Carcamo-Eliaz v. United States of America
Petitioner: Lizandro Carcamo-Eliaz
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 7:2019cv00354
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Referring Judge: J Scott Hacker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 ***CONTINUATION OF DE #4 FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES: Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/6/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker Status Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker (klopez, 7)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER as to Lizandro Carcamo-Elias Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/6/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker Status Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Nadia S. Medrano, filed.(Medrano, Nadia) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/4/2019) (drodriguez, 7).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER as to Lizandro Carcamo-Elias (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (NelidaLosoya, 7)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) as to Criminal Case No. 7:18-CR-1067 (Defendant No. 1) filed by Lizandro Carcamo-Eliaz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(NelidaLosoya, 7)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carcamo-Eliaz v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Appellate Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lizandro Carcamo-Eliaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?