Acute Care Ambulance Service, LLC v. Alex M. Azar II
Plaintiff: Acute Care Ambulance Service, LLC
Defendant: Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services and Alex M. Azar, ll
Case Number: 7:2020cv00217
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay the Order for Conference and Disclosure of Interested Parties by Acute Care Ambulance Service, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Joint Motion to Stay)(Kennedy, Mark)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Acute Care Ambulance Service, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum Exhibits 1, 2 and A - H)(Kennedy, Mark)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Acute Care Ambulance Service, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Kennedy, Mark)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Alex M. Azar, ll served on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Mark)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Acute Care Ambulance Service, LLC, filed.(Kennedy, Mark)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Trey Scott on behalf of Acute Care Ambulance Service, LLC, filed. (Scott, Calvin)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, ll. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(kanelson, 7)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Alex M. Azar, ll, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Mark)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25034997) filed by Acute Care Ambulance Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acute Care Ambulance Service, LLC v. Alex M. Azar II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acute Care Ambulance Service, LLC
Represented By: Mark Stephen Kennedy
Represented By: Calvin Trey Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, ll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?