Cano et al v. Selene Finance LP et al
Plaintiff: Michael Cano and Marina Cano
Defendant: Selene Finance LP, U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Owner Trustee for RCF 2 Acquisition Trust, Connie Cobb, Codilis & Moody, P.C. and Servicelink Agency Sales and Posting, LLC
Intervenor: Seer Labs, LLC
Case Number: 7:2023cv00332
Filed: September 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Peter Bray
Referring Judge: Drew B Tipton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of No Response to re: #11 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Seer Labs, LLC, filed. (Laguna, Jeana)
November 16, 2023 Filing 15 STATEMENT Disclosure by Servicelink Agency Sales and Posting, LLC, filed.(Brewer, Gregory)
November 9, 2023 Filing 14 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Amanda A Catlin as to Servicelink Agency Sales and Posting, LLC re: #7 Order for Initial Conference and Disclosure,, filed. Address updated and Order re-sent via regular mail. (KarenLLopez, 7).
November 1, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of No Response re: #6 MOTION for Judgment Judgment by Servicelink Agency Sales and Posting, LLC, filed. (Brewer, Gregory)
October 23, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Selene Finance LP, U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Owner Trustee for RCF 2 Acquisition Trust, filed. (Sanders, Jason)
October 23, 2023 Filing 11 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motions referred to Peter Bray. by Seer Labs, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Laguna, Jeana)
October 23, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by Seer Labs, LLC, filed.(Laguna, Jeana)
October 23, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeana Rae Laguna on behalf of Seer Labs, LLC, filed. (Laguna, Jeana)
October 23, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Marina Cano, Michael Cano, filed.(Rodriguez, Francisco)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/7/2023 at 10:45 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(JasonMarchand, 4)
October 10, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Judgment JudgmentMotions referred to Peter Bray. by Servicelink Agency Sales and Posting, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2023. (Hakari, Robert)
October 9, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Hakari on behalf of Servicelink Agency Sales and Posting, LLC, filed. (Hakari, Robert)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) Parties notified.(KelliePapaioannou, 2)
October 2, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Amended Certificate of Service re: #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Selene Finance LP, U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Owner Trustee for RCF 2 Acquisition Trust, filed. (Sanders, Jason)
September 30, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Selene Finance LP, U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Owner Trustee for RCF 2 Acquisition Trust identifying U.S. Bancorp as Corporate Parent, filed.(Sanders, Jason)
September 28, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 275th District Court of Hidalgo County, case number C-2085-22-E (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30586592) filed by Selene Finance LP, U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Owner Trustee for RCF 2 Acquisition Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit A-1 Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-2 22-06-06 Plaintiffs' Original Petition, App for Ex-Parte TRO & TI, #4 Exhibit A-3 22-06-07 TRO, #5 Exhibit A-4 22-06-07 Order of Referral to Pre-Hearing ADR, #6 Exhibit A-5 22-06-13 ROS for Citation - Connie Cobb, #7 Exhibit A-6 22-06-20 ROS for Citation - Selene Finance, #8 Exhibit A-7 22-06-21 ROS for Citation - U.S. Bank Trust NA, #9 Exhibit A-8 22-06-22 Defendant ServiceLink's Original Answer, #10 Exhibit A-9 22-07-06 Plea in Intervention, #11 Exhibit A-10 22-07-13 Defendants' Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #12 Exhibit A-11 22-07-15 Order Extending TRO, #13 Exhibit A-12 22-07-18 Application for Temporary Injunction, #14 Exhibit A-13 22-08-03 Order Setting Hearing on Intervenor's TI on 9-1-22 (with Plaintiff's TI Hearing), #15 Exhibit A-14 22-08-22 Plaintiffs' Answer to Plea in Intervention and Counterclaim, #16 Exhibit A-15 22-08-23 Plaintiffs' First Amended Original Petition and Application for Ex-Parte TRO and TI, #17 Exhibit A-16 22-09-08 Order Resetting Hearing on Intervenor's App for TI (1-31-23 at 9 AM), #18 Exhibit A-17 22-10-19 Order Resetting Hearing on Intervenor's Application for Temp Injunction, #19 Exhibit A-18 22-11-01 Order Setting Hearing on TRO & TI (11-15-22 at 9 AM), #20 Exhibit A-19 22-11-03 Order Requiring Deposit of Money into Registry of Court, #21 Exhibit A-20 23-02-15 Order Setting Status Hearing, #22 Exhibit A-21 23-02-23 Order Setting Hearing on 3-21-23, #23 Exhibit A-22 23-03-31 Order Granting & Denying Temp Injunctions, #24 Exhibit A-23 23-04-17 Order Setting Docket Control Conference, #25 Exhibit A-24 23-05-04 Order Setting Emergency Motion for Writ of Possession-set for 5-09-23 at 9 AM, #26 Exhibit A-25 23-06-01 Order Resetting Docket Control Conference, #27 Exhibit A-26 23-06-26 Order Setting Hearing for Motion for Enforcement and Contempt, #28 Exhibit A-27 23-06-28 Order Resetting Docket Control Conference, #29 Exhibit A-28 23-07-21 ROS for Citation to Appear -Marina Cano, #30 Exhibit A-29 23-07-21 ROS for Citation to Appear - Michael Cano, #31 Exhibit A-30 23-08-15 Order Granting Enforcement of Temporary Injunction-Ps must vacate by 8-29-23, #32 Exhibit A-31 23-08-29 Plaintiffs' 2nd Amended Petition & App for Ex-Parte TRO & TI, #33 Exhibit B List of All Counsel of Record, #34 Exhibit C Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanders, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cano et al v. Selene Finance LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cano
Represented By: Francisco Javier Rodriguez
Represented By: Jared Andrew Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Cano
Represented By: Francisco Javier Rodriguez
Represented By: Jared Andrew Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Finance LP
Represented By: Jason Levi Sanders
Represented By: Caroline Elizabeth Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Owner Trustee for RCF 2 Acquisition Trust
Represented By: Jason Levi Sanders
Represented By: Caroline Elizabeth Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Codilis & Moody, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servicelink Agency Sales and Posting, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Todd Brewer
Represented By: Robert Brandon Hakari
Represented By: Amanda A Catlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Seer Labs, LLC
Represented By: Keith Clark Livesay
Represented By: Jeana Rae Laguna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?