United States of America v. 6.10 Acres of Land, more or less et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: CAROLINA OLVERA DURAN, Paula S Botello, Maria Angelita Castillo Cordova, TERESA CASAREZ BREWSTER, RICARDO JACKSON, Felipe Castillo, Jr., DIANE RODRIGUEZ BREWSTER, DANIEL JR. JACKSON, Mary Azam, Robert Cervantes, Eugenia Bueno Sanchez, DAVID BREWSTER, GABRIEL BRYAN BREWSTER, RAY MATA, EDWARDO LEE JACKSON, Nelda Janet Sanchez Morales, SAMUEL BREWSTER, JR., Noemi Garcia Castillo, Lucinda Sanchez Hernandez, Thelma Sanchez, PABLO OLVERA, JORGE D. OLVERA, CLEMENCIA AMERICA BREWSTER RODRIGUEZ, NARSEDALIA JACKSON, ROLANDO OLVERA, Claude Henry Richey, Jr., Guadalupe Sanchez, Jr., Alberto J Sanchez, Maria Del Rosario Sanchez, CARMELA BARRON JACKSON, Norma Sanchez, ANDRES JACKSON, FELIPA OLVERA GUTIERREZ, Irma Cervantes Castillo, LEWIS BREWSTER, EGLANTINA GUTIERREZ OLVERA, Pedro J Sanchez, RICHARD CERVANTES, JACQUELINE BREWSTER, Jennifer Janell Sanchez, BLANCA LYDIA OLVERA VASQUEZ, Eutimio Sanchez, Jr., Justin Castillo, JAMES BRIAN BREWSTER, 6.10 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS, Ashley Nicole Castillo, BRENDA LEE JACKSON, ROSA LINDA BREWSTER, JAIME JACKSON, ANTONIA MARGARITA JACKSON RODRIGUEZ, Military Highway Water Supply Corporation, FRANCISCO OLVERA, JR., YOLANDA JACKSON HERNANDEZ, JOSEFA MATA, Roxanne Brewster Rodriguez, Gaspar Sanchez, Jr., EMILIA JACKSON, ROSE BREWSTER DILLARD, AMALIA BREWSTER FLORES, LEONARD THOMAS JACKSON, FRANCES BREWSTER, Laura Morgan Richey, JESSE LEE JACKSON, JR., RAYMOND ADAM JACKSON, TRINIDAD JR. MATA, MELISSA CHER LEWIS, Rene Castillo, Jr., APOLONIO JACKSON, JR., ORALIA JACKSON SANTIAGO, ANGELICA JACKSON, Cindy Castillo, Marissa Sanchez Hinojosa, Natalie Roxanne Castillo, Israel Castillo, Jr., DAVID OLVERA, Rogelio Sanchez, Larry B Sanchez, JAIME LANAY BREWSTER, LUISA BREWSTER GALLARDO, Hilaria Sanchez Castellanos, Ernesto Castillo, SANDRA BREWSTER, William Edgar Richey, Guadalupe Sanchez Cano, JOE LEE JACKSON, Natalia Sanchez, FELIX JACKSON OLVERA, Ventura Brewster Flores, OFELIA OLVERA-RICKER, VIRGINIA SANCHEZ, HIDALGO COUNTY, Antonia Margarita Jacks Rodriguez, Daniel Jackson, Jr., Clemencia America Brewste Rodriguez and Trinidad Mata, Jr.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00409
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Randy Crane
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION granting #66 MOTION FOR ORDER OF IMMEDIATE POSSESSION (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
February 5, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randy Crane. INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/5/2020. Case called on docket. Arguments regarding access to the existing church south of the property, title issues,access points/times and just compensation. The Court requested Government to amend the complaint to reflect proper name of defendant. After discussion, the Court GRANTED #66 Government's Partially Opposed Motion for Order of Immediate Possession and issued a scheduling order, copies tendered to counsel, reflecting October 2020 jury trial date. Appearances:Roland D. Ramos, Plaintiff; Karla Marisol Vargas/Ricardo Amado Garza, Defendants.(ERO: Ricardo Rodriguez), filed.(DeliaRodriguez, 7)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 6/12/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 6/12/2020 Pltf Expert Report due by 7/2/2020. Deft Expert Report due by 7/17/2020. Discovery due by 8/7/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/21/2020. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/21/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/28/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane Jury Selection set for 10/6/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
February 4, 2020 Filing 97 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ernesto Castillo served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
February 4, 2020 Filing 96 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Robert Cervantes served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
February 4, 2020 Filing 95 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Andres Jackson served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
February 3, 2020 Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition to #66 MOTION FOR ORDER OF IMMEDIATE POSSESSION, filed by Jaime Lanay Brewster, Ventura Brewster Flores, Rose Brewster Dillard, Amalia Brewster Flores, Luisa Brewster Gallardo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Vargas, Karla)
February 3, 2020 Filing 93 Amended JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by United States of America, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
February 3, 2020 Filing 92 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Oralia Jackson Santiago served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
February 3, 2020 Filing 91 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Maria Angelita Castillo Cordova served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 28, 2020 Filing 90 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Rosa Linda Brewster served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 28, 2020 Filing 89 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Josefa Mata served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 28, 2020 Filing 88 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Samuel Brewster, Jr served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 27, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Ricardo A. Garza on behalf of Jaime Lanay Brewster, Ventura Brewster Flores, Rose Brewster Dillard, Amalia Brewster Flores, Luisa Brewster Gallardo, filed. (Garza, Ricardo)
January 27, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Karla M. Vargas on behalf of Jaime Lanay Brewster, Ventura Brewster Flores, Rose Brewster Dillard, Amalia Brewster Flores, Luisa Brewster Gallardo, filed. (Vargas, Karla)
January 27, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Efren C Olivares on behalf of Jaime Lanay Brewster, Ventura Brewster Flores, Rose Brewster Dillard, Amalia Brewster Flores, Luisa Brewster Gallardo, filed. (Olivares, Efren)
January 24, 2020 Filing 84 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by United States of America, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 24, 2020 Filing 83 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Felipe Castillo, Jr. served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 23, 2020 Filing 82 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Israel Castillo, Jr. served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 23, 2020 Filing 81 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Natalie Roxanne Castillo served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 23, 2020 Filing 80 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Justin Castillo served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 21, 2020 Filing 79 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Felipa Olvera Gutierrez served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 21, 2020 Filing 78 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ofelia Olvera-Ricker served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 21, 2020 Filing 77 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jacqueline Brewster served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 21, 2020 Filing 