Livas v. The Bank of New York Mellon

Plaintiff: Dalia Livas
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon and Kenneth M. Culbreth, Jr.
Case Number: 7:2018cv00384
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Micaela Alvarez. Initial PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/15/2019. The parties appeared before the Court for an initial pre-trial scheduling conference. Plaintiff acknowledged that a previously filed case, 7:18-cv-223 Livas v. The Bank of New York Mellon, likely bars this case. Defendant indicated it would file a motion to dismiss on the grounds of res judicata and collateral estoppel. Due to the likelihood of dismissal, no scheduling order was entered. Appearances:Larry Warner / Kenneth Culbreth (ERO: Xavier Avalos [10:30-10:40]) (DUSM: J. Buban)., filed.(JulieSanchez,hs 7)
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Dalia Livas, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Warner, Larry)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER #11 Stipulation of Dismissal, Kenneth M. Culbreth, Jr (as Substitute Trustee) terminated(Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Joint Discovery/ Case Management Plan due by 01/10/2019. (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Kenneth M. Culbreth, Jr. as Substitute Trustee by Kenneth M. Culbreth, Jr, filed.(Culbreth, Kenneth)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by The Bank of New York Mellon, filed.(Culbreth, Kenneth)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Kenneth M. Culbreth, Jr, The Bank of New York Mellon filed by Dalia Livas.(Warner, Larry)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 Opposed MOTION to Amend by Dalia Livas, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Warner, Larry)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 Opposed RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, filed by Dalia Livas. (Warner, Larry)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dalia Livas, filed.(Warner, Larry)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Larry L. Warner as attorney in charge of Dalia Livas, filed.(Warner, Larry)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry L. Warner on behalf of Dalia Livas, filed. (Warner, Larry)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Bank of New York Mellon, filed.(Culbreth, Kenneth)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 93rd, case number C-4430-18-B (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21427544) filed by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Culbreth, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Livas v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Kenneth M Culbreth, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth M. Culbreth, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth M Culbreth, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalia Livas
Represented By: Juan Angel Guerra
Represented By: Larry Logan Warner, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?