Grimes v. Lumpkin et al.
Plaintiff: John Alfred Grimes
Defendant: Bobby Lumpkin, Dr. James Fitts, Cotulla unit warden/Supervisor, Texas Dept of Criminal Justice, Univerity of Texas Medical Branch and S. Marshall
Case Number: 5:2022cv00012
Filed: March 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marina Garcia Marmolejo
Referring Judge: Christopher dos Santos
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified.(mmarquez, 5)
April 22, 2022 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against James Fitts, Bobby Lumpkin, S. Marshall, Univerity of Texas Medical Branch, filed by John Alfred Grimes. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by John Alfred Grimes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, pp. 1-30)(mmarquez, 5)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs motion for leave to file the supplement to the complaint #18 . The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to docket the attached Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 18, pp. 2-11) as a separate docket entry that includes the proposed exhibits (Dkt. No. 18-2, pp. 1-30). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified.(mmarquez, 5).
April 15, 2022 Filing 19 Plaintiff's Available Statement of Facts by John Alfred Grimes, filed. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(sgonzalez, 5) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/15/2022) (sgonzalez, 5). Modified on 4/15/2022 (sgonzalez, 5).
April 11, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend ComplaintMotions referred to Christopher dos Santos. by John Alfred Grimes, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bmendoza, 5) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2022: #2 Exhibit) (bmendoza, 5). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/14/2022) (bmendoza, 5).
April 11, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Alfred Grimes, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bmendoza, 5) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2022: #2 Proposed Order) (bmendoza, 5).
April 11, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Appointment of CounselMotions referred to Christopher dos Santos. by John Alfred Grimes, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bmendoza, 5)
March 30, 2022 Filing 15 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by John Alfred Grimes, filed.(ElliotGallegos, 5)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Plaintiffs original complaint and supplement (Dkt. Nos. 1, 8) are hereby REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos for a Report and Recommendation on whether Plaintiffs lawsuit should survive judicial screening(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(ElliotGallegos, 5)
March 25, 2022 Filing 13 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 3/23/21 re: 12 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (RaulGamas, 5)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to serve Plaintiff with a copy of this Order via certified mail, return receipt requested. The Clerk of Court shall also provide a copy of this Order to the Inmate Trust Fund Department of Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Cotulla Unit, at 610 Ranch Road 624, Cotulla, Texas 78014.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(sgonzalez, 5)
March 17, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by John Alfred Grimes, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(dgonzalez, 5)
March 16, 2022 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Notice of additional claims and request for discovery by John Alfred Grimes, filed. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Envelope)(ElliotGallegos, 5)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY. If Plaintiff wishes to continue litigating this action, Plaintiff is ORDERED to either pay the Courts $402.00 filing fee in full or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis no later than twenty-one (21) days after receiving service of this Order. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall not accept any other documents in this case, except for a motion for an extension of time or notice of voluntary dismissal, until Plaintiff complies with this Order.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(dgonzalez, 5)
March 3, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (RaulGamas, 5)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. Lumpkin et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Alfred Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Lumpkin
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. James Fitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cotulla unit warden/Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Dept of Criminal Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Univerity of Texas Medical Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?