UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 1.839 ACRES OFLAND, MORE OR LESS et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Magdalena Perez Craig, Viola Gloria Escalante Canales, Ruben Noe Trevino, Jr., Ameida Salinas, Laura Perez McGee, 1.839 ACRES OFLAND, MORE OR LESS, Olga Trevino Cantu, Venancio G. Rodriguez, III, Ben Guadalupe Rodriguez, Jr., Ernestina E. Bazan, Rene Morales, Reynaldo Perez, III, Ovidio Escalante, Thelma R. Perez, Miguel Jaime Rodriguez, Gloria Trevino Juarez, Linda Carmen Charles, Sylvia Morales Garza, Sonia Perez Nunnery, Roel Perez, Floridor Zamora, Homer Escalante, Catarina Perez Rose, Maria Nelda Villarreal, Isidro Morales, Rosario Perez Lewis, Arcadio Salinas, Eliza Perez, Claudia Perez Cummings, Saul Trevino, Jr., Mary Rose Escalante Rivera, Romero Morales and Noelia Trevino Herrera
Case Number: 7:2020cv00380
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY DEFENDANT MAGDALENA PEREZ CRAIG by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re #21 Notice of Disclaimer, #14 Notice of Disclaimer, #17 Notice of Disclaimer. Noelia Trevino Herrera (Heir of Hilda R. Trevino/Ruben N. Trevino), Saul Trevino, Jr. (Devisee of Saul Trevino, Sr.), Homer Escalante (Heir of Ambrosio Escalante/Lydia T. Escalante) and Sonia Perez Nunnery (Heir of Reynaldo Perez, Jr./Elida T. Perez) terminated. (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
January 20, 2021 Filing 30 Return of Service Unexecuted as to Claudia Perez Cummings re: Complaint in Condemnation, Notice of Condemnation, and Order Setting Initial Pretrial Conferece, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 20, 2021 Filing 29 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Magdalena Perez Craig served on 1/15/2021, answer due 2/5/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 19, 2021 Filing 28 Return of Service Unexecuted as to Floridor Zamora re: Complaint in Condemnation and Notice of Condemnation, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 19, 2021 Filing 27 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Miguel Jaime Rodriguez served on 1/16/2021, answer due 2/8/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 19, 2021 Filing 26 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Linda Carmen Charles served on 1/15/2021, answer due 2/5/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 19, 2021 Filing 25 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Gloria Trevino Juarez served on 1/16/2021, answer due 2/8/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 19, 2021 Filing 24 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Catarina Perez Rose served on 1/16/2021, answer due 2/8/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 19, 2021 Filing 23 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Ben Guadalupe Rodriguez, Jr. served on 1/18/2021, answer due 2/8/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 19, 2021 Filing 22 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Arcadio Salinas served on 1/16/2021, answer due 2/8/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 19, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY DEFENDANT SAUL TREVINO, JR. by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 19, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Saul Trevino, Jr. served on 1/19/2021, answer due 3/22/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 14, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ameida Salinas served on 1/14/2021, answer due 4/14/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 14, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(klopez, 7)
January 13, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY SONIA PEREZ NUNNERY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 13, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sonia Perez Nunnery served on 1/13/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 13, 2021 Filing 15 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Linda Carmen Charles, Isidro Morales, Rene Morales, Romero Morales, Sylvia Morales Garza, Eliza Perez, Reynaldo Perez, III, Roel Perez, Magdalena Perez Craig, Claudia Perez Cummings, Rosario Perez Lewis, Laura Perez McGee, Catarina Perez Rose, Miguel Jaime Rodriguez, Venancio G. Rodriguez, III, Ben Guadalupe Rodriguez, Jr., Arcadio Salinas, Olga Trevino Cantu, Gloria Trevino Juarez, Ruben Noe Trevino, Jr., Saul Trevino, Jr., Maria Nelda Villarreal, Floridor Zamora, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Ben G. Rodriguez, Jr., #2 Summons for Catarina P. Rose, #3 Summons for Claudia P. Cummings, #4 Summons for Eliza Perez, #5 Summons for Floridor Zamora, #6 Summons for Gloria T. Juarez, #7 Summons for Isidro Morales, #8 Summons for Laura P. McGee, #9 Summons for Linda C. Charles, #10 Summons for Magdalena P. Craig, #11 Summons for Maria N. Villarreal, #12 Summons for Miguel J. Rodriguez, #13 Summons for Olga T. Cantu, #14 Summons for Rene Morales, #15 Summons for Reynaldo Perez, III, #16 Summons for Roel Perez, #17 Summons for Romeo Morales, #18 Summons for Rosario P. Lewis, #19 Summons Ruben N. Trevino, Jr., #20 Summons for Saul Trevino, Jr., #21 Summons for Sylvia M. Garza, #22 Summons for Venancio G. Rodriguez, Jr.)(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMERS EXECUTED BY DEFENDANTS HOMER ESCALANTE AND NOELIA TREVINO HERRERA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 11, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Viola Gloria Escalante Canales served on 1/11/2021, answer due 3/12/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Noelia Trevino Herrera served on 1/11/2021, answer due 3/12/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 11, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Homer Escalante served on 1/11/2021, answer due 3/12/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Mary Rose Escalante Rivera served on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ernestina E. Bazan served on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
December 30, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ovidio Escalante served on 12/30/2020, answer due 3/1/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
December 30, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Thelma R. Perez served on 12/30/2020, answer due 3/1/2021, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Salazar, Baltazar)
December 7, 2020 Deposit made into the Registry of the Court by USA in the amount of $14,341.00, receipt number 21-00123, filed. (knguyen, 4)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 Clerk's Receipt, filed.(klopez, 7)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/16/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Notice)(Salazar, Baltazar)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of LOREN FLOSSMAN, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to DT)(Salazar, Baltazar)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Salazar, Baltazar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 1.839 ACRES OFLAND, MORE OR LESS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magdalena Perez Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viola Gloria Escalante Canales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Noe Trevino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameida Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Perez McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.839 ACRES OFLAND, MORE OR LESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olga Trevino Cantu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venancio G. Rodriguez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Guadalupe Rodriguez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernestina E. Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynaldo Perez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ovidio Escalante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thelma R. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Jaime Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Trevino Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Carmen Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Morales Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Perez Nunnery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roel Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floridor Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homer Escalante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catarina Perez Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Nelda Villarreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosario Perez Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcadio Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliza Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Perez Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saul Trevino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Rose Escalante Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romero Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noelia Trevino Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Baltazar Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?