UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 0.532 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Librado Encarnacion Perez, Candelaria Perez Ruiz, Ida Jimenez, Alfredo Ochoa Jr., Alonzo Alaniz, Martina Cobb, Jesse (Jesus) Barrera, Pablo Perez, III, Zulema Perez Torres, Felipa Alaniz, Alberto Alaniz, Yolanda Paderez, Rosalinda Perez Garza, Jose Alaniz, Jr., Eduardo Ochoa, Roberto Muniz, Rogelio Perez, Aida Maria Perez, Solia P Ramos, Unknown Heirs of Librado Perez, Maria Inez Perez Lopez, Alicia Perez Moreno, STARR COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTOR, AMEIDA SALINAS, Librado Perez, Raul Ochoa, The Unknown Heirs of Benjamin Perez, Jr., The Unknown Heirs of Arnold Araniz, Salvador Perez, Eduardo F. Perez, Michaela Crystal Perez, The Unknown Heirs of Leonel Perez, 0.532 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS, Benito Perez, Delfina Lopez, The Unknown Heirs of Bertha Serna, Marcos Muniz, Jr., Ubaldo Ochoa, Ana Maria Perez, Emma Vasquez, Leroy Ochoa, The Unknown Heirs of Elias Ochoa, Roman Ruben Perez, Aide P. Pena, Artemio Baldemar Perez, Adolfo Perez, Richard Ochoa, Librado D Perez, The Unknown Heirs of Jesus Angel Perez, Miguel Barrera, Jr., Luisa Perez Barrera, Ismael Casas, Jr., Juanita Perez Guerra, Rosa Perez Chapa, The Unknown Heirs of Miguel Perez, Christobal Hector Perez, Myra Trinidad Barrera, Patricia Barrera Rocha, Jose Luis Perez, The Unknown Heirs of Ninfa Muniz Garcia, Adriana P. Garza, Davy Trevino, Aracell P. Conway, The Unknown Heirs of Jose Olivarez Perez, Juanita P Rivas, Christian Abraham Perez, Ernesto Barron, Merlinda P. Hinojosa, Miguel A Perez, The Unknown Heirs of Eufracia Perez Gonzalez, Benjamin Perez, III, Mario Perez, Jaime Perez, The Unknown Heirs of Mary Lou Saldana, Baudelio Perez, Eli Roy Perez, Samuel Perez, Ismael Casas, III, Andrew Alaniz, The Unknown Heirs of Emily Torrez, Rosita Martinez, Aaron Barron, Ignacio Perez, Jr. and Estrella E. Perez Casas
Case Number: 7:2020cv00395
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY ROMAN RUBEN PEREZ, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
January 29, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY BAUDELIO PEREZ, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
January 27, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY SAMUEL PEREZ, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
January 27, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY JAIME PEREZ, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
January 27, 2021 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Estrella E. Perez Casas served on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
January 25, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY SALVADOR PEREZ, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
January 21, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY RAUL OCHOA, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
January 21, 2021 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Raul Ochoa served on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
January 21, 2021 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Librado Encarnacion Perez served on 1/19/2021, answer due 3/22/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
January 21, 2021 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Aida Maria Perez served on 1/18/2021, answer due 3/19/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re #40 Notice of Disclaimer. Librado D Perez terminated. (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
January 19, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY LIBRADO D. PEREZ, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
January 19, 2021 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Librado D Perez served on 1/8/2021, answer due 3/9/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
January 15, 2021 Filing 37 Summons Issued as to #36 Summons Requested. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
January 15, 2021 Filing 36 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Andrew Alaniz, Felipa Alaniz, Jose Alaniz, Jr., Jesse (Jesus) Barrera, Miguel Barrera, Jr., Aaron Barron, Ernesto Barron, Ismael Casas, III, Ismael Casas, Jr., Martina Cobb, Merlinda P. Hinojosa, Ida Jimenez, Delfina Lopez, Rosita Martinez, Roberto Muniz, Leroy Ochoa, Raul Ochoa, Richard Ochoa, Aida Maria Perez, Benito Perez, Christian Abraham Perez, Christobal Hector Perez, Jaime Perez, Librado D Perez, Librado Encarnacion Perez, Librado Perez, Mario Perez, Roman Ruben Perez, Estrella E. Perez Casas, Rosa Perez Chapa, Maria Inez Perez Lopez, Alicia Perez Moreno, Ignacio Perez, Jr., Solia P Ramos, Juanita P Rivas, Davy Trevino, Myra Trinidad Barrera, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons Aida Marie Perez, #2 Summons Alicia Perez Moreno, #3 Summons Andrew Alaniz, #4 Summons Benito Perez, #5 Summons Christian Abraham Perez, #6 Summons Christobal Hector Perez, #7 Summons Davy Trevino, #8 Summons Delfina Lopez, #9 Summons Ernesto Barron, #10 Summons Estella E. Perez Casas, #11 Summons Felipa Alaniz, #12 Summons Ida Jimenez, #13 Summons Ignacio Perez, Jr., #14 Summons Ismael Casas, III, #15 Summons Ismael Casas, Jr, #16 Summons Jaime Perez, #17 Summons Jesse (Jesus) Barrera, #18 Summons Jose Alaniz, Jr, #19 Summons Juanita P. Rivas, #20 Summons Leroy Ochoa, #21 Summons Librado D. Perez, #22 Summons Librado Encarnacion Perez, #23 Summons Librado Perez, #24 Summons Maria Inez Perez Lopez, #25 Summons Mario Perez, #26 Summons Martina Cobb, #27 Summons Merlinda P. Hinojosa, #28 Summons Miguel Barrera, Jr, #29 Summons Myra Trinidad Barrera, #30 Summons Raul Ochoa, #31 Summons Richard Ochoa, #32 Summons Roberto Muniz, #33 Summons Roman Ruben Perez, #34 Summons Rosa Perez Chapa, #35 Summons Rosalina Perez Garza, #36 Summons Rosita Martinez, #37 Summons Solia P. Ramos)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
January 13, 2021 Deposit made into the Registry of the Court by USA in the amount of $7,600.00, receipt number 21-00217, filed. (knguyen, 4)
January 13, 2021 Filing 38 Clerk's Receipt, filed.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Main Document 38 replaced on 1/19/2021) (JenniferNogueira, 7).
January 8, 2021 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Michaela Crystal Perez served on 1/4/2020, answer due 3/4/2020, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
January 6, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY MIGUEL A. PEREZ, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
January 6, 2021 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Benjamin Perez, III served on 12/28/2020, answer due 2/26/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
