UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 4.587 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: XAVIER THOMAS FARIAS, RICK CARLOS GARCIA, MARIA ELENA GOMEZ ESPINOZA, DALIA QUINTANILLA OBREGON, Luis Arnoldo Vela, Carla Gomez, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ALBERTO GOMEZ, JR., ROEL ELEAZAR GARCIA, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ARTURO VELA, ADELINA GOMEZ MCCULLEY, JOSE ADALBERTO VELA, ALLEN ZON, ADELITA GOMEZ WHITE, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF RIVA ALANA GARCIA KING, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF SONJA FARIAS BEAIRD, EDDIBERTO HUERTA, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ELIDA B VELA, JANIDA SEXTON, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF EDNA E. VIDALES, NILDA MOYA GARCIA, PRAXEDIS GARCIA, JR., UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ROBERTO BENAVIDES, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ALONSO ARTURO GOMEZ, SUZY GOMEZ, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ELEAZAR M. GARCIA, ARTURO IVAN VELA, ANNA MARIA AVIINA, NORMA MOYA CANTU, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF JOSE OVIDIO PENA, MARVIN MINK J., ROCKY ALAN GARCIA, CHARLENE RODRIGUEZ CUELLAR, ALBERTO ARTURO ROJAS, ISAURA D. BARRERA, YOLANDA ROJAS ALAMEDA, JOSE OVIDIO PENA, JR., THOMAS ALBERT GOMEZ, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF JOSE GUADALUPE VELA, GARY MINK, AMBER GARCIA, DAVID GARCIA, THOMAS WORELL GARCIA, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ARNOLDO VELA, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF JOSE DANIEL MOYA, TERRY ANN FARIAS VELASQUEZ, NOEMI MOYA VELASQUEZ, LYDIA GOMEZ GONZALEZ, CECILIO RICHARD BARRERA, MARIA LORENE PENA VILLARREAL, Luis Alberto Gomez, EDDIE GARCIA, JUANITA GOMEZ, CARLOS PENA, JR., ELISEO EMILIO M. GARCIA, AIDA GOMEZ MARTINEZ, ROBERTO PENA, JR., ROSA HILDA GOMEZ NAVARRO, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ALBERTO GOMEZ, III, Anna Belia Garcia, JOE HUERTA, JORGE LUIS PENA, RENE GARCIA HILBISH, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF CARLOS CESAR PENA, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ELOIZA MARQUEZ GARCIA, JOSE MOYA, RAMONA GARCIA PAPINEAU, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF XAVIER FARIAS, DAVID MOYA, CARMEN GOMEZ GUTIERREZ, LUIS M. GARCIA, STARR COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR, MARY BELINDA FARIAS, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ENRIQUE MARQUEZ GARCIA, JR., UNKNOWN HEIRS OF BELINDA OLVEDA HUERTA, ROBBIE J. FARIAS, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF LORENE SAENZ PENA, VERALYN FARIAS, OLIVIA AMERICA GARCIA, DARIELA QUINTANILLA MEZA, JAVIER ORLANDO PENA, DONALD HILL, JR., UNKNOWN HEIRS OF CARLOS GOMEZ, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF MARIA DE PILAR OLVEDA MOYA, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ALMA DELIA HUERTA, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF MARTHA GOMEZ, OLGA LYDIA VELA GONZALEZ, Jessica Gomez, IRMA M. PENA ALVAREZ, 4.587 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS, MARIA MARGARITA RODRIGUEZ, CARLOS QUINTANILLA, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ROSARIO GOMEZ, RICARDO OMAR PENA, EVA ELISA GARCIA PATTERSON, NOELIA MOYA GUERRERO, GLORIA PENA SMITH, TERESA A. HUERTA CALDERA, JASON GARCIA, MARIA ELENA DECAMP, FLORENTINO LUERA, JUDITH ODETTE PENA, ELVIA RAMOS VELA, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF JOHANA FARIAS FROSHAUER, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ELSA SAENZ SOLIS, MANUEL JOSE BARRERA, Melissa Gomez, ROEL HUERTA, FELIX GARCIA RODRIGUEZ, MILENA GOMEZ SANDOVAL, AIDA GRACIELA PENA GONZALEZ, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF SYLVIA PENA ZON, MICHAEL R. MCMILLION, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF DIANA QUINTANILLA GARCIA, HERIBERTO M. GARCIA, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ADOLFO GOMEZ, ANA AMINTA GOMEZ, HERON MOYA, ROBERTO O. HUERTA J., JO ODELL PENA and UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ELOISA GARCIA QUINTANILLA
Case Number: 7:2020cv00425
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 64 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to DAVID GARCIA served on 2/11/2021, answer due 4/12/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 11, 2021 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 10, 2021 Filing 62 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to JUDITH ODETTE PENA served on 2/10/2021, answer due 4/12/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 9, 2021 Filing 61 REPLY to #50 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, filed by FLORENTINO LUERA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(McGraw, Peter)
February 9, 2021 Filing 60 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jessica Gomez served on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 9, 2021 Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to JANIDA SEXTON served on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 9, 2021 Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ROEL ELEAZAR GARCIA served on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 9, 2021 Filing 57 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to JORGE LUIS PENA served on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 9, 2021 Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to AIDA GRACIELA PENA GONZALEZ served on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 4, 2021 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by FLORENTINO LUERA, filed.(McGraw, Peter)
February 3, 2021 Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to OLIVIA AMERICA GARCIA served on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 3, 2021 Filing 53 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to MARIA ELENA DECAMP served on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 3, 2021 Filing 52 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Anna Belia Garcia served on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 3, 2021 Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to SUZY GOMEZ served on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 2, 2021 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint and Declaration of Taking, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Concepcion, Hilda)
