Immunocept, LLC, et al v. Fulbright & Jaworski Featured Case
Plaintiff: Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee and James Reese Matson
Defendant: Fulbright & Jaworski, Limited Legal Partnership
Case Number: 1:2005cv00334
Filed: May 6, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
County: Travis
Presiding Judge: Sam Sparks
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER FROM U.S. COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT.... (mh, ) Modified on 12/13/2007 (mh, ).
November 20, 2007 Filing 132 FEDERAL CIRCUIT JUDGMENT ISSUED AS A MANDATE Affirming District Court Judgment re: 120 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the USCA for the FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson. (jk, )
November 9, 2007 Filing 131 Certified U.S. COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER the 130 mandate issued in error and is hereby RECALLED.. Signed by Jan Horbaly, Clerk(mh, )
November 7, 2007 Filing 130 Certified copy of judgment from the UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT COURT JUDGMENT - Affirming the District Court's decision... ISSUED AS MANDATE: November 5, 2007 by Jan Horbaly, Clerk. (mh, )
October 19, 2007 Filing 129 FEDERAL USCA MANDATE Affirming District Court re: 120 Notice of Appeal filed by James Reese Matson, Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee.(jk, )
July 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDERED that the Bill of Costs, as amended, is Fifty Thousand Two Hundred Seventeen and 11/100 Dollars ($50,217.11). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
July 18, 2006 Filing 127 RESPONSE to 126 Objection to Bill of Costs by Fulbright & Jaworski, Limited Legal Partnership. (dm, )
July 13, 2006 Filing 126 Objection to 125 Bill of Costs by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson. (dm, )
June 7, 2006 Filing 125 BILL OF COSTS by Fulbright & Jaworski, Limited Legal Partnership. (Attachments NOT Available Electronically). (dm, )
June 5, 2006 Filing 124 Fed Cicuit USCA Appeal Info Sheet/Notice of Docketing received. USCA Case Number USCA case number 2006-1432 for 120 Notice of Appeal filed by Immunocept, LLC,, Patrice Anne Lee,, James Reese Matson,. (jk, )
May 30, 2006 Filing 123 TRANSCRIPT NOT REQUESTED by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson (jk, )
May 24, 2006 Filing 122 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 385806 re 120 Notice of Appeal filed by Immunocept, LLC,, Patrice Anne Lee,, James Reese Matson, (jk, )
May 23, 2006 Filing 121 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the FEDERAL CIRCUIT re 120 Notice of Appeal (jk, )
May 22, 2006 Filing 120 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the USCA for the FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson. (jk, )
May 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER denying 109 Motion to Amend Judgment Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
April 20, 2006 Filing 118 Objections by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson to [110-1] (dm)
April 20, 2006 Filing 117 Reply by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson to response to motion to alter or amend judgment [109-1] (dm)
April 13, 2006 Filing 116 Objections by Fulbright & Jaworski to [110-1] (dm)
April 13, 2006 Filing 115 Response by Fulbright & Jaworski motion to alter or amend judgment [109-1] (dm)
April 12, 2006 Filing 114 Ordered that the motion and the appenix to exclude the testimonty of James Reese Matson shall be filed under seal. signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
April 12, 2006 Filing 113 Order granting motion to seal plaintiffs' reply brief in support of motin for the legal interpretation of certain claim language [105-1] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
April 12, 2006 Filing 112 Order granting motion to seal plaintiffs' reply brief in support of plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment [104-1] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
April 7, 2006 Filing 111 Notice to Supplement filed by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson Re: motion to alter or amend judgment [109-1] (dm)
April 7, 2006 Filing 110 Appendix for motion to alter or amend judgment [109-1] by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson (dm)
April 7, 2006 Filing 109 Motion by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson to alter or amend judgment (dm)
March 27, 2006 Filing 108 Ordered that defendant Fulbright & Jaworski LLP's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and appendix shall be filed under seal. signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
March 27, 2006 Filing 107 Ordered that plaintiffs' response and appendix to Fulbright's motion to exclude the testimony of Rinaldo Bellomo shall be filed under seal. signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
