Fisher v. State of Texas et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Abigail Noel Fisher and Rachel Multer Michalewicz
Defendant: State of Texas, University of Texas at Austin, Mark G. Yudof, David B. Pryor, Barry D. Burgdorf, William Powers, Jr., Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr., H. Scott Caven, Jr., James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker and Kenneth I. Shine
Petitioner: Chad Stanton, Black Student Alliance, Anthony D. Williams, Ariel Cecil Barrett, Devon Robertson, Trenton Stanton, Eric Tre Stanton, Sarah Cortez, Lawrence Longoria, Jr., Nathan Bunch and Longhorn League of United Latin American Citizens
Case Number: 1:2008cv00263
Filed: April 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Fort Bend
Presiding Judge: Sam Sparks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2016 Filing 142 Certified copy of United States Supreme Court JUDGMENT/MANDATE Affirming the decision of the District Court re: #141 Writ of Certiorari to the Supreme Court. (klw)
June 29, 2015 Filing 141 WRIT OF CERTIORARI Issued by US Supreme Court re #119 Notice of Appeal. (klw)
November 21, 2014 Filing 140 Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE Affirming the decision of the District Court re: #119 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Cover Letter)(klw)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER of USCA that the motion of Appellant Abigail Noel Fisher to file supplemental briefs is DENIED re #119 Notice of Appeal. (klw)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER of USCA DENYING request for rehearing en banc re #119 Notice of Appeal. (klw)
September 5, 2012 Filing 137 Acknowledgement Receipt for Record on Appeal by U.S. Supreme Court. re #136 Appeal Record Transmitted. (dm, )
July 27, 2012 Filing 136 Transmitted Record on Appeal to United States Supreme Court re #119 Notice of Appeal. The record consists of 9 Volume of the Electronic Record onAppeal; 3 Volumes of Transcripts (dkt 56, 58 & 118); 1 Envelope of COPIES of SEALED Documents (52 & 54). (klw, )
July 25, 2012 Filing 135 Letter from the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals directing the District Court to forward the record on appeal to the Supreme Court of the United States. (klw, )
February 27, 2012 Filing 134 The Petition for a Writ of Certiorari is GRANTED re #119 Notice of Appeal. (klw, )
August 10, 2011 Filing 133 EXHIBIT RECEIPT by University of Texas at Austin, Bruce Walker, et al. (mh, )
July 29, 2011 EXHIBITS DESTROYED for John W. Barnhill, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, William Powers, Jr, David B. Pryor, Robert B. Rowling, Kenneth I. Shine, University of Texas at Austin, Bruce Walker. (mh, )
July 28, 2011 Filing 132 EXHIBIT RECEIPT by John W. Barnhill, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, Barry D. Burgdorf, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, William Powers, Jr, David B. Pryor, Robert B. Rowling, Kenneth I. Shine, University of Texas at Austin, Bruce Walker. (mh, )
July 26, 2011 Filing 131 Exhibit Letter to John W. Barnhill, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James D. Dannenbaum, Abigail Noel Fisher, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Rachel Multer Michalewicz, William Powers, Jr, David B. Pryor, Robert B. Rowling, Kenneth I. Shine, University of Texas at Austin, Bruce Walker, Mark G. Yudof instructing parties to pick up their exhibits. (mh, )
July 25, 2011 Filing 130 Appeal Record Returned/Disposed by USCA: (mh, )
June 23, 2011 Filing 129 Letter of transmittal from USCA received for #119 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Rachel Multer Michalewicz. (mh, )
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER of USCA (certified copy) regarding Petition for Rehearing En Banc ; re #119 Notice of Appeal,, (mh, )
June 23, 2011 Filing 127 Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE Affirming THE JUDGMENT OF THE DISTRICT COURT, in re #119 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Rachel Multer Michalewicz. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(mh, )
April 5, 2010 Filing 126 Acknowledgement Receipt for Record on Appeal by USCA-5TH. re #125 Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA (mh, )
March 25, 2010 Filing 125 Certified and transmitted Supplemental Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #119 Notice of Appeal. (jk, )
January 22, 2010 Filing 124 Acknowledgement Receipt for Record on Appeal by Joseph D. Hughes. re #123 Appeal Record Transmitted (mh, )
January 21, 2010 Filing 123 Transmitted Record on Appeal to Mr. Joseph D. Hughes. re #119 Notice of Appeal,, (mh, )
January 21, 2010 Filing 122 REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED RECORD ON APPEAL filed by Mr. Joseph D. Hughes. (mh, )
October 14, 2009 NOTICE OF CERTIFIED RECORD ON APPEAL SENT TO USCA VIA EMAIL in re 119 Notice of Appeal,, (mh, )
October 14, 2009 NOTICE OF CERTIFIED RECORD ON APPEAL SENT TO USCA VIA EMAIL in re #119 Notice of Appeal,, (mh, )
September 28, 2009 Filing 121 USCA Appeal Info Sheet received. USCA Case Number 09-50822 for #119 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Rachel Multer Michalewicz. (jk, )
