Sanchez v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Juan Luis Sanchez
Defendant: Substitute Trustee Connie Cobb and PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00311
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed.(Dungan, Martin)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #8 Response in Opposition to Motion, #4 MOTION to Remand , filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(McInnis, Walter)
September 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Striking Document re: #8 Response in Opposition to Motion (Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Remand, filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(McInnis, Walter)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Unopposed MOTION for Alyson V. Blatney to Withdraw as Attorney, Attorney Alyson V Blatney terminated (Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Martin Dungan on behalf of PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed. (Dungan, Martin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Alyson V. Blatney to Withdraw as Attorney by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McInnis, Walter)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Juan Luis Sanchez, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guerra, Juan)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed.(Blatney, Alyson)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 275th Judicial District Court of Hidalgo County, Texas, case number C-3628-19-E (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23112503) filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(McInnis, Walter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Substitute Trustee Connie Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Walter Lewis Edmond McInnis
Represented By: Alyson V Blatney
Represented By: C Charles Townsend
Represented By: Martin Dungan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Luis Sanchez
Represented By: Juan Angel Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?