Heartbrand Beef, Inc. v. Lobel's of New York, LLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Heartbrand Beef, Inc.
Defendant: Lobel's of New York, LLC and Worldwide Media, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2008cv00062
Filed: July 25, 2008
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: Lavaca
Presiding Judge: John D. Rainey
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2009 60 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on February 11, 2009.(Signed by Judge John D. Rainey) Parties notified.(ltesch, )
February 10, 2009 59 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Yahoo! Inc. by Heartbrand Beef, Inc., filed. (Lee, Ted)
February 5, 2009 58 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s MOTION to Dismiss; denying as moot Plaintiff's 38 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
December 4, 2008 57 Featured Case ORDER granting 54 Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant, Thought Convergence, Inc. with Prejudice. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
December 3, 2008 56 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: 54 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant, Thought Convergence, Inc. with Prejudice by Heartbrand Beef, Inc., filed.(Lee, Ted)
November 11, 2008 55 PROPOSED ORDER re: 54 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant, Thought Convergence, Inc. with Prejudice, filed.(Lee, Ted)
November 11, 2008 54 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant, Thought Convergence, Inc. with Prejudice by Thought Convergence, Inc., Heartbrand Beef, Inc. (Lee, Ted)
November 7, 2008 53 Featured Case ORDER granting 50 Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant Lobel's of New York, LLC; denying as moot 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; denying as moot 31 Defendant Lobel's of New York, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
November 7, 2008 52 Featured Case ORDER granting 51 Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant Worldwide Media, Inc. with Prejudice; denying as moot 27 Worldwide Media, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
November 5, 2008 51 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant, Worldwide Media, Inc. With Prejudice by Heartbrand Beef, Inc., Worldwide Media, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Ted)
November 5, 2008 50 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lobel's of New York, LLC With Prejudice by Heartbrand Beef, Inc., Lobel's of New York, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Ted)
November 3, 2008 49 Yahoo!'s Reply to 34 Heartbrand Beef's Opposition to Yahoo!'s Motion to Dismiss, filed by Yahoo! Inc. (Deemed filed 11/03/08 per 48 Court Order.) (yhausmann, )
November 3, 2008 48 Featured Case ORDER granting 42 Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
November 3, 2008 47 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: November, 2009. ETT: 5 days. Bench Trial. Pltf Expert Witness List and Pltf Expert Report due by 4/30/2009; Deft Expert Witness List and Deft Expert Report due by 6/12/2009; Discovery due by 7/31/2009; Motions Filing due by 8/14/2009; Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/23/2009; Bench Trial set for November, 2009 before Judge John D. Rainey. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
November 3, 2008 46 CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM: Rule 16 held by telephone. Scheduling order signed. Appearances: Ted Dalton Lee, Howard S Michael, C David Kinder, Gregg S Baker, Yas Raouf, Richard Danysh. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
November 3, 2008 45 Featured Case ORDER granting 44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Yas Raouf for Thought Convergence, Inc. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
October 31, 2008 42 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss by Yahoo! Inc. (Smith, Annalyn)
October 31, 2008 41 Correspondence to Court on Telephonic Scheduling Conference by Heartbrand Beef, Inc., filed.(Lee, Ted)
October 30, 2008 44 MOTION for Yas Raouf to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thought Convergence, Inc. (pjameson, )
October 30, 2008 43 Featured Case ORDER granting 39 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Worldwide Media, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response due by 11/6/2008. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
October 30, 2008 40 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Yahoo! Inc., filed.(Smith, Annalyn)
October 29, 2008 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Defendant Worldwide Media, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Heartbrand Beef, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Ted)
October 29, 2008 38 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Heartbrand Beef, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lee, Ted)
October 29, 2008 37 RESPONSE to 31 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Heartbrand Beef, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - FAQ Section of the website www.lobels.com, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B- Screenshots of the web pages from www.lobels.com outlining the procedure a customer must go through to purchase products from Lobels, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C - Lobels website, where they have the option to chat online with a customer support representative, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D- Declaration of Ronald Beeman, # 5 Proposed Order)(Lee, Ted)
October 27, 2008 36 Corrected Certificate of Service on Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Yahoo!'s Motion to Dismiss by Heartbrand Beef, Inc., filed.(Lee, Ted)
October 27, 2008 35 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Thought Convergence, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Heartbrand Beef, Inc., Lobel's of New York, LLC, Worldwide Media, Inc., filed.(Lee, Ted)
October 27, 2008 34 RESPONSE to 23 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Heartbrand Beef, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re Pltf's Resp. to Yahoo!'s Motion to Dismiss)(Lee, Ted)
