UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Del-Ton DTI-15 Rifle; Mossberg 500a Shotgun; Glock GMBH 17 Pistol; Glock GMGH 22GEN4 Pistol; Springfield Armory 1911 Pistol; and Colt Government Pistol
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Del-Ton DTI-15 Rifle; Mossberg 500a Shotgun; Glock GMBH 17 Pistol; Glock GMGH 22GEN4 Pistol; Springfield Armory 1911 Pistol; and Colt Government Pistol
Case Number: 7:2019cv00340
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 88:8888
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of attorney substitution by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney Jon Muschenheim added. Attorney Sean Joseph Patrick terminated, filed. (Muschenheim, Jon)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT of Arrest in REM, returned executed on 10/25/2019, filed.(klopez, 7)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #3 Motion for Order Directing Clerk to Issue a Warrant of Arrest in Rem. (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Patrick, Sean)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Warrant of Arrest in Rem)(Patrick, Sean)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Patrick, Sean)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Del-Ton DTI-15 Rifle; Mossberg 500a Shotgun; Glock GMBH 17 Pistol; Glock GMGH 22GEN4 Pistol; Springfield Armory 1911 Pistol; and Colt Government Pistol filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Patrick, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Del-Ton DTI-15 Rifle; Mossberg 500a Shotgun; Glock GMBH 17 Pistol; Glock GMGH 22GEN4 Pistol; Springfield Armory 1911 Pistol; and Colt Government Pistol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del-Ton DTI-15 Rifle; Mossberg 500a Shotgun; Glock GMBH 17 Pistol; Glock GMGH 22GEN4 Pistol; Springfield Armory 1911 Pistol; and Colt Government Pistol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Sean Joseph Patrick
Represented By: Jon Muschenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?