March 27, 2006 Filing 106 Ordered, adjudged, and decreed that plaintiffs' motion for leave to file response to Fulbright's motion to exclude the testimony of Rinaldo Bellomo exceeding page limits, is granted. signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
March 27, 2006 Filing 105 Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski to seal plaintiffs' reply brief in support of motin for the legal interpretation of certain claim language (dm)
March 27, 2006 Filing 104 Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski to seal plaintiffs' reply brief in support of plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment (dm)
March 24, 2006 Case closed (dm)
March 24, 2006 Filing 103 Judgment, it is ordered, adjudged, and decreed that plaintifs Immunocept, LLC Patrice Anne Lee, and James Reese Matson take nothing in this cause against defendant, and that all costs of suit are taxed against plaintiffs for which let execution issue. signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (Pages: 1) (dm)
March 24, 2006 Filing 102 Order granting motion for summary judgment SEALED [50-1] It is futher ordered that any and all other pending motions are Dimissed as Moot. signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
March 24, 2006 Filing 101 SEALED Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski to esclude the testimony of James Reese Matson (dm)
March 24, 2006 Filing 100 Revised preliminary proposed trial Exhibit list by Fulbright & Jaworski (dm)
March 24, 2006 Filing 99 Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski to seal motion to exclude the testimony of James Reese Matson (dm)
March 24, 2006 Filing 98 Motion by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson for special setting April 17, 2006 (dm)
March 24, 2006 Filing 97 Order granting motion to exceed page limit for its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment [93-1] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
March 23, 2006 Filing 96 Objections to and Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski to strike plaintiffs' appendix and exhibits to their response to defendant's motion for summary judgment (dm)
March 23, 2006 Filing 95 Response and appendix by Fulbright & Jaworski motion to compel testimony, responses to interrogatories, and responses to requests for production regarding Fulbright's net worth [75-1] (dm)
March 23, 2006 Filing 94 SEALED Reply by Fulbright & Jaworski in support of motion for summary judgment and appendix to and exhibits to reply in support of motion for summary judgment. SEALED [50-1] (dm)
March 23, 2006 Filing 93 Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski to exceed page limit for its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment (dm)
March 23, 2006 Filing 92 Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski to seal defendant Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP's reply of its motion for summary judgment (dm)
March 22, 2006 Filing 91 Transcript filed for dates of February 10, 2006 (Proceedings Transcribed: Status Conference) (Court Reporter: Lily Reznik) (dm)
March 22, 2006 Filing 90 SEALED Appendix for document(s) [89-1] by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson (dm)
March 22, 2006 Filing 89 Sealed document, Plaintiffs' response to Fulbright & Jaworski's motion to exclude the testimony of Rinaldo Bellomo, placed under seal (dm)
March 22, 2006 Filing 88 Motion by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson for leave to file response to Fulbright's motion to exclude the testimony of Rinaldo Bellomo exceeding page limits (dm)
March 22, 2006 Filing 87 Motion by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson to seal Plaintiffs' response to Fulbright's motion to exclude the testimony of Rinaldo Bellomo (dm)
March 22, 2006 Letter/Correspondence regarding: pro hac vice for Jeremy Fielding (dm)
March 22, 2006 Filing 86 SEALED Appendix for reply brief [85-1] by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson (dm)
March 22, 2006 Filing 85 Reply brief in support of motion for the legal interpretation of certain claim language (dm)
March 22, 2006 Filing 84 SEALED Appendix for reply brief [83-1] by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson (dm)
March 22, 2006 Filing 83 Reply brief in support of plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment (dm)
March 20, 2006 Filing 82 Order denying motion to compel testimony of Sarah Brashears [18-1] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
March 14, 2006 Filing 81 Order granting motion to seal plaintiffs' response to Fulbright' motion for summary judgment and the appendix thereto [76-1] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
March 14, 2006 Filing 80 Order granting motion for leave to file response to Fulbright's motion for summary judgment exceeding page limits [77-1] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
