Cheguez-Espinoza v. United States of America
Petitioner: Jorge Alberto Cheguez-Espinoza
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 7:2019cv00412
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Juan F Alanis
Referring Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 ***Delivery Confirmation for delivery date 02/06/2020 re: Document(s) Sent, filed. (klopez, 7)
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Jorge Alberto Cheguez-Espinoza re #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #3 Amended MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255. Objections to R&R due w/in 14 days. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified, filed.(cvillegas, 7)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Assistance of Counsel for Justice by Jorge Alberto Cheguez-Espinoza, filed. Motions referred to Juan F Alanis. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2020. (EdnitaPonce, 1)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 Amended MOTION to Vacate Motions referred to Juan F Alanis. by Jorge Alberto Cheguez-Espinoza, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martinez, Jose)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER as to Jorge Alberto Cheguez-Espinoza. Responses due by 1/19/2020. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified, filed.(cvillegas, 7)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) as to Criminal Case No. 7:19-CR-639 (Defendant No. 01) filed by Jorge Alberto Cheguez-Espinoza.(klopez, 7)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheguez-Espinoza v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Appellate Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jorge Alberto Cheguez-Espinoza
Represented By: Jose Angel Martinez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?