UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 0.072 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Idolinda Flores Gutierrez, San Juana Alicia Flores, Arnoldo Javier Flores, Norma Linda Cardenas, Noe Ruben Munoz, Antonio Manuel Flores, Gilberto Flores, Jr., Ema Lydia Munoz Duran, Pablo "Paul" Villarreal, Jr. Hidalgo County Tax Assessor, Ernestina F. Campos, Elizandro Munoz, Jr., Roberto Flores, Randy Lee Flores, Aurora M. Flores Trigo, Matias Flores, Jr., Keith Allen Brandenburg, Roel Flores, Hector Flores, Robert Michael Valdez, Maribel J. Jimenez, Patricia Ramirez Oviedo, Marisela Ramirez, Lea Brandenburg, Maria Del Rosario Flores Salinas, Jessica Cavazos, Rene Flores, Jr., Gilberto Flores, Gustavo Flores, Jr., Arnulfo Flores, David Mathew Morin, Elizabeth F. Salinas, Noemi Munoz, Jose Ramiro Flores, Ricardo G. Flores, 0.072 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS, Arnoldo Flores, Florentino Flores, Felicia Miranda Flores, Richard Paul Valdez, Mary Katherine Flores Ramirez, Ruben Flores III, Irma F. Luna, John Jeffery Flores, Unknown Heirs of Gilberto Flores, Arminda Minerva F. Munoz, Hermelinda F. Garza, Froilan Ramirez, III, Guadalupe Flores and Ricardo Romeo Flores
Case Number: 7:2020cv00372
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Randy Crane
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to #21 Summons Requested. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
January 15, 2021 Filing 21 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Keith Allen Brandenburg, Lea Brandenburg, Norma Linda Cardenas, Jessica Cavazos, Antonio Manuel Flores, Arnoldo Javier Flores, Arnoldo Flores, Arnulfo Flores, Felicia Miranda Flores, Florentino Flores, Gilberto Flores, Guadalupe Flores, Hector Flores, John Jeffery Flores, Randy Lee Flores, Ricardo Romeo Flores, Ricardo G. Flores, San Juana Alicia Flores, Idolinda Flores Gutierrez, Ruben Flores III, Mary Katherine Flores Ramirez, Maria Del Rosario Flores Salinas, Gustavo Flores, Jr., Matias Flores, Jr., Rene Flores, Jr., Maribel J. Jimenez, David Mathew Morin, Noe Ruben Munoz, Noemi Munoz, Arminda Minerva F. Munoz, Ema Lydia Munoz Duran, Elizandro Munoz, Jr., Marisela Ramirez, Patricia Ramirez Oviedo, Froilan Ramirez, III, Richard Paul Valdez, Robert Michael Valdez, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Arminda Minerva F. Munoz, #2 Summons for Arnoldo Flores, #3 Summons for Arnoldo Javier Flores, #4 Summons for Arnulfo Flores, #5 Summons for David Mathew Morin, #6 Summons for Elizandro Munoz, Jr., #7 Summons for Ema Lydia Munoz, #8 Summons for Felicia Miranda Flores, #9 Summons for Florentino Flores, #10 Summons for Froilan Ramirez, III, #11 Summons for Gilberto Flores, #12 Summons for Guadalupe Flores, #13 Summons for Gustavo Flores, Jr., #14 Summons for Hector Flores, #15 Summons for Idolinda F. Gutierrez, #16 Summons for Jessica Cavazos, #17 Summons for John J. Flores, #18 Summons for Keith A. Brandenburg, #19 Summons for Lea Brandenburg, #20 Summons for Maria del Rosario F. Salinas, #21 Summons for Maribel J. Jimenez, #22 Summons for Marisela Ramirez, #23 Summons for Mary Katherine F. Ramirez, #24 Summons for Matias Flores, Jr., #25 Summons for Noe Ruben Munoz, #26 Summons for Noemi Munoz, #27 Summons for Norma Linda Cardenas, #28 Summons for Patricia Ramirez Oviedo, #29 Summons for Randy Lee Flores, #30 Summons for Rene Flores, Jr., #31 Summons for Ricardo G. Flores, #32 Summons for Ricardo Romeo Flores, #33 Summons for Richard Paul Valdez, #34 Summons for Robert Michael Valdez, #35 Summons for Ruben Flores, III, #36 Summons for San Juana Alicia Flores)(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 14, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH F. SALINAS by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 14, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Elizabeth F. Salinas served on 1/14/2021, answer due 3/15/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS ERNESTINA F. CAMPOS, HERMELINDA F. GARZA, IRMA F. LUNA, ROBERTO FLORES, AND ROEL FLORES. (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
January 13, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMERS EXECUTED BY DEFENDANTS ERNESTINA F. CAMPOS, HERMELINDA F. GARZA, IRMA F. LUNA, ROBERTO FLORES, AND ROEL FLORES, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order)(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 13, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Roel Flores served on 1/13/2021, answer due 3/15/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 11, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jose Ramiro Flores served on 1/11/2021, answer due 3/12/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 11, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Irma F. Luna served on 1/11/2021, answer due 3/12/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 11, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hermelinda F. Garza served on 1/11/2020, answer due 3/11/2020, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Gilberto Flores, Jr. served on 1/11/2020, answer due 3/11/2020, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 11, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ernestina F. Campos served on 1/11/2020, answer due 3/11/2020, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Roberto Flores served on 12/22/2020, answer due 2/22/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Notice of Disclaimer. Aurora M. Flores Trigo terminated. (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
December 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY DEFENDANT AURORA M. FLORES TRIGO by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Salazar, Baltazar)
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Aurora M. Flores Trigo served on 12/17/2020, answer due 2/16/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
December 7, 2020 Deposit made into the Registry of the Court by USA in the amount of $365.00, receipt number 21-00122, filed. (knguyen, 4)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 Clerk's Receipt, filed.(klopez, 7)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/3/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa recused. Case reassigned to Judge Randy Crane for all further proceedings(Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Notice)(Salazar, Baltazar)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of LOREN FLOSSMAN, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to DT)(Salazar, Baltazar)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Salazar, Baltazar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 0.072 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idolinda Flores Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Juana Alicia Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnoldo Javier Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Linda Cardenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noe Ruben Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Manuel Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilberto Flores, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ema Lydia Munoz Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo "Paul" Villarreal, Jr. Hidalgo County Tax Assessor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernestina F. Campos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizandro Munoz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Lee Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora M. Flores Trigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matias Flores, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Allen Brandenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roel Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Michael Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maribel J. Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Ramirez Oviedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisela Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lea Brandenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Del Rosario Flores Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Cavazos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Flores, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilberto Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gustavo Flores, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnulfo Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Mathew Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth F. Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noemi Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Ramiro Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo G. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.072 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnoldo Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florentino Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Miranda Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Paul Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Katherine Flores Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Flores III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irma F. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jeffery Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of Gilberto Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arminda Minerva F. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hermelinda F. Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Froilan Ramirez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guadalupe Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Romeo Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Baltazar Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?