Kuykendall v. Amazon Studios LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Kuykendall
Defendant: Intellectual Property Corporation, Tiller Russell, Good Pixel Productions, John Massaria, Amazon Studios LLC and Hector Berrellez
Case Number: 5:2020cv00219
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John A Kazen
Referring Judge: Marina Garcia Marmolejo
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Summons Re-Issued as to Good Pixel Productions, John Massaria. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(FernandoVilla, 5)
January 21, 2021 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Amazon Studios LLC served on 1/5/2021, answer due 3/8/2021, filed.(Brown, Alex)
January 14, 2021 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Tiller Russell served on 1/5/2021, answer due 3/8/2021, filed.(Brown, Alex)
January 14, 2021 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Intellectual Property Corporation served on 1/5/2021, answer due 3/8/2021, filed.(Brown, Alex)
January 13, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hector Berrellez served on 1/5/2021, answer due 3/8/2021, filed.(Brown, Alex)
January 13, 2021 Filing 24 DESIGNATION of F. Franklin Amanat as attorney in charge of James Kuykendall, filed.(Amanat, Farzin)
January 13, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by F. Franklin Amanat on behalf of James Kuykendall, filed. (Amanat, Farzin)
January 4, 2021 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to Tiller Russell sent on 01/05/2021 by James Kuykendall, filed.(Brown, Alex)
January 4, 2021 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to John Massaria sent on 01/05/2021 by James Kuykendall, filed.(Brown, Alex)
January 4, 2021 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to Intellectual Property Corporation sent on 01/05/2021 by James Kuykendall, filed.(Brown, Alex)
January 4, 2021 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to Good Pixel Productions sent on 01/05/2021 by James Kuykendall, filed.(Brown, Alex)
January 4, 2021 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to Hector Berrellez sent on 01/05/2021 by James Kuykendall, filed.(Brown, Alex)
January 4, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to Amazon Studios LLC sent on Corrected Date: 01/05/2021 by James Kuykendall, filed.(Brown, Alex)
January 4, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to Amazon Studios LLC sent on 01/05/20 by James Kuykendall, filed.(Brown, Alex)
January 4, 2021 Summons Issued as to Amazon Studios LLC, Hector Berrellez, Good Pixel Productions, Intellectual Property Corporation, John Massaria, Tiller Russell. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dmorales, 5)
January 2, 2021 Filing 15 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Amazon Studios LLC, filed.(Brown, Alex)
January 2, 2021 Filing 14 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Tiller Russell, filed.(Brown, Alex)
January 2, 2021 Filing 13 Request for Issuance of Summons as to John Massaria, filed.(Brown, Alex)
January 2, 2021 Filing 12 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Intellectual Property Corporation, filed.(Brown, Alex)
January 2, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Good Pixel Productions, filed.(Brown, Alex)
January 2, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hector Berrellez, filed.(Brown, Alex)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Megan E. McKenzie to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(bmendoza, 5)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Greg G. Gutzler to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(bmendoza, 5)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Bruce D. Bernstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(bmendoza, 5)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for F. Franklin Amanat to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(bmendoza, 5)
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Bruce D. Bernstein to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by James Kuykendall, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/19/2021. (Brown, Alex)
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Megan E. McKenzie to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by James Kuykendall, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/19/2021. (Brown, Alex)
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Greg G. Gutzler to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by James Kuykendall, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/19/2021. (Brown, Alex)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Franklin Amanat to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by James Kuykendall, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/19/2021. (Brown, Alex)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25702505) filed by James Kuykendall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuykendall v. Amazon Studios LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intellectual Property Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiller Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Pixel Productions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Massaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Studios LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Berrellez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kuykendall
Represented By: Alex J Brown
Represented By: Megan E McKenzie
Represented By: Farzin Franklin Amanat
Represented By: F. Franklin Amanat
Represented By: Bruce D Bernstein
Represented By: Greg G Gutzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?