UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 6.584 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: BETTY ANZALDUA, Ariana Pitalua, Maria Rosario Cavazos, Efrain G. Cavazos, Michelle Alejandro, Rebecca Hernandez, Ernesto Flores, Jr., Jaime Cavazos, Angie Marin, Pablo Servando Guerra, Joseph Flores, Paula Gonzalez, Keila Cavazos, Dora Flores, MARIA ELENA OVALLE, AURORA A. GARCIA, Ruben Cavazos, Juan Lino Guerra, Gloria Dalia Guerra, Emma Catherine Flores, Rogerio Cavazos, Jr., Victoria M. Flores, Melissa Salazar, Natalie Flores-Henley, IMELDA FLORES GONZALEZ, Yolanda Martinez, Patrick Anzaldua, Elvira Flores Deanda, Humberto Cavazos, Pablo "Paul" Villarreal, Jr., Bertha Oralia Cavazos, 6.584 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS, RONALD R. ANZALDUA, Delia A. Mendoza, Norma A. Anzaldua, Jose C. Anzaldua, Jr., Eloisa Rosa Cavazos, Rebecca Serrano, Robert E. Flores, Jr., Jorge Flores, Gloria Diana Sauceda, Robert E. Flores, Jr, Ernesto Flores, Jr and Pablo "Paul&quot Villarreal, Jr
Petitioner: Jose Alfredo Cavazos
Case Number: 7:2020cv00244
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY to #36 Response to Motion to Dismiss, and for a More Definite Statement, and Answer to the Complaint, filed by Eloisa Rosa Cavazos, Jose Alfredo Cavazos. (Garza, Ricardo)
October 12, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE to #22 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Motion for a More Definite Statement, and Answer to the Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Concepcion, Hilda)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER regarding #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
September 29, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Carolyn O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JOSE ALFREDO CAVAZOS, Eloisa Rosa Cavazos, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/20/2020. (Garza, Ricardo)
September 28, 2020 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Victoria M. Flores served on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 24, 2020 Filing 32 Summons Issued as to Victoria M. Flores. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(klopez, 7)
September 24, 2020 Filing 31 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Victoria M. Flores, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 23, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by JOSE ALFREDO CAVAZOS, Eloisa Rosa Cavazos, filed.(Garza, Ricardo)
September 22, 2020 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Robert E. Flores, Jr. served on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 22, 2020 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Rebecca Serrano served on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 22, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Patrick Anzaldua served on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 22, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jorge Flores served on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 22, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ernesto Flores, Jr. served on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 22, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to BETTY ANZALDUA served on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 22, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to AURORA A. GARCIA served on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 21, 2020 Filing 22 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Motion for a More Definite Statement, and Answer to the #1 Complaint by Eloisa Rosa Cavazos, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2020. (Garza, Ricardo).
September 21, 2020 Filing 21 Opposed MOTION to Intervene by JOSE ALFREDO CAVAZOS, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Motion to Dismiss, Motion for a More Definite Statement, and Answer, #3 Signed Declaration of Proposed Defendant-Intervenor, #4 Memorandum of Law)(Garza, Ricardo)
September 17, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to IMELDA FLORES GONZALEZ served on 9/17/2020, answer due 11/16/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 17, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Emma Catherine Flores served on 9/17/2020, answer due 11/16/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Yolanda Martinez served on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to RONALD R. ANZALDUA served on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 15, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Norma A. Anzaldua served on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Joseph Flores served on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jose C. Anzaldua, Jr. served on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Elvira Flores Deanda served on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Dora Flores served on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Delia A. Mendoza served on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Natalie Flores-Henley served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to MARIA ELENA OVALLE served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Michelle Alejandro served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Bertha Oralia Cavazos served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Efrain G. Cavazos served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Humberto Cavazos served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Jaime Cavazos served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Keila Cavazos served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Maria Rosario Cavazos served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Ruben Cavazos served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Rogerio Cavazos, Jr. served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Paula Gonzalez served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Gloria Dalia Guerra served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Juan Lino Guerra served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Pablo Servando Guerra served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Rebecca Hernandez served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Angie Marin served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Ariana Pitalua served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Melissa Salazar served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Gloria Diana Sauceda served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
September 4, 2020 Deposit made into the Registry of the Court by USA in the amount of $347,887.00, receipt number 20-00199, filed. (knguyen, 4)
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 Clerk's Receipt, filed.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Eloisa Rosa Cavazos served on 9/1/2020, answer due 11/2/2020, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/10/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez (by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Notice)(Concepcion, Hilda)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of LOREN FLOSSMAN, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to DT)(Concepcion, Hilda)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Concepcion, Hilda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 6.584 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETTY ANZALDUA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ariana Pitalua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Rosario Cavazos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Efrain G. Cavazos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Alejandro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernesto Flores, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Cavazos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo Servando Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keila Cavazos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA ELENA OVALLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA A. GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Cavazos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Lino Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Dalia Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emma Catherine Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogerio Cavazos, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria M. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Flores-Henley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMELDA FLORES GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Anzaldua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elvira Flores Deanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humberto Cavazos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo "Paul" Villarreal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bertha Oralia Cavazos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6.584 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD R. ANZALDUA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delia A. Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma A. Anzaldua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose C. Anzaldua, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eloisa Rosa Cavazos
Represented By: Carolyn O'Connor
Represented By: Ricardo Amado Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Flores, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Diana Sauceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Flores, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernesto Flores, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo "Paul&quot Villarreal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Hilda M Garcia Concepcion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Alfredo Cavazos
Represented By: Carolyn O'Connor
Represented By: Ricardo Amado Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?