen. by Matthew T. Albence, Javier Aleman, Daniel Bible, Mario Garcia, Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 13 (unsealed), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 14 (unsealed), #3 Proposed Order)(Wiley, Ariel)
April 23, 2020 Filing 13 Opposed MOTION to Sever Mr. Garza Marroquin and Transfer His Petition to the Brownsville DivisionMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Matthew T. Albence, Javier Aleman, Daniel Bible, Mario Garcia, Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Notice to Appear, #3 Proposed Order)(Cravens, Annalisa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 12 Opposed MOTION for DiscoveryMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Raul Garza Marroquin, Giorge Gonzalez, Rafael Olvera Amezcua, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Garcia, Carlos)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Carolyn O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5)
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Carolyn O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Raul Garza Marroquin, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/12/2020. (Olivares, Efren)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Udelsman on behalf of Raul Garza Marroquin, filed. (Udelsman, Andrew)
April 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to Matthew T. Albence, Javier Aleman, Daniel Bible, Mario Garcia, Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(sgonzalez, 5)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Efren Carlos Olivares on behalf of Raul Garza Marroquin, filed. (Olivares, Efren)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Matthew T. Albence, Javier Aleman, Daniel Bible, Mario Garcia, Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation, #3 Continuation, #4 Continuation, #5 Continuation, #6 Continuation)(McGraw, Peter)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Respondents are ORDERED to file an answer or other appropriate responsive pleading no later than April 24, 2020. Petitioners may file a reply by April 27, 2020. (Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(EricaLopez, 5)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Fatima Menendez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/30/2020) (JessicaGRodriguez, 5).
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Daniel Hatoum to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/30/2020) (JessicaGRodriguez, 5).
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Fatima Menendez to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raul Garza Marroquin, Giorge Gonzalez, Rafael Olvera Amezcua, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/7/2020. (Perales, Nina)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Daniel Hatoum to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raul Garza Marroquin, Giorge Gonzalez, Rafael Olvera Amezcua, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/7/2020. (Perales, Nina)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0541-24552727) filed by Giorge Gonzalez, Rafael Olvera Amezcua, Raul Garza Marroquin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGraw, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza Marroquin et al v. Garcia Longoria et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raul Garza Marroquin
Represented By: Andrew George Udelsman
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Fatima Menendez
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Carolyn O'Connor
Represented By: Daniel Hatoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rafael Olvera Amezcua
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Fatima Menendez
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Javier N Maldonado
Represented By: Daniel Hatoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Giorge Gonzalez
Represented By: Peter Eammon McGraw
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Fatima Menendez
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Daniel Hatoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Bible
Represented By: Annalisa L. Cravens
Represented By: Ariel Nicole Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr.
Represented By: Annalisa L. Cravens
Represented By: Ariel Nicole Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Annalisa L. Cravens
Represented By: Ariel Nicole Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mario Garcia
Represented By: Annalisa L. Cravens
Represented By: Ariel Nicole Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Annalisa L. Cravens
Represented By: Ariel Nicole Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Javier Aleman
Represented By: Annalisa L. Cravens
Represented By: Ariel Nicole Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Annalisa L. Cravens
Represented By: Ariel Nicole Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?