Garza v. MLG Protection Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gilberto Garza
Defendant: MLG Protection Services LLC and Armando Garza
Case Number: 7:2019cv00289
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Randy Crane
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Unopposed #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically for the Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION For Leave to Attend Scheduling Conference By Telephone by Gilberto Garza, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burton, Jody)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Armando Garza, MLG Protection Services LLC, filed.(Barrera, Marcus)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Armando Garza, MLG Protection Services LLC, filed.(Barrera, Marcus)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to MLG Protection Services LLC served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019, filed.(Burton, Jody)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Armando Garza served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019, filed.(Burton, Jody)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(klopez, 7)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane (by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to ARMANDO GARZA, MLG PROTECTION SERVICES LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Second Summons)(Burton, Jody)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by GILBERTO GARZA, filed.(Burton, Jody)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARMANDO GARZA, MLG PROTECTION SERVICES LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23013608) filed by GILBERTO GARZA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burton, Jody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza v. MLG Protection Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MLG Protection Services LLC
Represented By: Marcus C Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Garza
Represented By: Marcus C Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Garza
Represented By: Jody Berke Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?