Veliz v. Veliz et al
Plaintiff: Felipe Veliz
Defendant: vlz, inc., Vincent Veliz and VLZ, Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv00094
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 09:45 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Felipe Veliz, filed.(Elliott, Douglas)
December 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge David S Morales. Judge Kenneth M Hoyt no longer assigned to case. Parties notified, filed. (ltesch, 6)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 ***DISREGARD THIS NOTICE - ASSIGNMENT INCORRECT*** NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge John D Rainey. Judge Kenneth M Hoyt no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (LoriPurifoy, 4) Modified on 12/3/2019 (ltesch, 6).
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Delphine James on behalf of VLZ, Inc, Vincent Veliz, filed. (James, Delphine)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Vincent Veliz, VLZ, Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(James, Delphine)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Kenneth M Hoyt recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Felipe Veliz, filed.(Harrison, Meredith)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to VLZ, Inc served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019, filed.(Harrison, Meredith)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Vincent Veliz served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019, filed.(Harrison, Meredith)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 2/5/2020 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(CarrieDickieadi, 6)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (CarrieDickie, 6)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to VLZ, Inc. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(CarrieDickie, 6)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Vincent Veliz. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(CarrieDickie, 6)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons for VLZ Inc.)(Elliott, Douglas)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23468678) filed by Felipe Veliz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Registration for VLZ, #2 Exhibit B Registration for Stallion Logo, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elliott, Douglas) Modified on 10/31/2019 (CarrieDickie, 6).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veliz v. Veliz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vlz, inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Veliz
Represented By: Delphine M James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VLZ, Inc
Represented By: Delphine M James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Veliz
Represented By: Douglas H. Elliott
Represented By: Meredith Regan Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?