September 25, 2009 Filing 120 TRANSCRIPT NOT REQUESTED - ALREADY ON FILE IN THE CLERK'S OFFICE filed by Rachel Multer Michalewicz (mh, )
September 14, 2009 Filing 119 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Rachel Multer Michalewicz. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 100003678. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 10 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out #Form DKT-13 (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (mh, )
September 1, 2009 Filing 118 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on June 12, 2009, Proceedings Transcribed: All Pending Matters. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: (512)916-5564. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 9/22/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2009. (Reznik, Lily)
August 17, 2009 Filing 117 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mm5)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING #104 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief; DENYING #94 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; GRANTING #96 Motion for Summary Judgment, and the Court GRANTS summary judgment in favor of all Defendants on all claims; GRANTING #115 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Suzzette Rodriguez Hurley. FINALLY ORDERED that all pending motions are DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mm5)
June 29, 2009 Filing 115 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Suzzette Rodriguez Hurley by Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz. (Terrill, Paul)
June 22, 2009 Filing 114 BRIEF regarding #113 Brief, by Abigail Noel Fisher LETTER to the Hon. Sam Sparks. (Hurley, Suzzette)
June 17, 2009 Filing 113 BRIEF by David B. Pryor, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, Kenneth I. Shine, University of Texas at Austin LETTER to the Honorable Sam Sparks. (Ho, James)
June 12, 2009 Filing 112 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Hearing on All Pending Matters held on 6/12/2009 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(mm5, )
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER. ALL PENDING MATTERS reset for 6/12/2009 09:30 AM before Judge Sam Sparks. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mm5, )
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER. ALL PENDING MATTERS set for 5/27/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Sam Sparks. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mm5, )
April 24, 2009 Filing 109 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #107 Response to Motion, by Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz. (Terrill, Paul)
April 24, 2009 Filing 108 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #107 Response to Motion, (mm5, )
April 24, 2009 Filing 107 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz, re #104 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief Out of Time by David Hinojosa. filed by Movant Lawrence Longoria, Jr., Movant Nathan Bunch, Movant Longhorn League of United Latin American Citizens (Terrill, Paul)
April 16, 2009 Filing 106 Letter/Correspondence dated 4/176/09 to Judge Sam Sparks from Attorney James C. Ho for Defendants Barry D. Burgdorf, William Powers, Jr, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, Kenneth I. Shine, University of Texas at Austin re scheduling of oral argument. (mm5, )
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING #101 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joshua Civin. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mm5, )
April 14, 2009 Filing 104 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief Out of Time by David Hinojosa. by Lawrence Longoria, Jr, Nathan Bunch, Longhorn League of United Latin American Citizens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Amici Curiae Breif in Support of Defendants, #2 Exhibit B- Exhibits to Amici Curiae Breif in Support of Defendants, #3 Proposed Order)(Hinojosa, David)
April 13, 2009 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Joshua Civin; Filing fee $ 25.00, receipt number 100001942. (mm5, )
April 13, 2009 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Joshua Civin; Filing fee $ 25.00, receipt number 100001942. (mm5, )
April 13, 2009 Filing 103 BRIEF by Chad Stanton, Black Student Alliance, Anthony D. Williams, Ariel Cecil Barrett, Devon Robertson, Trenton Stanton, Eric Tre Stanton (Amicus Brief of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., et al.). (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index to Appendix, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Appendix C)(Thomas, Holly)