March 13, 2006 Filing 79 SEALED Appendix for document(s) [78-1] by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson (dm)
March 13, 2006 Filing 78 Sealed document, Plaintiffs' response to Fulbright's motion for summary judgment, placed under seal (dm)
March 13, 2006 Filing 77 Motion by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson for leave to file response to Fulbright's motion for summary judgment exceeding page limits (dm)
March 13, 2006 Filing 76 Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski to seal plaintiffs' response to Fulbright' motion for summary judgment and the appendix thereto (dm)
March 13, 2006 Filing 75 Motion by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson to compel testimony, responses to interrogatories, and responses to requests for production regarding Fulbright's net worth (dm)
March 13, 2006 Filing 74 Amended Certificate of service by Fulbright & Jaworski (dm)
March 13, 2006 Filing 73 Plaintiffs' Reply brief in support of its objections to defendant's proposed expert testimony of John R. Kirk (dm)
March 10, 2006 Filing 72 Response by Fulbright & Jaworski in support of motion to exclude the testimony of Alan MacPherson [38-1] (dm)
March 10, 2006 Filing 71 Response by Fulbright & Jaworski motion for judgment concerning the legal interpretation of certain claim language [57-1], motion for partial summary judgment [54-1] (dm)
March 9, 2006 Filing 70 Order granting motion to file under seal the motion to exclude testimony of Rinaldo Bellomo and the appendix [65-1] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
March 8, 2006 Filing 69 Response by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson motion to exclude Martha Feldman's testimony [49-1] (dm)
March 8, 2006 Filing 68 Reply by Fulbright & Jaworski to response to motion to compel plaintiffs to permit questioning of Thomas R. Felger and R. Darryl Burke [42-1] (dm)
March 6, 2006 Filing 67 Sealed document, Defendant Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP's Appendix to motion to exclude the testimony of Rinaldo Bellomo placed under seal (dm)
March 6, 2006 Filing 66 Sealed Motion to exclude the testimony of Rinaldo Bellomo by Fulbright & Jaworski SEALED (dm)
March 6, 2006 Filing 65 Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski to file under seal the motion to exclude testimony of Rinaldo Bellomo (dm)
March 6, 2006 Filing 64 Order granting motion for leave to file under seal the affidavit of Sarah Brashears filed Ex Parte under seal for in camera review [52-1] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
March 1, 2006 Filing 63 Order granting motion to exceed page limit for motion for summary judgment [48-1] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
March 1, 2006 Filing 62 Order granting motion to file under seal motion for summary judgment [47-1] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
February 28, 2006 Filing 61 Response by Fulbright & Jaworski motion to exclude the testimony of John R. Kirk [45-1] (dm)
February 27, 2006 Filing 60 Response by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson in opposition to motion to exclude the testimony of Alan MacPherson [38-1] (dm)
February 24, 2006 Filing 59 Response by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson motion SEALED [36-1] (dm)
February 24, 2006 Filing 58 Appendix for motion for judgment concerning the legal interpretation of certain claim language [57-1] by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson (dm)
February 24, 2006 Filing 57 Motion by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson for judgment concerning the legal interpretation of certain claim language (dm)
February 24, 2006 Filing 56 Appendix for motion response [55-1] by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson (dm)
February 24, 2006 Filing 55 Response by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson motion to compel plaintiffs to permit questioning of Thomas R. Felger and R. Darryl Burke [42-1] (dm)
February 24, 2006 Filing 54 Motion by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson for partial summary judgment (dm)
February 23, 2006 Filing 53 Sealed document, Defendant Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP's Submission of the affidavit of Sarah Brashears filed ex parte under seal for in camera review placed under seal (dm)
February 23, 2006 Filing 52 Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski for leave to file under seal the affidavit of Sarah Brashears filed Ex Parte under seal for in camera review (dm)
February 21, 2006 Filing 51 Notice of attorney appearance for Fulbright & Jaworski by Geoff A. Gannaway (dm)
February 21, 2006 Filing 50 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment and exhibits by Fulbright & Jaworski SEALED (dm)
