Pena v. Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Rolando Pena
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 7:2020cv00230
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Nationwide Insurance Company of America, filed.(Arnold, George)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Nationwide Insurance Company of America, filed.(Arnold, George)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Nationwide Insurance Company of America, filed.(Arnold, George)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Nationwide Insurance Company of America served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020, filed.(Ochoa, Omar)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Nationwide Insurance Company of America, filed.(Ochoa, Omar)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Rolando Pena, filed.(Ochoa, Omar)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/21/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25075977) filed by Rolando Pena.(Ochoa, Omar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pena v. Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Pena
Represented By: Omar Ochoa
Represented By: Victor Rodriguez, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Represented By: George Howard Arnold
Represented By: Susan Sparks Usery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?