April 13, 2009 Filing 102 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by David B. Pryor, Barry D. Burgdorf, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, Kenneth I. Shine, University of Texas at Austin, re #96 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Opposition of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant William Powers, Jr., Defendant Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, Defendant Kenneth I. Shine, Defendant University of Texas at Austin, Defendant Printice L. Gary, Defendant Bruce Walker, Defendant Paul Foster, Defendant H. Scott Caven, Jr., Defendant David B. Pryor, Defendant Janiece Longoria, Defendant Colleen McHugh, Defendant James D. Dannenbaum, Defendant John W. Barnhill, Jr., Defendant James R. Huffines, Defendant Robert B. Rowling (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Ho, James)
April 13, 2009 Filing 101 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joshua Civin ( Filing fee $ 25.00 receipt number 100001942) by on behalf of Chad Stanton, Black Student Alliance, Anthony D. Williams, Ariel Cecil Barrett, Devon Robertson, Trenton Stanton, Eric Tre Stanton. (mm5, )
March 27, 2009 Notice of Correction: re #98 Reply to Response to Motion; #99 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion. ***Docket entries modified to correct links to motions, correct event (#99) and to include additional filing party. In the future, ensure that ALL filing parties are selected. Also, please note that a reply should only be linked to a motion, NOT the response and the motion.*** (mm5, )
March 27, 2009 Notice of Correction: re 98 Reply to Response to Motion; 99 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion. ***Docket entries modified to correct links to motions, correct event (#99) and to include additional filing party. In the future, ensure that ALL filing parties are selected. Also, please note that a reply should only be linked to a motion, NOT the response and the motion.*** (mm5, )
March 27, 2009 Filing 100 APPENDIX by Abigail Noel Fisher Attachments to Docket No. 98. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Hurley, Suzzette)
March 27, 2009 Filing 99 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion, filed by Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz, re #96 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Opposition of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant William Powers, Jr., Defendant Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, Defendant Kenneth I. Shine, Defendant University of Texas at Austin, Defendant Printice L. Gary, Defendant Bruce Walker, Defendant Paul Foster, Defendant H. Scott Caven, Jr., Defendant David B. Pryor, Defendant Janiece Longoria, Defendant Colleen McHugh, Defendant James D. Dannenbaum, Defendant John W. Barnhill, Jr., Defendant James R. Huffines, Defendant Robert B. Rowling (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Hurley, Suzzette) Modified on 3/30/2009 to correct document link (mm5, ). Modified on 3/30/2009 to include additional filer and correct event (mm5, ).
March 27, 2009 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz; re #94 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Abigail Noel Fisher, Plaintiff Rachel Multer Michalewicz, (Hurley, Suzzette) Modified on 3/30/2009 to include additional filing party (mm5, ). Modified on 3/30/2009 to correct document link (mm5, ).
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING #95 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by David Rybicki. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mm5)
February 23, 2009 Filing 96 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Opposition of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by David B. Pryor, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, Kenneth I. Shine, University of Texas at Austin. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit Tab 1 to Appendix, #4 Exhibit TAB 2 to the Appendix, #5 Exhibit TAB 3 - to the Appendix, #6 Exhibit TAB 4 - to the Appendix, #7 Exhibit TAB 5 - to the Appendix, #8 Affidavit TAB 6 - to the Appendix, #9 Affidavit TAB 7 -to the Appendix, #10 Affidavit TAB 8 - to the Appendix, #11 Affidavit TAB 9 - to the Appendix, #12 Affidavit TAB 10 - to the Appendix, #13 Affidavit TAB 11 - to the Appendix, #14 Proposed Order)(Ho, James)
February 19, 2009 Filing 95 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney David Rybicki by Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz. (Terrill, Paul)
January 23, 2009 Filing 94 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Appendix, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Errata 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32)(Terrill, Paul)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING #92 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mm5)
January 8, 2009 Filing 92 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz. (Hurley, Suzzette)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING #90 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order dated July 10, 2008. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mm5)
December 18, 2008 Filing 90 Joint MOTION to AMEND Scheduling Order by David B. Pryor, Barry D. Burgdorf, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, Kenneth I. Shine, University of Texas at Austin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time on SJ)(Kneeland, Mishell) Modified on 12/18/2008 to correct event type and correct filing parties. (mm5).