February 21, 2006 Filing 49 Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski to exclude Martha Feldman's testimony (dm)
February 21, 2006 Filing 48 Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski to exceed page limit for motion for summary judgment (dm)
February 21, 2006 Filing 47 Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski to file under seal motion for summary judgment (dm) Modified on 02/22/2006
February 15, 2006 Filing 46 Appendix in support of motion to exclude the testimony of John R. Kirk [45-1] by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson (dm)
February 15, 2006 Filing 45 Motion by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson to exclude the testimony of John R. Kirk (dm)
February 13, 2006 Filing 44 Ordered that the case remains set for docket call on March 31, 2006 at 11:00am, with a jury trial in the month of April 2006, and each side shall be allowed eighteen (18) hours in trial.. signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
February 10, 2006 Filing 43 Minutes of proceedings for Status Conference conducted on February 10, 2006 by Judge Sparks. Court Reporter: Lily Reznik (dm)
February 10, 2006 Status conference held, all parties requested by counsel. Statements from counsel heard. Parties stipulate to 7 jurors, 4 peremptories with stipulation of a verdict down to 6. 18 hours perside. Consents or non-consents. Daubert motions to be heard at trial outside the presence of the jury. Plaintiffs' motion to compel granted. Ms. Brashear required to answer questions under oath. File sealed affidavit in camera, ex parte. (dm)
February 10, 2006 Filing 42 Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski to compel plaintiffs to permit questioning of Thomas R. Felger and R. Darryl Burke (dm)
February 8, 2006 Filing 41 Order granting motion to seal the motion to exclude testimony of James E. Malackowski and the supplement thereto [35-1] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
February 7, 2006 Filing 40 Objections by Fulbright & Jaworski to exhibits list [29-1] (dm)
February 7, 2006 Filing 39 Proposed Exhibit list by Fulbright & Jaworski (dm)
February 7, 2006 Filing 38 Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski to exclude the testimony of Alan MacPherson (dm)
February 6, 2006 Filing 37 Sealed document, Defendant Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP'S supplement to its motion to exclude the testimony of James E. Malackowski and motion for consideration of same, placed under seal (dm)
February 6, 2006 Filing 36 Sealed Motion to exclude the testimony of James E. Malackowski by Fulbright & Jaworski SEALED (dm)
February 6, 2006 Filing 35 Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski to seal the motion to exclude testimony of James E. Malackowski and the supplement thereto (dm)
February 6, 2006 Filing 34 Order granting motion for Constance H. Pfeiffer to appear pro hac vice [33-1] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
February 2, 2006 Pro hac vice fee paid byConstance H. Pfeiffer with Amount: $ 25.00 Receipt # 384250 (mh)
February 2, 2006 Filing 33 Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski for Constance H. Pfeiffer to appear pro hac vice (dm)
January 30, 2006 Filing 32 Order granting motion for protective order [25-1], granting motion to compel deposition of plaintiffs' expert witnesses [25-2], granting motion for modification of scheduling order [25-3] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
January 30, 2006 Filing 31 Response by Fulbright & Jaworski to plaintiffs' subpoena deces tecum directed to John R. Kirk, Jr. (dm)
January 27, 2006 Filing 30 Order granting motion for Jeffrey M. Golub to appear pro hac vice [27-1] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (td)
January 26, 2006 Filing 29 Exhibit list by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson (td)
January 25, 2006 Pro hac vice fee paid byJeff M. Golub with Amount: $ 25.00 Receipt # 384118 (mh)
January 25, 2006 Tele-conference held in chambers w/o Court Reporter/transcription of record. (td)
January 25, 2006 Filing 28 Minutes of proceedings for Teleconference conducted on 1/25/06 by Judge Sparks. Court Reporter: None (td) Modified on 01/26/2006
January 25, 2006 Filing 27 Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski for Jeffrey M. Golub to appear pro hac vice (dm)
January 25, 2006 Filing 26 Supplement filed by Immunocept, LLC Re: motion for protective order [25-1], motion to compel deposition of plaintiffs' expert witnesses [25-2], motion for modification of scheduling order [25-3] (dm)
January 24, 2006 Filing 25 Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski for protective order , or alternatively to compel deposition of plaintiffs' expert witnesses , or alternatively for modification of scheduling order (dm)
