Leal v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Amada Leal
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Case Number: 7:2021cv00107
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Referring Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Amada Leal, filed. (Wilson, Chad)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: #10 Notice (Other) (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
May 13, 2021 Filing 10 *STRICKEN BY #11 ORDER NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Allstate Indemnity Company, filed. (Inman, Sara) Modified on 5/14/2021 (klopez, 7).
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (Deft Expert Report due by 11/1/2021, Discovery due by 12/1/2021, Dispositive Motion Filing due by 12/22/2021, Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/21/2022, Pltf Expert Report due by 9/16/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez), (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
May 4, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Allstate Indemnity Company, filed.(Inman, Sara)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Amada Leal, filed.(Wilson, Chad)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/18/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa recused. Case reassigned to Judge Micaela Alvarez for all further proceedings. (Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara E. Inman on behalf of Allstate Indemnity Company, filed. (Inman, Sara)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allstate Indemnity Company, filed.(Egeland, Susan)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 464th Hidalgo County, case number C-0609-21-L (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26160825) filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Egeland, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leal v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Sara E. Inman
Represented By: Susan E Egeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amada Leal
Represented By: Chad Troy Wilson
Represented By: Amanda Jean Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?