USA v. Real Property Known as Lot 10, of Taylor Terrace Subdivision an Addition to the City of McAllen, Texas, Hidalgo County, Texas, according to the Plat or Map Thereof recorded in Volume 41, Page 153, Map
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Real Property Known as Lot 10, of Taylor Terrace Subdivision an Addition to the City of McAllen, Texas, Hidalgo County, Texas, according to the Plat or Map Thereof recorded in Volume 41, Page 153, Map
Claimant: Sharyland Independent School District, Hidalgo County Drainage District #1, South Texas I.S.D., South Texas College, Hidalgo County, Texas and City of McAllen, Texas
Case Number: 7:2019cv00049
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 15 CLAIM Verified Claim of Hidalgo County, et al. filed by Sharyland Independent School District, Hidalgo County Drainage District #1, South Texas College, South Texas I.S.D., Hidalgo County, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gruver, Lori)
April 4, 2019 Filing 14 CLAIM Verified Claim of City of McAllen filed by City of McAllen, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gruver, Lori)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by City of McAllen, Texas, Hidalgo County Drainage District #1, Hidalgo County, Texas, Sharyland Independent School District, South Texas College, South Texas I.S.D., filed.(Gruver, Lori)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hidalgo County, Texas, Hidalgo County Drainage District #1, Sharyland Independent School District, South Texas I.S.D., South Texas College, City of McAllen, Texas, filed.(Gruver, Lori)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 First CLAIM filed by Real Property Known as Lot 10, of Taylor Terrace Subdivision an Addition to the City of McAllen, Texas, Hidalgo County, Texas, according to the Plat or Map Thereof recorded in Volume 41, Page 153, Map. (Attachments: #1 Continuation signature page, #2 Exhibit closing documents)(Guerra, Alejandro)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of Service Executed as to David Reyes for Alyssa Monique Mejia on 03/06/2019 re: Complaint, filed.(klopez, 7)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of Service Executed as to David Andrew Reyes on 03/06/2019 re: Complaint, filed.(klopez, 7)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service Executed as to Edward J. Jackson on 3/20/2019 re: Amended Verified Complaint, filed.(Smyth, Mary)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service Executed as to Alfredo Mejia-Martinez on 03/14/2019 re: Amended Verified Complaint, filed.(Smyth, Mary)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Real Property Known as Lot 10, of Taylor Terrace Subdivision an Addition to the City of McAllen, Texas, Hidalgo County, Texas, according to the Plat or Map Thereof recorded in Volume 41, Page 153, Map served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019, filed.(Smyth, Mary)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by USA, filed.(Smyth, Mary)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference (previously set for 5/15/2019) is reset for 5/22/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa, filed. (klopez, 7)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/15/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Real Property Known as Lot 10, of Taylor Terrace Subdivision an Addition to the City of McAllen, Texas, Hidalgo County, Texas, according to the Plat or Map Thereof recorded in Volume 41, Page 153, Map filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Verification)(Smyth, Mary)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Real Property Known as Lot 10, of Taylor Terrace Subdivision an Addition to the City of McAllen, Texas, Hidalgo County, Texas, according to the Plat or Map Thereof recorded in Volume 41, Page 153, Map filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Verification)(Smyth, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Real Property Known as Lot 10, of Taylor Terrace Subdivision an Addition to the City of McAllen, Texas, Hidalgo County, Texas, according to the Plat or Map Thereof recorded in Volume 41, Page 153, Map
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Known as Lot 10, of Taylor Terrace Subdivision an Addition to the City of McAllen, Texas, Hidalgo County, Texas, according to the Plat or Map Thereof recorded in Volume 41, Page 153, Map
Represented By: Alejandro Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Mary Ellen Smyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sharyland Independent School District
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hidalgo County Drainage District #1
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: South Texas I.S.D.
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: South Texas College
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hidalgo County, Texas
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: City of McAllen, Texas
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?