Garcia v. Power Default Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jesse Garcia
Defendant: Power Default Services, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv00075
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Initial Conference reset for 6/17/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez. Renewed joint discovery/case management plan due by 6/05/2020 if the case is not settled. Alternatively, dismissal documentation due by 5/29/2020.(Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE Defendant's Amended Certificate of Service re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Power Default Services, Inc., filed. (Harris, Shawnika)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Power Default Services, Inc., filed.(Harris, Shawnika)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Power Default Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Harris, Shawnika)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/12/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez( by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(AdrianDeLaRosa, 7)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Power Default Services, Inc. identifying Altisource Portfolio Solutions S.A. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Harris, Shawnika)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Power Default Services, Inc., filed.(Harris, Shawnika)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 389th Judicial District, Hidalgo County, Texas, case number C-0416-20-E (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24441635) filed by Power Default Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Ex B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - All Counsel of Recor, #4 Exhibit D - Docket Sheet and State Court File, #5 Exhibit E - Hidalgo County Appraisal District Valuation for the Property)(Harris, Shawnika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Power Default Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Default Services, Inc.
Represented By: Shawnika LaShone Harris
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Represented By: Benjamin David Lee Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?