PlainsCapital Bank v. 3 Diamonds, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: PlainsCapital Bank
Defendant: El Toro Builders, Inc., S&F Developers & Builders, LLC, 3 Diamonds, Inc., Salinas Noberto and Saltillo Group, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00157
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Complaint of PlainsCapital Bank to Confirm Arbitration Award & for Entry of Judgment, filed by Salinas Noberto. (Ortiz, Reynaldo)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 Amended INITIAL DISCLOSURES by S&F Developers & Builders, LLC, filed.(Weitz, Mark)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by PlainsCapital Bank, filed.(Bartek, Diann)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Salinas Noberto served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019, filed.(Long, Jeana)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to S&F Developers & Builders, LLC served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019, filed.(Long, Jeana)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Saltillo Group, LLC served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019, filed.(Long, Jeana)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to El Toro Builders, Inc. served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019, filed.(Long, Jeana)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to 3 Diamonds, Inc. served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019, filed.(Long, Jeana)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Salinas Noberto, filed.(Weitz, Mark)
May 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(klopez, 7)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons - El Toro Builders, Inc., #2 Summons - Saltillo Group, LLC, #3 Summons - S & F Developers & Builders, LLC, #4 Summons - Norberto Salinas)(Long, Jeana)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3 Diamonds, Inc., El Toro Builders, Inc., Salinas Noberto, S&F Developers & Builders, LLC, Saltillo Group, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22370372) filed by PlainsCapital Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bartek, Diann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PlainsCapital Bank v. 3 Diamonds, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Toro Builders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&F Developers & Builders, LLC
Represented By: Mark Alan Weitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 Diamonds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salinas Noberto
Represented By: Mark Alan Weitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saltillo Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PlainsCapital Bank
Represented By: Diann Marie Bartek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?