December 18, 2008 Notice of Correction: re 90 MOTION to Amend. ***Docket entry modified to reflect correct event (type of motion) and correct filing parties.*** (mm5)
December 18, 2008 Notice of Correction: re #90 MOTION to Amend. ***Docket entry modified to reflect correct event (type of motion) and correct filing parties.*** (mm5)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING #88 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Marina Grayson. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mm5)
October 16, 2008 Filing 88 * MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Marina Grayson, former Assistant Attorney General by David B. Pryor, Barry D. Burgdorf, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, Kenneth I. Shine, University of Texas at Austin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(Grayson, Mariana)
August 22, 2008 Filing 87 ANSWER to #85 Second Amended Complaint, by David B. Pryor, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, Kenneth I. Shine, University of Texas at Austin.(mm5)
August 15, 2008 Filing 86 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by David B. Pryor, Barry D. Burgdorf, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, Kenneth I. Shine, University of Texas at Austin. (Kneeland, Mishell)
August 15, 2008 Notice of Correction: re #86 Advisory to the Court. ***The Court requires a Motion to Withdraw with Proposed Order in order to remove an attorney from a case.*** (mm5)
August 15, 2008 Notice of Correction: re 86 Advisory to the Court. ***The Court requires a Motion to Withdraw with Proposed Order in order to remove an attorney from a case.*** (mm5)
August 13, 2008 Filing 85 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against David B. Pryor, Barry D. Burgdorf, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, Kenneth I. Shine, University of Texas at Austin amending #1 Complaint; #30 Amended Complaint, filed by Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz.(mm5)
August 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING #82 Motion to Substitute Party. Kenneth I. Shine rep by Mariana Grayson, James C. Ho, Mishell B. Kneeland added. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mm5)
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING #61 Motion for Leave to File; DENYING #63 Motion to Intervene; DENYING #72 Motion to Intervene... Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mm5)
August 11, 2008 Filing 82 *CORRECTED MOTION to Substitute Party and Correct Style of Case by David B. Pryor, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, University of Texas at Austin, Mark G. Yudof. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to sub Parties and Correct Style of Case, #2 Proposed Order on Corrected Motion to Substitute and Correct)(Kneeland, Mishell)
August 8, 2008 Filing 81 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #80 * MOTION to Substitute Party - Dr. Kenneth I. Shine for Defendant Mark G. Yudof * MOTION to Amend/Correct Style of Case (mm5)
August 7, 2008 Filing 80 * MOTION to Substitute Party - Dr. Kenneth I. Shine for Defendant Mark G. Yudof, * MOTION to Amend/Correct Style of Case by David B. Pryor, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, University of Texas at Austin, Mark G. Yudof. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Substitute Party and Correct Style, #2 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party and Correct Style)(Kneeland, Mishell)
August 6, 2008 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Joshua D. Katz; Filing fee $ 25.00, receipt number 428700. (mm5)
August 6, 2008 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Joshua D. Katz; Filing fee $ 25.00, receipt number 428700. (mm5)
August 5, 2008 Filing 78 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #76 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz. (Terrill, Paul)
August 5, 2008 Filing 77 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #76 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, (jk, )
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING #74 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mm5)
August 4, 2008 Filing 76 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz, re #72 MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Lawrence Longoria, Jr., Movant Nathan Bunch, Movant Longhorn League of United Latin American Citizens, Movant Sarah Cortez, #63 MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Eric Tre Stanton, Movant Trenton Stanton, Movant Devon Robertson, Movant Ariel Cecil Barrett, Movant Black Student Alliance, Movant Anthony D. Williams, Movant Chad Stanton (Attachments: #1 Supplement Hopwood, 1994 WL 242362)(Terrill, Paul)
July 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING #73 Motion for Leave to Extend Page Limits. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mm5)
July 30, 2008 Filing 74 * MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Payton on behalf of Chad Stanton, Black Student Alliance, Anthony D. Williams, Ariel Cecil Barrett, Devon Robertson, Trenton Stanton, Eric Tre Stanton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mm5)
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING #64 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (td, )
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING #67 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (td, )