January 6, 2021 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Miguel A Perez served on 12/29/2020, answer due 3/1/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 30, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY EDUARDO F. PEREZ, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 30, 2020 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jose Luis Perez served on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/22/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 28, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY ZULEMA PEREZ TORRES, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 28, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY UBALDO OCHOA, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 28, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY EDUARDO OCHOA, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 28, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY ARACELL P. CONWAY, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 28, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY ANA MARIA PEREZ, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 28, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ubaldo Ochoa served on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/22/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 28, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Zulema Perez Torres served on 12/18/2020, answer due 2/16/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 28, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Eli Roy Perez served on 12/22/2020, answer due 2/22/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 28, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Eduardo Ochoa served on 12/18/2020, answer due 2/16/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 28, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Aracell P. Conway served on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 28, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ana Maria Perez served on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER regarding #15 Notice of Disclaimer. Adriana P. Garza terminated(Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER regarding #16 Notice of Disclaimer. Aide P. Pena terminated(Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7)
December 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY AIDE P. PENA, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 18, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY ADRIANA P. GARZA, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 18, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Aide P. Pena served on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 18, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Adriana P. Garza served on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY LUISA PEREZ BARRERA, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY JUANITA PEREZ GUERRA, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER EXECUTED BY CANDELARIA PEREZ RUIZ, INDIVIDUALLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Luisa Perez Barrera served on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Juanita Perez Guerra served on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 16, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Candelaria Perez Ruiz served on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to STARR COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTOR, AMEIDA SALINAS served on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/16/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Notice)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of LOREN FLOSSMAN, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to DT)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 0.532 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Librado Encarnacion Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candelaria Perez Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ida Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Ochoa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alonzo Alaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martina Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse (Jesus) Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo Perez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zulema Perez Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felipa Alaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Alaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Paderez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosalinda Perez Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Alaniz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogelio Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aida Maria Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solia P Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of Librado Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Inez Perez Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Perez Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STARR COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTOR, AMEIDA SALINAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Librado Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs of Benjamin Perez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs of Arnold Araniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo F. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michaela Crystal Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs of Leonel Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.532 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benito Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delfina Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs of Bertha Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcos Muniz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ubaldo Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Maria Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emma Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs of Elias Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Ruben Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aide P. Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artemio Baldemar Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adolfo Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Librado D Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs of Jesus Angel Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Barrera, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luisa Perez Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ismael Casas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita Perez Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Perez Chapa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs of Miguel Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christobal Hector Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myra Trinidad Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Barrera Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Luis Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs of Ninfa Muniz Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adriana P. Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davy Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aracell P. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs of Jose Olivarez Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita P Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Abraham Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernesto Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merlinda P. Hinojosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel A Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs of Eufracia Perez Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Perez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs of Mary Lou Saldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baudelio Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Roy Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ismael Casas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Alaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs of Emily Torrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosita Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ignacio Perez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estrella E. Perez Casas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Alexander Nishan DerGarabedian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?