Baker v. Collier et al
Plaintiff: Bill Baker
Defendant: Dir of TDCJ-Parole Bryan Collier, Faye Wright, Patrick Cooper, Kelli T Taylor, Christi Tupa and Larry Berger
Case Number: 6:2020cv00050
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Drew B Tipton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (mmapps, 4)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred in from Texas Eastern. Case Number 6:20-cv-00413; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF PARTIAL SEVERANCE AND TRANSFER re #1 Complaint, filed by Bill Baker. The Clerk shall transfer the claims against Defendant Dr. Tupa forthwith and without delay to the Southern District of Texas, Victoria Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 8/4/2020. (gsg) Modified on 8/4/2020 (gsg).
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 Letter w/attached exhibits from Bill Baker (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s)) (mll, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 Letter w/attached exhibits from Bill Baker (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s)) (mll, )
July 27, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***MAILED Consent Form to plaintiff. (mll, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (mll, )
July 27, 2020 Case transferred in from Marshall Division on 07/27/2020; Case Number 2:20-cv-237.(mll, )
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO TRANSFER - ORDERED that the Plaintiffs civil rights lawsuit is TRANSFERRED, forthwith and without delay, to the Eastern District of Texas, Tyler Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/27/2020. (ch, )
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/17/2020. (ch, )
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR INITIAL FILING FEE - granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. An initial partial filing fee of $69.00 shall be paid to the Clerk within (30) days from receipt of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/17/2020. (ch, )
July 15, 2020 (MAILED REGULAR MAIL TO BILL BAKER) In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Bill Baker. (ch, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bill Baker. (Attachments: #1 Data Sheet)(ch, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Bill Baker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(ch, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Larry Berger, Bryan Collier, Patrick Cooper, Kelli T Taylor, Christi Tupa, Faye Wright, filed by Bill Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Collier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dir of TDCJ-Parole Bryan Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faye Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli T Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christi Tupa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?