UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 0.499 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Jose Luis Puente, Adrian Fernandez, Juan Martinez, III, Benjamin Fierro, Jr., Christopher Villegas, Eliberto Garza, Janie Castillo, Maria Eliza Roman, Ramon Garza, Jr., Maria Gloria Nieto, David Puente, The Unknown Heirs of Nancy Champion, Irma Garza, Sherry Bouma, Nicole Reyna, Richard Villegas, Guadalupe Trevino, Joshua Gonzalez, Andrew Martinez, 0.499 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS, Victoria Ann Garza, Baltazar Garza, Esmeralda Puente, Marie Elena Garza Huntly, Federico Trevino, Miguel Maldonado, Jr., Oralia Garza, Raymond Nunez, Jr., Angelita Garza, Rene Trevino, David Simon Serna, Noelia Alanis, Debra Puente, Manuel Garza, Jr., Rogelio Garza, Maria Villegas, Eduardo Guzman, III, Rosa Linda Alanis, Roberto Trevino, Jose Angel Quinones Garza, Eloisa Garza Prescott, Lupe Villegas, San Juanita Gomez, Graciela De La Rosa, Martina Babine, Hidalgo County Tax Assessor & Collector, Alma Franco, K. Daniella Garza, John Villegas, Nancy Villegas, Gloria Torres, Gabriel Garza, Danny Olivarez, Jr., Maria Lennon, Loreto Villegas, John Edward Serna, Yolanda Alvarado, Rolando H. Martinez, Lydia Anita Garza Campbell, Laurie Gonzalez, Stephanie Fernandez, David Alanis, Chita Villegas, Alberto Trevino, Yolanda Gonzales, Jesus Gabriel Quinone Garza, Christina Garza, Salvador Guzman, Joanna Montes, Luis Angel Quinones Garza, The Unknown Heirs of Pedro Garza, Sr., Rogelio Alanis, Geneve Rivera, Connie Villegas, Miguel Puente, Crispin Trevino, Jr., Theresa Villegas, Rebecca Coronado, Alberto Alanis, Rosa Linda Garza, Andres Garza, Gino Montes, Javier Guzman, David Maldonado, Kathleen Serna, Israel Garza, Jr., Petra Rosales, Lydia Rodea, Catalino Villegas, Adrian Martinez, Chelsea Gonzalez and Anthony Garza
Case Number: 7:2020cv00041
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Randy Crane
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
April 16, 2020 Filing 65 Opposed MOTION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR ORDER OF IMMEDIATE POSSESSION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Unruh, Neil)
April 15, 2020 Filing 64 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Gloria Torres served on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
April 13, 2020 Filing 63 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Rosa Linda Alanis served on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
April 13, 2020 Filing 62 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Graciela De La Rosa served on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
April 13, 2020 Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Lupe Villegas served on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
April 13, 2020 Filing 60 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Angelita Garza served on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
April 13, 2020 Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Richard Villegas served on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
April 13, 2020 Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Alberto Alanis served on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
April 8, 2020 Filing 57 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Yolanda Alvarado served on 4/8/2020, answer due 6/8/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
April 3, 2020 Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Adrian Fernandez served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
April 3, 2020 Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Christopher Villegas served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO ELEVEN DEFENDANTS ONLY. K. Daniella Garza, Yolanda Gonzales, Rolando H. Martinez, Gino Montes, Maria Eliza Roman, Petra Rosales, John Edward Serna, Federico Trevino, Crispin Trevino, Jr., Andres Garza and Jesus Gabriel Quinone Garza terminated. (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
March 31, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY RAUL TREVINO by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Unruh, Neil)
March 31, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY FEDERICO TREVINO by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Unruh, Neil)
March 31, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY YOLANDA GONZALES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Unruh, Neil)
March 31, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY ROLANDO H. MARTINEZ by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Unruh, Neil)
March 31, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY ROGELIO ALANIZ by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Unruh, Neil)
March 31, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY PETRA ROSALES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Unruh, Neil)
March 31, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY NOELIA ALANIS BAKER by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Unruh, Neil)
March 31, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY MARIA ELIZA ROMAN by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Unruh, Neil)
March 31, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY MARIA ELENA GARZA HUNTLEY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Unruh, Neil)
March 31, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY JOHN EDWARD SERNA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Unruh, Neil)
March 31, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY JESUS GARZA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Unruh, Neil)
March 31, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY JAVIER GUZMAN by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Unruh, Neil)
March 31, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY GINO MONTES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Unruh, Neil)
March 31, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY K. DANIELLA GARZA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Unruh, Neil)
March 31, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY CRISPIN TREVINO, JR. by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Unruh, Neil)
March 31, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED FOR ANDRES GARZA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Unruh, Neil)
March 26, 2020 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Rogelio Garza served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 26, 2020 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Rene Trevino served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 26, 2020 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ramon Garza, Jr. served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 26, 2020 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Maria Villegas served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 26, 2020 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Manuel Garza, Jr. served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 26, 2020 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Juan Martinez, III served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 26, 2020 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Eliberto Garza served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 26, 2020 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Debra Puente served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 26, 2020 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to David Maldonado served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 26, 2020 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to David Alanis served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 26, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Anthony Garza served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Victoria Ann Garza served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Theresa Villegas served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sherry Bouma served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Rosa Linda Garza served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Rebecca Coronado served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Oralia Garza served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Nancy Villegas served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Maria Gloria Nieto served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Laurie Gonzalez served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kathleen Serna served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jose Luis Puente served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to John Villegas served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Joanna Montes served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Israel Garza, Jr. served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Irma Garza served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Esmeralda Puente served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Eloisa Garza Prescott served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Connie Villegas served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Christina Garza served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Chita Villegas served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Benjamin Fierro, Jr. served on 2/20/2020, answer due 4/20/2020, filed.(Unruh, Neil)
March 2, 2020 Deposit made into the Registry of the Court by USA in the amount of $19,500.00, receipt number BRO008180, filed. (scastillo, 1)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 Clerk's Receipt, filed.(scastillo, 1)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/6/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane(by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Notice)(Unruh, Neil)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of LOREN FLOSSMAN, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to DT)(Unruh, Neil)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Unruh, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 0.499 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Luis Puente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Martinez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Fierro, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliberto Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janie Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Eliza Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Garza, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Gloria Nieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Puente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs of Nancy Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irma Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Bouma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guadalupe Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.499 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Ann Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltazar Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esmeralda Puente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Elena Garza Huntly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federico Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Maldonado, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oralia Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Nunez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelita Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Simon Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noelia Alanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Puente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Garza, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogelio Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Guzman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Linda Alanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Angel Quinones Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eloisa Garza Prescott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupe Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Juanita Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graciela De La Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martina Babine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hidalgo County Tax Assessor & Collector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alma Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Daniella Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Olivarez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loreto Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Edward Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolando H. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lydia Anita Garza Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Alanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chita Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Gabriel Quinone Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna Montes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Angel Quinones Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs of Pedro Garza, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogelio Alanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geneve Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Puente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crispin Trevino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Coronado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Alanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Linda Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andres Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gino Montes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Israel Garza, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petra Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lydia Rodea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalino Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Neil Joseph Unruh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?