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING #66 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (td, )
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING #65 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (td, )
July 25, 2008 Filing 73 * MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation re motion to intervene by Sarah Cortez, Lawrence Longoria, Jr, Nathan Bunch, Longhorn League of United Latin American Citizens. (mc2, )
July 25, 2008 Filing 72 MOTION to Intervene as defendants and memorandum in support by Sarah Cortez, Lawrence Longoria, Jr, Nathan Bunch, Longhorn League of United Latin American Citizens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(mc2, )
July 24, 2008 Filing 67 * MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Debo Adegbile on behalf of Chad Stanton, Black Student Alliance, Anthony D. Williams, Ariel Cecil Barrett, Devon Robertson, Trenton Stanton, Eric Tre Stanton. (mc2, )
July 24, 2008 Filing 66 * MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anurima Bhargava on behalf of Chad Stanton, Black Student Alliance, Anthony D. Williams, Ariel Cecil Barrett, Devon Robertson, Trenton Stanton, Eric Tre Stanton. (mc2, )
July 24, 2008 Filing 65 * MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Holly A. Thomas on behalf of Chad Stanton, Black Student Alliance, Anthony D. Williams, Ariel Cecil Barrett, Devon Robertson, Trenton Stanton, Eric Tre Stanton. (mc2, )
July 24, 2008 Filing 64 * MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation re motion to intervene by Chad Stanton, Black Student Alliance, Anthony D. Williams, Ariel Cecil Barrett, Devon Robertson, Trenton Stanton, Eric Tre Stanton. (mc2, )
July 23, 2008 Filing 63 MOTION to Intervene by Chad Stanton, Black Student Alliance, Anthony D. Williams, Ariel Cecil Barrett, Devon Robertson, Trenton Stanton, Eric Tre Stanton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mc2, )
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Sam Sparks. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldm)
July 22, 2008 Text Order GRANTING 62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Sam Sparks. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldm)
July 17, 2008 Filing 62 * MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul M. Terrill for Joshua D. Katz by on behalf of Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz. (Terrill, Paul)
July 14, 2008 Filing 61 * MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Terrill, Paul)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/14/2008. Discovery due by 10/3/2008. Joinder of Parties due by 7/14/2008. Motions due by 2/2/2009.. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk, )
July 7, 2008 Filing 59 Proposed Scheduling Order (Joint Proposed Scheduling Order) by David B. Pryor, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, Abigail Noel Fisher, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, Rachel Multer Michalewicz, University of Texas at Austin, Mark G. Yudof. (Kneeland, Mishell)
June 23, 2008 Filing 58 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on May 19, 2008, Proceedings Transcribed: Amended Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: (512)916-5564. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 7/14/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2008. (Reznik, Lily)
May 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING [] Motion for Preliminary Injunction; MOOTING #29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mc2, )
May 28, 2008 Notice of Correction: re #55 Order, Order Sealing Document, #54 Letter Brief. Corrected these docket entries to specify plaintiffs instead of defendants. (mc2, )
May 28, 2008 Notice of Correction: re 55 Order, Order Sealing Document, 54 Letter Brief. Corrected these docket entries to specify plaintiffs instead of defendants. (mc2, )
May 23, 2008 Filing 56 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on May 19, 2007, Proceedings Transcribed: Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: (512)916-5564. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 6/13/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2008. (Reznik, Lily)
May 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re #54 SEALED Letter Brief with attachments, filed by plaintiffs Fisher and Michalewicz. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mc2, ) Modified on 5/28/2008 to delete text (mc2, ).
May 22, 2008 Filing 54 SEALED Letter Brief by Abigail Fisher, Rachel Michalewicz. (Documents are not available electronically.) (mc2, ) Modified on 5/28/2008 to correct filers (mc2, ). (klw, ).
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER sealing re #52 Sealed Letter Brief, filed by William Powers, Jr., Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, University of Texas at Austin, Mark G. Yudof, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, Paul Foster, H. Scott Caven, Jr., David B. Pryor, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, James D. Dannenbaum, John W. Barnhill, Jr., James R. Huffines, Robert B. Rowling. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mc2, )
May 20, 2008 Filing 52 SEALED Letter Brief with attachments re: #48 Motion Hearing, by David B. Pryor, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, University of Texas at Austin, Mark G. Yudof.(Document is not available electronically.) (mc2, ) (klw, ).
