Fremantlemedia North America, Inc. v. Benelux Corporation et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Fremantlemedia North America, Inc.
Defendant: Benelux Corporation and Athanases Stamatopoulos
Case Number: 1:2008cv00908
Filed: December 16, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Trademark Office
County: Travis
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2009 Filing 12 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Motions No Longer Referred: MOTION to Dismiss 3 . Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
April 22, 2009 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) by Fremantlemedia North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Matheny, Anthony)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: MOTION to Dismiss filed by Benelux Corporation, Athanases Stamatopoulos. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. ORDERED that the parites are to submit to the Court a Proposed Scheduling Order... by 4/22/2009. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
February 6, 2009 Filing 6 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Fremantlemedia North America, Inc., re MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Benelux Corporation, Defendant Athanases Stamatopoulos (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Response, # 2 Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Response, # 3 Exhibit C to Plaintiff's Response, # 4 Exhibit D to Plaintiff's Response, # 5 Exhibit E to Plaintiff's Response, # 6 Proposed Order)(Matheny, Anthony)
January 26, 2009 Filing 5 ATTACHMENT by Benelux Corporation, Athanases Stamatopoulos. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order of Dismissal of Athanases Stamatopoulos)(George, James)
January 26, 2009 Filing 4 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to James William George: re MOTION to Dismiss 3 (td)
January 26, 2009 MOTION to Dismiss (contained within doc # 3 ) by Benelux Corporation, Athanases Stamatopoulos. (td)
January 26, 2009 Filing 3 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with jury demand by Benelux Corporation, Athanases Stamatopoulos.(George, James) Modified on 1/26/2009 to add text (td).
December 17, 2008 Filing 2 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office along with a copy of complaint. (mh2, )
December 16, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 100000575), filed by Fremantlemedia North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh2, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fremantlemedia North America, Inc. v. Benelux Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fremantlemedia North America, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony F. Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benelux Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athanases Stamatopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?