Clark v. Nance
Plaintiff: Jason Ray Clark
Defendant: Nathan Nance
Case Number: 6:2023cv00059
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mitchel Neurock
Referring Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Nathan Nance served on 12/25/2023, answer due 1/16/2024, filed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BrittanyBoniface, 6)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER FOR CONFERENCE re D.E. #4 . Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2024 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock(Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified.(LeticiaGarza, 2)
December 19, 2023 Civil Case Filing fee: $402.00, receipt number 6-48, filed. (BrittanyBoniface, 6)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(BrittanyBoniface, 6)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Victoria Courthouse before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(BrandyCortez, 2)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Jason Ray Clark. Parties notified Notice of Compliance due by 1/2/2024, filed. (BrittanyBoniface, 6)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (BrittanyBoniface, 6)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nathan Nance filed by Jason Ray Clark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(BrittanyBoniface, 6)
November 30, 2023 Summons Issued as to Nathan Nance. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(BrittanyBoniface, 6)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Nance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Ray Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Nance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?