May 19, 2008 Filing 51 Exhibit List from 5/19/08 preliminary injunction hearing. (mc2, )
May 19, 2008 Filing 50 Exhibit List from 5/19/08 preliminary injunction hearing. (mc2, )
May 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re #43 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mc2, )
May 19, 2008 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Motion Hearing held on 5/19/2008 re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Abigail Noel Fisher, #29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Abigail Noel Fisher (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(mc2, )
May 19, 2008 EXHIBITS from preliminary injunction hearing (placed in exhibit room) by David B. Pryor, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, University of Texas at Austin, Mark G. Yudof.. (mc2, )
May 15, 2008 Filing 47 Exhibit List for Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by David B. Pryor, Barry D. Burgdorf, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, State of Texas, University of Texas at Austin, Mark G. Yudof.. (Ho, James)
May 15, 2008 Filing 46 AMENDED ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint, by David B. Pryor, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, University of Texas at Austin, Mark G. Yudof. (jg3, )
May 14, 2008 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz, re #29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Abigail Noel Fisher (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Terrill, Paul)
May 8, 2008 Filing 44 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint, by David B. Pryor, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, University of Texas at Austin, Mark G. Yudof.(jg3, )
May 8, 2008 Filing 43 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz Notice of Dismissal of Defendants the State of Texas and Barry Burgdorf (Terrill, Paul)
May 5, 2008 Filing 42 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by David B. Pryor, Barry D. Burgdorf, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, State of Texas, University of Texas at Austin, Mark G. Yudof, re #29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Abigail Noel Fisher (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lavergne affidavit, #2 Affidavit Roeckle Bus. Records Affidavit, #3 Affidavit Ishop Affidavit, #4 Affidavit Roeckle Gen Affidavit, #5 Affidavit Frederick Affidavit, #6 Affidavit Orr Affidavit, #7 Affidavit Vincent Affidavit-part 1, #8 Affidavit Vincent Affidavit-part 2, #9 Proposed Order Order)(Ho, James)
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING re #39 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Defts response due on/before 05/05/08... plaintiff's reply, if any, due no later than 05/14/08.... Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jg3, )
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING #39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction... due on/before May 9, 2008.... Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jg3, )
April 25, 2008 Notice of Correction: re #40 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Order #40 refers to Original Motion #37 . Order #41 grants AMENDED Motion #39 . (jg3, )
April 25, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines: answer/ Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction due 5/9/2008. (jg3, )
April 25, 2008 Notice of Correction: re 40 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Order #40 refers to Original Motion 37 . Order 41 grants AMENDED Motion 39 . (jg3, )
April 24, 2008 Filing 39 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by David B. Pryor, Barry D. Burgdorf, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, State of Texas, University of Texas at Austin, Mark G. Yudof. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Amended Motion for Extension of Time)(Kneeland, Mishell)
April 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER, Set Motion Hearing for MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ( Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2008 09:30 AM before Judge Sam Sparks.) ORDER plaintiff shall immediately advise the defts of this setting ans shall immediately serve a copy of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction.... Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jg3, )
April 22, 2008 Filing 37 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #29 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by David B. Pryor, Barry D. Burgdorf, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, State of Texas, University of Texas at Austin, Mark G. Yudof. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Kneeland, Mishell) Modified on 4/23/2008 to create link (dm, ).
April 21, 2008 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz Corrected Certificate of Service #29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Terrill, Paul)
April 21, 2008 Filing 35 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Atty Paul M. Terrill: re #33 Certificate of Service (jg3, )
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING #28 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (td)
April 18, 2008 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz Corrected Certificate of Service #29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Terrill, Paul)
April 18, 2008 Filing 32 SUPPLEMENT to #30 Amended Complaint, by Abigail Noel Fisher, Rachel Multer Michalewicz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D)(Terrill, Paul)
April 18, 2008 Filing 31 Summons Reissued as to David B. Pryor, Barry D. Burgdorf, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, State of Texas, University of Texas at Austin, Mark G. Yudof. (mc2, )
April 17, 2008 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against David B. Pryor, Barry D. Burgdorf, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, State of Texas, University of Texas at Austin, Mark G. Yudof amending #1 Complaint., filed by Rachel Multer Michalewicz, Abigail Noel Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mc2, )
April 17, 2008 Filing 29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Abigail Noel Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Terrill, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit R, #23 Exhibit R, #24 Exhibit S, #25 Exhibit T, #26 Exhibit U, #27 Exhibit V)(Terrill, Paul)
April 17, 2008 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Abigail Noel Fisher. (Terrill, Paul)
April 11, 2008 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abigail Noel Fisher. Mark G. Yudof served on 4/10/2008, answer due 4/30/2008. (Terrill, Paul)
April 11, 2008 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abigail Noel Fisher. Bruce Walker served on 4/8/2008, answer due 4/28/2008. (Terrill, Paul)
