Puetz et al v. Geico Choice Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Josie Ray Puetz, Marco Antonio Ferova and Augustina Ferova
Defendant: Geico Choice Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv00073
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Agreed Motion to Abate. Whether the issues are submitted to a jury is yet to be determined. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Agreed MOTION to Abate by Geico Choice Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Figueroa, Analisa)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Geico Choice Insurance Company, filed.(Figueroa, Analisa)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Augustina Ferova, Marco Antonio Ferova, Josie Ray Puetz, filed.(Jackson, Russell) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2019: #1 Redacted document) (CarrieDickie, 6).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 12/4/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 135th Judicial District Court, Refugio County, Texas, case number 2019-07-12947 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22999720) filed by Geico Choice Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Figueroa, Analisa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2019: #3 Notice of Removal Main Document - Unredacted, #4 Exhibit A - Unredacted, #5 Exhibit B - Unredacted) (CarrieDickie, 6).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puetz et al v. Geico Choice Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josie Ray Puetz
Represented By: Russell Taylor Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Antonio Ferova
Represented By: Russell Taylor Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augustina Ferova
Represented By: Russell Taylor Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Choice Insurance Company
Represented By: Analisa Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?