Relyant Global, LLC v. Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Relyant Global, LLC
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2022cv00153
Filed: May 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Filing 21 Joint JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Relyant Global, LLC, filed.(Caldwell, Brent)
July 7, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, filed.(Heady, Eugene)
July 7, 2022 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, filed.(Heady, Eugene)
July 6, 2022 Filing 18 DESIGNATION of James H. Price as attorney in charge of Relyant Global, LLC, filed.(Caldwell, Brent)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for James H. Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7)
July 1, 2022 Filing 16 Opposed MOTION to Stay the Litigation (pending arbitration) by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Motion, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Motion, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Heady, Eugene)
July 1, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Answer, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Answer)(Heady, Eugene)
July 1, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for James H. Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Relyant Global, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2022. (Franz, Michael)
June 23, 2022 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Heady, Eugene)
June 23, 2022 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America identifying Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Heady, Eugene)
June 22, 2022 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022, filed.(Franz, Michael)
June 22, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022, filed.(Franz, Michael)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint. (Answer due by 7/6/2022 )(Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
June 21, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Heady, Eugene)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER regarding #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
May 26, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Michael R. Franz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Relyant Global, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/16/2022. (Caldwell, Brent)
May 26, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Relyant Global, LLC, filed.(Caldwell, Brent)
May 13, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/19/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
May 12, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Summons to Liberty Mutual)(Caldwell, Brent)
May 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Relyant Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #7 Continuation Attachment to Civil Coversheet)(Caldwell, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Relyant Global, LLC v. Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Relyant Global, LLC
Represented By: Brent Taylor Caldwell
Represented By: James H. Price
Represented By: Matthew John Prebeg
Represented By: Michael R. Franz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Represented By: Eugene Joseph Heady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Eugene Joseph Heady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?