February 2, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 2, 2021 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ALBERTO ARTURO ROJAS served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 2, 2021 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Luis Arnoldo Vela served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 1, 2021 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to THOMAS WORELL GARCIA served on 2/1/2021, answer due 4/2/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 1, 2021 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to TERESA A. HUERTA CALDERA served on 2/1/2021, answer due 4/2/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 1, 2021 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to RICK CARLOS GARCIA served on 2/1/2021, answer due 4/2/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 1, 2021 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to RENE GARCIA HILBISH served on 2/1/2021, answer due 4/2/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 1, 2021 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to MARY BELINDA FARIAS served on 2/1/2021, answer due 4/2/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 1, 2021 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to JASON GARCIA served on 2/1/2021, answer due 4/2/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 1, 2021 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to AMBER GARCIA served on 2/1/2021, answer due 4/2/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
February 1, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER regarding #12 Motion Seeking Permission not to Serve. (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
January 27, 2021 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to MARIA MARGARITA RODRIGUEZ served on 1/27/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 27, 2021 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to MANUEL JOSE BARRERA served on 1/27/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 27, 2021 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to CHARLENE RODRIGUEZ CUELLAR served on 1/27/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to MICHAEL R. MCMILLION served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to EDDIE GARCIA served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to YOLANDA ROJAS ALAMEDA served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to RAMONA GARCIA PAPINEAU served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to MARVIN MINK J. served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to LUIS M. GARCIA served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Carla Gomez served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ISAURA D. BARRERA served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to IRMA M. PENA ALVAREZ served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to HERON MOYA served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to GARY MINK served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to FLORENTINO LUERA served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to FELIX GARCIA RODRIGUEZ served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to EDDIBERTO HUERTA served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to DONALD HILL, JR. served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to DARIELA QUINTANILLA MEZA served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to DALIA QUINTANILLA OBREGON served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to CECILIO RICHARD BARRERA served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to CARMEN GOMEZ GUTIERREZ served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to CARLOS QUINTANILLA served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ANNA MARIA AVIINA served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ALLEN ZON served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
January 22, 2021 Filing 12 Opposed MOTION under Rule 5(c) Seeking Permission Not to Serve Pleadings on Numerous Defendants by FLORENTINO LUERA, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(McGraw, Peter)
January 13, 2021 Deposit made into the Registry of the Court by USA in the amount of $21,874.00, receipt number 21-00210, filed. (knguyen, 4)
January 13, 2021 Filing 11 Clerk's Receipt, filed.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
January 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint and Declaration of Taking by FLORENTINO LUERA, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(McGraw, Peter)
January 13, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FLORENTINO LUERA, filed.(McGraw, Peter)
January 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter McGraw on behalf of FLORENTINO LUERA, filed. (McGraw, Peter)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Notice of Disclaimer, STARR COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR terminated(Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Concepcion, Hilda)
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Concepcion, Hilda)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/16/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Notice)(Concepcion, Hilda)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of LOREN FLOSSMAN, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to DT)(Concepcion, Hilda)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Concepcion, Hilda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 4.587 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XAVIER THOMAS FARIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICK CARLOS GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA ELENA GOMEZ ESPINOZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DALIA QUINTANILLA OBREGON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Arnoldo Vela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ALBERTO GOMEZ, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROEL ELEAZAR GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ARTURO VELA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADELINA GOMEZ MCCULLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE ADALBERTO VELA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEN ZON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADELITA GOMEZ WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF RIVA ALANA GARCIA KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF SONJA FARIAS BEAIRD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDDIBERTO HUERTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ELIDA B VELA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANIDA SEXTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF EDNA E. VIDALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NILDA MOYA GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRAXEDIS GARCIA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ROBERTO BENAVIDES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ALONSO ARTURO GOMEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUZY GOMEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ELEAZAR M. GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTURO IVAN VELA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNA MARIA AVIINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORMA MOYA CANTU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF JOSE OVIDIO PENA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARVIN MINK J.