76 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Leonard Thomas Jackson served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 21, 2020 Filing 75 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Raymond Adam Jackson served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 17, 2020 Filing 74 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Francisco Olvera, Jr served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 16, 2020 Filing 73 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Military Highway Water Supply Corporation served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 16, 2020 Filing 72 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Carolina Olvera Duran served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 16, 2020 Filing 71 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jorge D. Olvera served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 15, 2020 Filing 70 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Blanca Lydia Olvera Vasquez served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 15, 2020 Filing 69 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Military Highway Water Supply Corporation served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 14, 2020 Filing 68 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Eglantina Gutierrez Olvera served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 14, 2020 Filing 67 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Melissa Cher Lewis served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 13, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION FOR ORDER OF IMMEDIATE POSSESSION by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1, #2 Exhibit No. 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Ramos, Roland)
January 13, 2020 Filing 65 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Antonia Margarita Jacks Rodriguez served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 13, 2020 Filing 64 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Marissa Sanchez Hinojosa served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 13, 2020 Filing 63 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Eutimio Sanchez, Jr. served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 13, 2020 Filing 62 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Lucinda Sanchez Hernandez served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 13, 2020 Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Nelda Janet Sanchez Morales served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 13, 2020 Filing 60 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Paula S Botello served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 7, 2020 Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Guadalupe Sanchez Cano served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 7, 2020 Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Larry B Sanchez served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 7, 2020 Filing 57 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Natalia Sanchez served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 3, 2020 Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Emilia Jackson served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 3, 2020 Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hilaria Sanchez Castellanos served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 3, 2020 Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Eugenia Bueno Sanchez served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 3, 2020 Filing 53 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Amalia Brewster Flores served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 3, 2020 Filing 52 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ventura Brewster Flores served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 3, 2020 Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jaime Lanay Brewster served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 3, 2020 Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Luisa Brewster Gallardo served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 3, 2020 Filing 49 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Rose Brewster Dillard served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 3, 2020 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jennifer Janell Sanchez served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 3, 2020 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Maria Del Rosario Sanchez served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 3, 2020 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Thelma Sanchez served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 3, 2020 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Gaspar Sanchez, Jr. served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 3, 2020 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Norma Sanchez served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 3, 2020 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jaime Jackson served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 3, 2020 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Richard Cervantes served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 3, 2020 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ricardo Jackson served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT DAVID OLVERA ONLY. David Olvera terminated.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(SandraSilva, 7)
December 31, 2019 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hidalgo County served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Alberto J Sanchez served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Carmela Barron Jackson served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Joe Lee Jackson served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Apolonio Jackson, Jr served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Daniel Jackson, Jr served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Yolanda Jackson Hernandez served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Laura Morgan Richey served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Clemencia America Brewste Rodriguez served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Pedro J Sanchez served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Mary Azam served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Trinidad Mata, Jr served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Guadalupe Sanchez, Jr. served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jesse Lee Jackson, Jr served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Irma Cervantes Castillo served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Pablo Olvera served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Brenda Lee Jackson served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Narsedalia Jackson served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Felix Jackson Olvera served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Virginia Sanchez served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER OF PARTIAL INTEREST EXECUTED BY DANIEL JACKSON, JR. by United States of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ramos, Roland)
December 31, 2019 Filing 18 *CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Ramos, Roland) *Modified on 12/31/2019 (klopez, 7).
