Baldwin III v. Unimark Truck Transport, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Earnest R Baldwin III
Defendant: AUTO TRUCK TRANSPORT USA, LLC, Daimler Trucks North America, LLC, Alejandro Andrade, Unimark Truck Transport, LLC, TRUCK TRANSPORT, LLC, JHT HOLDINGS, INC. and Richard Earl Mcrea
Case Number: 5:2020cv00184
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Diana Song Quiroga
Referring Judge: Diana Saldana
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Nathan P. Kennedy to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Earnest R Baldwin III, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(mmapps, 4)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AUTO TRUCK TRANSPORT USA, LLC, Daimler Trucks North America, LLC, JHT HOLDINGS, INC., Richard Earl Mcrea, Pablo Pineda, III, TRUCK TRANSPORT, LLC, Unimark Truck Transport, LLC, filed.(Waters, Vaughan)
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Pablo Pineda, III, filed.(Waters, Vaughan)
October 30, 2020 *** CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge John A. Kazen. (dmoralesadi, 5)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The Court ORDERS that, no later than 11/15/2020, counsel for Plaintiff shall: (1) Move for pro hac vice status; (2) Obtain substitute counsel admitted to practice in the Southern District of Texas to represent Plaintiff in this proceeding and file a motion to substitute counsel; or, (3) Move for admission to practice in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas, tender the applicable fee, and file an advisory with this Court regarding the filing of his application. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AUTO TRUCK TRANSPORT USA, LLC, Alejandro Andrade, Daimler Trucks North America, LLC, JHT HOLDINGS, INC., Richard Earl Mcrea, TRUCK TRANSPORT, LLC, Unimark Truck Transport, LLC, filed.(Waters, Vaughan)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25403927) filed by Daimler Trucks North America, LLC, TRUCK TRANSPORT, LLC, Alejandro Andrade, Unimark Truck Transport, LLC, Richard Earl Mcrea, AUTO TRUCK TRANSPORT USA, LLC, JHT HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Waters, Vaughan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldwin III v. Unimark Truck Transport, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTO TRUCK TRANSPORT USA, LLC
Represented By: Vaughan Eugene Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America, LLC
Represented By: Vaughan Eugene Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Andrade
Represented By: Vaughan Eugene Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unimark Truck Transport, LLC
Represented By: Vaughan Eugene Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUCK TRANSPORT, LLC
Represented By: Vaughan Eugene Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JHT HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Vaughan Eugene Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Earl Mcrea
Represented By: Vaughan Eugene Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest R Baldwin III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?