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKY ALAN GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLENE RODRIGUEZ CUELLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERTO ARTURO ROJAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISAURA D. BARRERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YOLANDA ROJAS ALAMEDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE OVIDIO PENA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS ALBERT GOMEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF JOSE GUADALUPE VELA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY MINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBER GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS WORELL GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ARNOLDO VELA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF JOSE DANIEL MOYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY ANN FARIAS VELASQUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOEMI MOYA VELASQUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYDIA GOMEZ GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CECILIO RICHARD BARRERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA LORENE PENA VILLARREAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Alberto Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDDIE GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUANITA GOMEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLOS PENA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELISEO EMILIO M. GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIDA GOMEZ MARTINEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERTO PENA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSA HILDA GOMEZ NAVARRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ALBERTO GOMEZ, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Belia Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE HUERTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORGE LUIS PENA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENE GARCIA HILBISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF CARLOS CESAR PENA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ELOIZA MARQUEZ GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE MOYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMONA GARCIA PAPINEAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF XAVIER FARIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID MOYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARMEN GOMEZ GUTIERREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS M. GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STARR COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY BELINDA FARIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ENRIQUE MARQUEZ GARCIA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF BELINDA OLVEDA HUERTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBBIE J. FARIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF LORENE SAENZ PENA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERALYN FARIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLIVIA AMERICA GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARIELA QUINTANILLA MEZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAVIER ORLANDO PENA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD HILL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF CARLOS GOMEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF MARIA DE PILAR OLVEDA MOYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ALMA DELIA HUERTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF MARTHA GOMEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLGA LYDIA VELA GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRMA M. PENA ALVAREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.587 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA MARGARITA RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLOS QUINTANILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ROSARIO GOMEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICARDO OMAR PENA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVA ELISA GARCIA PATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOELIA MOYA GUERRERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLORIA PENA SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERESA A. HUERTA CALDERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA ELENA DECAMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORENTINO LUERA
Represented By: Peter Eammon McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDITH ODETTE PENA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELVIA RAMOS VELA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF JOHANA FARIAS FROSHAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ELSA SAENZ SOLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANUEL JOSE BARRERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROEL HUERTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FELIX GARCIA RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILENA GOMEZ SANDOVAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIDA GRACIELA PENA GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF SYLVIA PENA ZON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL R. MCMILLION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF DIANA QUINTANILLA GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERIBERTO M. GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ADOLFO GOMEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANA AMINTA GOMEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERON MOYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERTO O. HUERTA J.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JO ODELL PENA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ELOISA GARCIA QUINTANILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Hilda M Garcia Concepcion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?