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Noemi Garcia Castillo served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Rene Castillo, Jr. served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Edwardo Lee Jackson served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Rogelio Sanchez served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Claude Henry Richey, Jr. served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to William Edgar Richey served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to David Brewster served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Cindy Castillo served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ashley Nicole Castillo served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Angelica Jackson served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020, filed.(Ramos, Roland)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER FOR DAVID OLVERA by United States of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Ramos, Roland)
December 17, 2019 Deposit made into the Registry of the Court by USA in the amount of $25,010.00, receipt number BRO008012, filed. (mperez, 1)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's Receipt by United States of America, filed.(mperez, 1)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane (by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa recused. Case reassigned to Judge Randy Crane for all further proceedings(Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Notice)(Ramos, Roland)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of LOREN FLOSSMAN, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to DT)(Ramos, Roland)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramos, Roland)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 6.10 Acres of Land, more or less et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLINA OLVERA DURAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula S Botello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Angelita Castillo Cordova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERESA CASAREZ BREWSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICARDO JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felipe Castillo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE RODRIGUEZ BREWSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL JR. JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Azam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cervantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugenia Bueno Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BREWSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GABRIEL BRYAN BREWSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAY MATA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARDO LEE JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelda Janet Sanchez Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL BREWSTER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noemi Garcia Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucinda Sanchez Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thelma Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PABLO OLVERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORGE D. OLVERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEMENCIA AMERICA BREWSTER RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NARSEDALIA JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROLANDO OLVERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claude Henry Richey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guadalupe Sanchez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto J Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Del Rosario Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARMELA BARRON JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDRES JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FELIPA OLVERA GUTIERREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irma Cervantes Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEWIS BREWSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EGLANTINA GUTIERREZ OLVERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro J Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD CERVANTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACQUELINE BREWSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Janell Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLANCA LYDIA OLVERA VASQUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eutimio Sanchez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES BRIAN BREWSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6.10 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Nicole Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENDA LEE JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSA LINDA BREWSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAIME JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONIA MARGARITA JACKSON RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Military Highway Water Supply Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCISCO OLVERA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YOLANDA JACKSON HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEFA MATA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne Brewster Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaspar Sanchez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMILIA JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSE BREWSTER DILLARD
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: Ricardo Amado Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMALIA BREWSTER FLORES
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: Ricardo Amado Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEONARD THOMAS JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCES BREWSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Morgan Richey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSE LEE JACKSON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYMOND ADAM JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRINIDAD JR. MATA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA CHER LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Castillo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOLONIO JACKSON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORALIA JACKSON SANTIAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELICA JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marissa Sanchez Hinojosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Roxanne Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Israel Castillo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID OLVERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogelio Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry B Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAIME LANAY BREWSTER
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: Ricardo Amado Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUISA BREWSTER GALLARDO
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: Ricardo Amado Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilaria Sanchez Castellanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernesto Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA BREWSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Edgar Richey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guadalupe Sanchez Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE LEE JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalia Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FELIX JACKSON OLVERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventura Brewster Flores
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: Ricardo Amado Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFELIA OLVERA-RICKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIRGINIA SANCHEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIDALGO COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonia Margarita Jacks Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Jackson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemencia America Brewste Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinidad Mata, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Roland Domingo Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?