Gonzales v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Helen Gonzales
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, AVT Title Services, LLC, Substitute Trustee, PHH Mortgage Corporation and Power Default Services, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv00229
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa. INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/14/2020. Case called on the docket. Plaintiff Helen Gonzales failed to attend telephonically. The Court addressed Defense counsel Ms. Harris as to Defendants last communication with Plaintiff. The Court announced Plaintiff needs to appear and reset Initial Pretrial Conference for 10/21/2020 at 2:30 P.M. before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa. Appearances: Shawnika LaShone Harris.(ERO:Tony Tijerina (2:53-2:55), filed.(adelagarza, 7)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Power Default Services, Inc., filed.(Harris, Shawnika)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Striking Document re: #5 MOTION to Remand. (Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand. Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand Action and Suggestion of Death of Co-Borrower. by Helen Gonzales, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(JenniferNogueira, 7)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Power Default Services, Inc. identifying HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Holdings, plc; PHH Corporation, Ocwen Financial Corporation; Altisource Portfolio Solutions S.A. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Harris, Shawnika)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Power Default Services, Inc., filed.(Harris, Shawnika)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law No. 5; Hidalgo County, Texas, case number CL-20-3003-E (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25075523) filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Power Default Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Ex B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - List of All Counsel of Record, #4 Exhibit D - Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit D-1 - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #6 Exhibit D-2 - Bond, #7 Exhibit D-3 - Citation and Service Returns (AVT Title Services LLC), #8 Exhibit D-4 - Proposed TRO, TRO Signed, Issued, Service Return (AVT Title Services LLC), #9 Exhibit D-5 - Trust Deposit Receipt, #10 Exhibit D-6 - Affidavit of Solvency, #11 Exhibit D-7 - Defendants' Original Answer, #12 Exhibit E - Hidalgo CAD Valuation for the Property)(Harris, Shawnika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Shawnika LaShone Harris
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Represented By: Benjamin David Lee Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Shawnika LaShone Harris
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Represented By: Benjamin David Lee Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVT Title Services, LLC, Substitute Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Shawnika LaShone Harris
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Represented By: Benjamin David Lee Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Default Services, Inc.
Represented By: Shawnika LaShone Harris
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Represented By: Benjamin David Lee Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?