Ortiz v. AutoZoners LLC
Plaintiff: Manuel Angel Ortiz
Defendant: AutoZoners LLC
Case Number: 7:2023cv00324
Filed: September 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16, F.R.C.P. SCHEDULING ORDER. Motion for Extension of Time due by 4/5/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 5/16/2024 Discovery due by 5/6/2024. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 5/16/2024. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 5/16/2024. Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/29/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2024 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa. (Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
November 7, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa. INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/7/2023. Case called on the docket. All parties attended. No pending motions. The Court issued a Docket Control Order (6 months). Appearances: Tracy Elizabeth Kern, Jaime Arturo Saenz, Daniel E Vargas.(ERO: Antonio Tijerina), filed.(KathrynNelson, 7)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Tracy E. Kern to Appear as Remotely at Initial Conference (by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(KathrynNelson, 7)
October 30, 2023 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Tracy E. Kern to Appear as Remotely at Initial Conference by AutoZoners LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Unopposed Order)(Kern, Tracy)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/7/2023 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(KathrynNelson, 7)
October 25, 2023 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by AutoZoners LLC, filed.(Kern, Tracy)
October 13, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by AutoZoners LLC, filed.(Kern, Tracy)
October 9, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Manuel Angel Ortiz, filed.(Vargas, Daniel)
September 29, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AutoZoners LLC, filed.(Kern, Tracy)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead. Answer due by 10/13/2023.(Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
September 28, 2023 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead by AutoZoners LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Motion Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Plead)(Kern, Tracy)
September 27, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime A. Saenz on behalf of AutoZoners LLC, filed. (Saenz, Jaime)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/8/2023 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
September 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the County Court at Law No. 6, Hidalgo County, Texas, case number CL-23-3418-F (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30553725) filed by AutoZoners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #4 Exhibit Served Citation, #5 Exhibit Notice to the District Clerk of Fiiling of Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit List of All Counsel of Record, #7 Exhibit Index of Documents Filed)(Saenz, Jaime)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. AutoZoners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Angel Ortiz
Represented By: Daniel E Vargas
Represented By: Lisa Yvette Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZoners LLC
Represented By: Jaime Arturo Saenz
Represented By: Teri L Danish
Represented By: Tracy Elizabeth Kern
Represented By: Jacob Jude Pritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?