April 11, 2008 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abigail Noel Fisher. University of Texas at Austin served on 4/8/2008, answer due 4/28/2008. (Terrill, Paul)
April 11, 2008 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abigail Noel Fisher. State of Texas served on 4/8/2008, answer due 4/28/2008. (Terrill, Paul)
April 11, 2008 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abigail Noel Fisher. Robert B. Rowling served on 4/8/2008, answer due 4/28/2008. (Terrill, Paul)
April 11, 2008 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abigail Noel Fisher. David B. Pryor served on 4/8/2008, answer due 4/28/2008. (Terrill, Paul)
April 11, 2008 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abigail Noel Fisher. William Powers, Jr served on 4/8/2008, answer due 4/28/2008. (Terrill, Paul)
April 11, 2008 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abigail Noel Fisher. Colleen McHugh served on 4/8/2008, answer due 4/28/2008. (Terrill, Paul)
April 11, 2008 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abigail Noel Fisher. Janiece Longoria served on 4/8/2008, answer due 4/28/2008. (Terrill, Paul)
April 11, 2008 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abigail Noel Fisher. James R. Huffines served on 4/8/2008, answer due 4/28/2008. (Terrill, Paul)
April 11, 2008 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abigail Noel Fisher. Printice L. Gary served on 4/8/2008, answer due 4/28/2008. (Terrill, Paul)
April 11, 2008 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abigail Noel Fisher. Paul Foster served on 4/8/2008, answer due 4/28/2008. (Terrill, Paul)
April 11, 2008 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abigail Noel Fisher. James D. Dannenbaum served on 4/8/2008, answer due 4/28/2008. (Terrill, Paul)
April 11, 2008 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abigail Noel Fisher. H. Scott Caven, Jr served on 4/8/2008, answer due 4/28/2008. (Terrill, Paul)
April 11, 2008 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abigail Noel Fisher. Barry D. Burgdorf served on 4/8/2008, answer due 4/28/2008. (Terrill, Paul)
April 11, 2008 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abigail Noel Fisher. Board of Regents of the Texas State University System served on 4/8/2008, answer due 4/28/2008. (Terrill, Paul)
April 11, 2008 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abigail Noel Fisher. John W. Barnhill, Jr served on 4/8/2008, answer due 4/28/2008. (Terrill, Paul)
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Rein) Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jg3, )
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (McCarthy) Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jg3, )
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Hurley) Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jg3, )
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Rybicki) Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jg3, )
April 7, 2008 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Suzzette Rodriguez Hurley, receipt #416144; Thomas R. McCarthy, receipt # 416143, Bert W. Rein, receipt #416142; David C. Rybicki, receipt #416145; Filing fee $ 25. (jg3, )
April 7, 2008 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Suzzette Rodriguez Hurley, receipt #416144; Thomas R. McCarthy, receipt # 416143, Bert W. Rein, receipt #416142; David C. Rybicki, receipt #416145; Filing fee $ 25. (jg3, )
April 7, 2008 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to David B. Pryor, Barry D. Burgdorf, William Powers, Jr, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W. Barnhill, Jr, H. Scott Caven, Jr, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert B. Rowling, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Bruce Walker, State of Texas, University of Texas at Austin, Mark G. Yudof. (mm5)
April 7, 2008 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Suzzette Rodriguez Hurley on behalf of Abigail Noel Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mm5)
April 7, 2008 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas R. McCarthy on behalf of Abigail Noel Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mm5)
April 7, 2008 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bert W. Rein on behalf of Abigail Noel Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mm5)
April 7, 2008 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David C. Rybicki on behalf of Abigail Noel Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mm5)
April 7, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and MOTION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT (Filing fee $ 350.00; receipt number 416146), filed by Abigail Noel Fisher. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A; # 2 Civil Cover Sheet & copy of receipt)(mm5)
April 7, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and MOTION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT (Filing fee $ 350.00; receipt number 416146), filed by Abigail Noel Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A; #2 Civil Cover Sheet & copy of receipt)(mm5)
April 7, 2008 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; and MOTION for Permanent Injunction; contained within #1 COMPLAINT; by Abigail Noel Fisher. (mm5)
April 7, 2008 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; and MOTION for Permanent Injunction; contained within 1 COMPLAINT; by Abigail Noel Fisher. (mm5)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. State of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Noel Fisher
Represented By: Bert W. Rein
Represented By: David C. Rybicki
Represented By: Joshua D. Katz
Represented By: Paul M. Terrill
Represented By: Suzzette Rodriguez Hurley
Represented By: Thomas R. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Multer Michalewicz
Represented By: Bert W. Rein
Represented By: David C. Rybicki
Represented By: Joshua D. Katz
Represented By: Paul M. Terrill
Represented By: Suzzette Rodriguez Hurley
Represented By: Thomas R. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Represented By: James C. Ho
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Texas at Austin
Represented By: James C. Ho
Represented By: Mariana Grayson
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark G. Yudof
Represented By: James C. Ho
Represented By: Mariana Grayson
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Pryor
Represented By: James C. Ho
Represented By: Mariana Grayson
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry D. Burgdorf
Represented By: James C. Ho
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powers, Jr.
