Guzman v. Hacienda Records and Recording Studio, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jose O Guzman
Defendant: Hacienda Records and Recording Studio, Inc., Hacienda Records, L.P. a/k/a Hacienda Ranchito and/or Discos Ranchito, Latin American Entertainment, LLC, Richard a/k/a Rick G Garcia and Roland, Sr. Garcia
Case Number: 6:2012cv00042
Filed: September 20, 2012
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Victoria Office
County: Nueces
Presiding Judge: Gregg Costa
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2015 161 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part denying in part 139 Application for Costs. (Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
July 31, 2015 160 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 139 Application for Attorney's Fees.(Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
July 30, 2015 159 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 139 Defendants' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs with respect to application for attorney's fees.(Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
December 9, 2014 137 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER.(Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(arrivera, 3)
May 20, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 20 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint. (Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(arrivera, )
February 19, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 4 Motion to Transfer Case.(Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(arrivera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman v. Hacienda Records and Recording Studio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose O Guzman
Represented By: David Wesley Showalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hacienda Records and Recording Studio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hacienda Records, L.P. a/k/a Hacienda Ranchito and/or Discos Ranchito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latin American Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard a/k/a Rick G Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland, Sr. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?