Vincent v. McAllen Indep. School Dist
Plaintiff: Rhonda,n/b/f MM et Vincent and Rhonda Vincent
Defendant: McAlllen Indep. School Dist and McAllen Indep. School District
Case Number: 7:2019cv00274
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Randy Crane
Referring Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 10/18/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa (previously set for 10/10/2019), filed. (adelagarza, 7)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by McAllen Indep. School District, filed.(Leach, Rex)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by McAllen Indep. School District, filed.(Leach, Rex)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to McAllen Indep. School District served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019, filed.(Cirkiel, Martin)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Randy Crane recused. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa for all further proceedings(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Civl CAse Cover Sheet by Rhonda,n/b/f MM et Vincent, filed.(Cirkiel, Martin)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22944146) filed by Rhonda,n/b/f MM et Vincent.(Cirkiel, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vincent v. McAllen Indep. School Dist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAlllen Indep. School Dist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAllen Indep. School District
Represented By: Rex N Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda,n/b/f MM et Vincent
Represented By: Martin Jay Cirkiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Vincent
Represented By: Martin Jay Cirkiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?