Represented By: James C. Ho
Represented By: Mariana Grayson
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the Texas State University System
Represented By: James C. Ho
Represented By: Mariana Grayson
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Barnhill, Jr.
Represented By: James C. Ho
Represented By: Mariana Grayson
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Scott Caven, Jr.
Represented By: James C. Ho
Represented By: Mariana Grayson
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Huffines
Represented By: James C. Ho
Represented By: Mariana Grayson
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janiece Longoria
Represented By: James C. Ho
Represented By: Mariana Grayson
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen McHugh
Represented By: James C. Ho
Represented By: Mariana Grayson
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert B. Rowling
Represented By: James C. Ho
Represented By: Mariana Grayson
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Dannenbaum
Represented By: James C. Ho
Represented By: Mariana Grayson
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Foster
Represented By: James C. Ho
Represented By: Mariana Grayson
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Printice L. Gary
Represented By: James C. Ho
Represented By: Mariana Grayson
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Walker
Represented By: James C. Ho
Represented By: Mariana Grayson
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth I. Shine
Represented By: James C. Ho
Represented By: Mariana Grayson
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chad Stanton
Represented By: Anurima Bhargava
Represented By: Debo Adegbile
Represented By: Edward B. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Holly A. Thomas
Represented By: John Payton
Represented By: Joshua Civin
Represented By: Terry O. Tottenham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Black Student Alliance
Represented By: Anurima Bhargava
Represented By: Debo Adegbile
Represented By: Edward B. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Holly A. Thomas
Represented By: John Payton
Represented By: Joshua Civin
Represented By: Terry O. Tottenham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony D. Williams
Represented By: Anurima Bhargava
Represented By: Debo Adegbile
Represented By: Edward B. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Holly A. Thomas
Represented By: John Payton
Represented By: Joshua Civin
Represented By: Terry O. Tottenham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ariel Cecil Barrett
Represented By: Anurima Bhargava
Represented By: Debo Adegbile
Represented By: Edward B. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Holly A. Thomas
Represented By: John Payton
Represented By: Joshua Civin
Represented By: Terry O. Tottenham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Devon Robertson
Represented By: Anurima Bhargava
Represented By: Debo Adegbile
Represented By: Edward B. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Holly A. Thomas
Represented By: John Payton
Represented By: Joshua Civin
Represented By: Terry O. Tottenham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trenton Stanton
Represented By: Anurima Bhargava
Represented By: Debo Adegbile
Represented By: Edward B. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Holly A. Thomas
Represented By: John Payton
Represented By: Joshua Civin
Represented By: Terry O. Tottenham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Tre Stanton
Represented By: Anurima Bhargava
Represented By: Debo Adegbile
Represented By: Edward B. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Holly A. Thomas
Represented By: John Payton
Represented By: Joshua Civin
Represented By: Terry O. Tottenham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sarah Cortez
Represented By: David G. Hinojosa
Represented By: Diego Manuel Bernal
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lawrence Longoria, Jr.
Represented By: David G. Hinojosa
Represented By: Diego Manuel Bernal
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nathan Bunch
Represented By: David G. Hinojosa
Represented By: Diego Manuel Bernal
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Longhorn League of United Latin American Citizens
Represented By: David G. Hinojosa
Represented By: Diego Manuel Bernal
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?