October 15, 2008 33 Featured Case ORDER granting 30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Gregg S. Baker for Lobel's of New York, LLC. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
October 10, 2008 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Worldwide Media, Inc., filed.(Kinder, C)
October 10, 2008 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or in the Alternative, for Improper Venue or, In the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by Worldwide Media, Inc., filed.(Kinder, C)
October 10, 2008 27 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or in the Alternative, for Improper Venue or, In the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by Worldwide Media, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Re: Michael Berkens)(Kinder, C)
October 7, 2008 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant Lobel's of New York, LLC. (yhausmann, )
October 7, 2008 31 MOTION to Dismiss by Lobel's of New York, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order) (yhausmann, )
October 7, 2008 30 MOTION for Gregg S. Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lobel's of New York, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Transmittal letter, Registration form) (yhausmann, )
October 6, 2008 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Motion of attorney David S. Fleming to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Yahoo! Inc. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
October 6, 2008 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion of attorney Howard S. Michael to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Yahoo! Inc. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
October 6, 2008 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by Yahoo! Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Annalyn)
October 6, 2008 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Yahoo! Inc. (Smith, Annalyn)
October 6, 2008 22 ANSWER to 3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Thought Convergence, Inc., filed.(Yuhas, George)
October 1, 2008 21 MOTION for Howard S. Michael to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Yahoo! Inc. (yhausmann, )
October 1, 2008 20 MOTION for David S. Fleming to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Yahoo! Inc. (yhausmann, )
September 10, 2008 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move or Otherwise Plead. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
September 9, 2008 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to Move or Otherwise Plead by Yahoo! Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2008. (Smith, Annalyn)
September 9, 2008 17 Featured Case ORDER re 15 Parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
September 9, 2008 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney George Alan Yuhas to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Thought Convergence, Inc. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
September 5, 2008 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by Thought Convergence, Inc. and Proposed Order. (yhausmann, )
September 3, 2008 14 Featured Case ORDER re 11 Parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
September 3, 2008 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Yahoo! Inc., filed.(Smith, Annalyn)
August 29, 2008 12 MOTION for George Yuhas to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thought Convergence, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Transmittal letter, application) (yhausmann, )
August 29, 2008 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint and Proposed Order by Thought Convergence, Inc. (yhausmann, )
August 25, 2008 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move or Otherwise Plead. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
August 25, 2008 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move or Otherwise Plead by Yahoo! Inc. (Smith, Annalyn)
August 25, 2008 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Annalyn G. Smith on behalf of Yahoo! Inc., filed. (Smith, Annalyn)
August 8, 2008 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Thought Convergence, Inc. served on 8/6/2008.(Lee, Ted)
August 8, 2008 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Yahoo! Inc. served on 8/6/2008.(Lee, Ted)
August 6, 2008 Summons Issued as to Thought Convergence, Inc. (yhausmann, )
August 6, 2008 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Worldwide Media, Inc. served on 8/5/2008.(Lee, Ted)
August 6, 2008 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Lobel's of New York, LLC served on 8/5/2008.(Lee, Ted)
August 5, 2008 Summons Issued as to Yahoo! Inc. (yhausmann, )
August 5, 2008 3 AMENDED Complaint against Thought Convergence, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. filed by Heartbrand Beef, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Website of www.akaushi.com-homepage, # 2 Exhibit B-1 of 2 connections to www.lobels.com, # 3 Exhibit C-1 of 2 websites of www.lobels.com, # 4 Exhibit D-Lobel's Homepage, # 5 Exhibit E-Legal Policy by TrafficZ)(Lee, Ted)
July 30, 2008 Summons Issued as to Lobel's of New York, LLC, Worldwide Media, Inc. (yhausmann, )
July 30, 2008 2 Featured Case ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/3/2008 at 09:40 AM by telephone before Judge John D. Rainey. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
July 25, 2008 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05410000000004030327) filed by Heartbrand Beef, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Website of www.akaushisteaks.com operated by Worldwide Media, Inc., # 2 Exhibit B - One of two connections to www.lobels.com, # 3 Exhibit C - One of two connections to www.lobels.com, # 4 Exhibit D - Homepage of www.lobels.com)(Lee, Ted)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heartbrand Beef, Inc. v. Lobel's of New York, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heartbrand Beef, Inc.
Represented By: Ted Dalton Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lobel's of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worldwide Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?