January 17, 2006 Filing 24 Order set status conference at 2:30 2/10/06 signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
January 13, 2006 Filing 23 Supplemental Response by Fulbright & Jaworski motion to compel testimony of Sarah Brashears [18-1] (dm)
January 10, 2006 Filing 22 Reply by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson to response to motion to compel testimony of Sarah Brashears [18-1] (dm)
January 10, 2006 Filing 21 Notice of filing of initial disclosures by Fulbright & Jaworski (dm)
December 27, 2005 Filing 20 Response by Fulbright & Jaworski motion to compel testimony of Sarah Brashears [18-1] (dm)
December 20, 2005 Filing 19 Designation of expert witness filed by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson (dm)
December 15, 2005 Filing 18 Motion by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson to compel testimony of Sarah Brashears (dm)
December 6, 2005 Filing 17 Preliminary Witness List by Fulbright & Jaworski (dm)
November 7, 2005 Filing 16 Order granting motion for protective order [12-1]. It is further ordered that the plaintiffs shall have no discovery regarding Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP's net worth, pending further application to and order of this Court. signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
October 24, 2005 Filing 15 Order granting joint motion for protective order [13-1] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
October 24, 2005 Filing 14 Ordered that any documents the parties wish to file under seal must be accompanied by a motion to seal. signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
October 20, 2005 Filing 13 Joint motion by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson, Fulbright & Jaworski for protective order (dm)
October 12, 2005 Filing 12 Motion by Fulbright & Jaworski for protective order (dm)
October 5, 2005 Filing 11 Order granting motion for Bruce Barker to appear pro hac vice [9-1] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
October 3, 2005 Pro hac vice fee paid byBruce Barker with Amount: $ 25.00 Receipt # 382608 (dm)
October 3, 2005 Filing 10 Alternate Dispute Resolution Report filed by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson, Fulbright & Jaworski, Party(s) agree to Alternate Dispute Resolution (dm)
October 3, 2005 Filing 9 Motion by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson for Bruce Barker to appear pro hac vice (dm)
September 30, 2005 Filing 8 Order granting motion for Bernard Chao to appear pro hac vice [7-1] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
September 29, 2005 Pro hac vice fee paid byBernard Chao with Amount: $ 25.00 Receipt # 382555 (dm)
September 29, 2005 Filing 7 Motion by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson for Bernard Chao to appear pro hac vice (dm)
August 15, 2005 Letter/Correspondence submitted by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson regarding: attorney Michael P. Lynn on vacation from 3/24/06 to 04/02/06 (mh)
August 4, 2005 Filing 6 Scheduling order setting Joining of parties, amending of pleadings on 12/15/05 Deadline for filing of all motions 2/20/06 Discovery cutoff 2/13/06 ; Docket Call set for 11:00 3/31/06 ; and trial in the month of April 2006 ; Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 10/3/05 , termed motions signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
July 29, 2005 Filing 5 Joint report regarding scheduling by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson, Fulbright & Jaworski (dm)
June 15, 2005 Filing 4 Order that the parties confer and submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration by August 9, 2005. Signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (dm)
June 10, 2005 Filing 3 Answer and affirmative defenses by Fulbright & Jaworski (dm)
May 31, 2005 Filing 2 Amended complaint by Immunocept, LLC, Patrice Anne Lee, James Reese Matson , amending complaint [1-1] (Pages: 8) (dm)
May 13, 2005 Summons issued for Fulbright & Jaworski (dm)
May 12, 2005 Summons issued for Fulbright & Jaworski (tdk)
May 10, 2005 Court file prepared and forwarded to Judge Sparks (tdk)
May 6, 2005 Filing 1 Complaint filed. Filing Fee: $ 250.00 Receipt # 380536 ) (tdk)
May 6, 2005 AO 120 forwarded to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (tdk)
May 6, 2005 Case assigned to Honorable Sam Sparks (tdk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Immunocept, LLC, et al v. Fulbright & Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immunocept, LLC
Represented By: John Volney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Anne Lee
Represented By: John Volney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Reese Matson
Represented By: John Volney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulbright & Jaworski, Limited Legal Partnership
Represented By: Constance H. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?