Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Reign Nightclub, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media
Defendant: Reign Nightclub, LLC d/b/a Reign Nightclub and Ernesto A. Guajardo
Case Number: 7:2021cv00469
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Clerks ENTRY OF DEFAULT against Reign Nightclub, LLC (by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPINION AND ORDER re #10 Request for Entry of Default (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST for Entry of Default against Reign Nightclub, LLC by Innovative Sports Management, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default)(King, Jamie)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Reign Nightclub, LLC served on 12/17/2021, answer due 1/7/2022, filed.(King, Jamie)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference (Initial Conference reset for 3/21/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez) (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Innovative Sports Management, Inc., filed.(King, Jamie)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Innovative Sports Management, Inc., filed.(King, Jamie)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Innovative Sports Management, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(King, Jamie)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(klopez, 7)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez (by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(King, Jamie)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27447409) filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Reign Nightclub, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reign Nightclub, LLC d/b/a Reign Nightclub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernesto A. Guajardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?