Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ramirez
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Sergio Ray Ramirez
Case Number: 7:2018cv00346
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(King, Jamie)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Sergio Ray Ramirez served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019, filed.(King, Jamie)
November 17, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., filed.(King, Jamie)
November 8, 2018 Summons Issued as to Sergio Ray Ramirez. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(King, Jamie)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21245063) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Ray Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?