Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services et al v. Lakey et al Featured Case

Class action lawsuit filed over the Texas sonogram law requiring a woman who gets an abortion to first have the doctor performing the procedure do an ultrasound, show and describe detailed ultrasound images to her, and play the sound of the fetal heart for the patient.

Plaintiff: Alan Braid, M.D.
Defendant: County Attorney David Escamilla, David Lakey, M.D. and Mari Robinson
Unknown: Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services
Case Number: 1:2011cv00486
Filed: June 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Sam Sparks
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2012 Filing 123 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DISMISSING IN PART 97 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 115 Motion to Amend Complaint; GRANTING 117 Motion to Amend Complaint; GRANTING 119 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
February 3, 2012 Filing 121 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grigg, Richard)
January 20, 2012 Filing 120 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Oral Arguments heard on 1/20/2012 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(dm, )
January 20, 2012 Filing 119 MOTION to Amend Answer by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified text on 1/20/2012 (dm, ).
January 20, 2012 Filing 118 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson, re 117 CORRECTED MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, Plaintiff Alan Braid, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
January 19, 2012 Filing 117 CORRECTED MOTION to Amend Complaint by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint-Exhibit 1)(Grigg, Richard)
January 19, 2012 Filing 116 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 115 MOTION to Amend Complaint. (dm, )
January 18, 2012 Filing 115 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grigg, Richard)
January 17, 2012 Filing 114 Appeal Record Returned by USCA. (jk, )
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 USCA DECISION ON INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL VACATING district court AND REMANDING for further proceedings; re 70 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) filed by Mari Robinson, David Lakey, M.D., Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory, filed by Mari Robinson, David Lakey, M.D. (jk, )
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING 108 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
December 21, 2011 Filing 111 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson, re 100 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Declarations of Katharine Hill and Molly White filed by Plaintiff Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, Plaintiff Alan Braid, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
December 21, 2011 Filing 110 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson, re 94 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mari Robinson, David Lakey, M.D. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
December 21, 2011 Filing 109 ATTACHMENT proposed order to 108 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
December 21, 2011 Filing 108 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
December 21, 2011 Filing 107 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, re 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, Plaintiff Alan Braid, M.D. (Grigg, Richard)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER, ( Oral Arguments set for 1/20/2012 02:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks.). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
December 9, 2011 Filing 105 ATTACHMENT proposed order to 101 Response in Opposition to Motion by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING 98 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING 102 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
December 8, 2011 Filing 102 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
December 7, 2011 Filing 101 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson, re 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, Plaintiff Alan Braid, M.D. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
December 7, 2011 Filing 100 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Declarations of Katharine Hill and Molly White by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grigg, Richard)
December 7, 2011 Filing 99 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, re 94 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mari Robinson, David Lakey, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stanley K. Henshaw, Ph.D., # 2 Proposed Order)(Grigg, Richard)
December 7, 2011 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grigg, Richard)
November 10, 2011 Filing 97 CORRECTED MOTION for Summary Judgment by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING 91 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
November 8, 2011 Filing 95 ATTACHMENT proposed order to 94 MOTION for Summary Judgment by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
November 8, 2011 Text Order GRANTING 93 motion for leave to file their motion for summary judgment in excess of the page limit, entered by Judge Sam Sparks. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldm)
November 7, 2011 Filing 94 MOTION for Summary Judgment by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
November 7, 2011 Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
November 7, 2011 Filing 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Appendix Exhibit 1, # 3 Appendix Exhibit 2, # 4 Appendix Exhibit 3, # 5 Appendix Exhibit 4, # 6 Appendix Exhibit 5, # 7 Appendix Exhibit 6, # 8 Appendix Exhibit 7, # 9 Appendix Exhibit 8, # 10 Appendix Exhibit 9, # 11 Proposed Order)(Grigg, Richard)
November 7, 2011 Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grigg, Richard)
October 20, 2011 Filing 90 Acknowledgement Receipt for Record on Appeal by USCA-5TH. re 88 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (mh, )
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DENYING 76 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
October 4, 2011 Filing 88 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory,, (mh, )
September 28, 2011 Filing 87 Letter of transmittal from USCA received for Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory,, filed by Mari Robinson, David Lakey, M.D.. (mh, )
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER of USCA (certified copy) regarding re Interlocutory Notice of Appeal - the motion to stay the preliminary injunction is carried with the case. This appeal is expedited. (mh, )
September 26, 2011 Filing 85 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, re 76 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Mari Robinson, Defendant David Lakey, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grigg, Richard)
September 22, 2011 Filing 84 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, re 65 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Lakey and Robinson's Counterclaim Pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Lakey and Robinson's Counterclaim Pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Plaintiff Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, Plaintiff Alan Braid, M.D. (Grigg, Richard)
September 16, 2011 Filing 83 APPENDIX to Defendants David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson's 52 Supplemental Memorandum to 18 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 3 Order and 41 Supplemental Memorandum Amended Attachment # 1 (Appendix Response to plaintiffs' chart of challenged provisions). (Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified on 9/16/2011 to modify text (klw, ).
September 13, 2011 Filing 82 AMENDED ANSWER to 40 Amended Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by David Escamilla. (Casas, Elaine)
September 13, 2011 Filing 81 ANSWER to 40 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand DEFENDANT DAVID ESCAMILLA, TRAVIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S ORIGINAL ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND JURY DEMAND by David Escamilla.(Casas, Elaine)
September 13, 2011 Filing 78 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on September 1, 2011, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-916-5564. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 10/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/14/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2011. Appeal Record due by 9/28/2011. (Reznik, Lily)
September 12, 2011 Filing 80 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson for dates of 7/6/2011; 9/1/2011. Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing; Telephone Conference. Court Reporter: Lily Reznik. (dm, )
September 12, 2011 Filing 79 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 100011336 re Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory filed by Mari Robinson, David Lakey, M.D. (klw, )
September 12, 2011 Filing 77 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson, re 65 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Lakey and Robinson's Counterclaim Pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Lakey and Robinson's Counterclaim Pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Plaintiff Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, Plaintiff Alan Braid, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
September 12, 2011 Filing 76 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDERED that the parties shall file motions for summary judgment within Sixty (60) days of the entry of this order, and shall file responses within Thirty (30) days thereafter. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
September 2, 2011 Filing 73 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Grigg, Richard)
September 1, 2011 Filing 72 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Telephone Conference held on 9/1/2011. Statements from counsel heard. Party provided 60 days to file motions for summary judgment and 30 days for responses. If discovery is needed, parties should so state in their motions. Hearing concluded. Written order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(dm, )
August 31, 2011 Filing 71 RESPONSE to 67 Advisory to the Court by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Grigg, Richard)
August 30, 2011 NOTICE OF APPEAL following 70 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out Form DKT-13 (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (mh, )
August 30, 2011 Filing 70 INTERLOCUTORY Appeal of Order entered by District Judge 68 , 69 by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. No filing fee submitted (Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified on 8/31/2011 to correct docket entry(mh, ).
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER and PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw, )
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Plaintiffs' 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; GRANTING Plaintiff's 10 Motion to Certify Class and 42 Motion to Certify Class; DENYING Defendants' 26 Motion to Strike and 27 Motion to Strike and 28 Motion to Strike. DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Escamilla's 22 Motion to Dismiss. DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendants' 25 Motion to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw, )
August 29, 2011 Filing 67 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order State Defendants' Proposed Scheduling Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 29, 2011 Filing 66 Proposed Scheduling Order by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Grigg, Richard)
August 29, 2011 Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Lakey and Robinson's Counterclaim Pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(1) by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grigg, Richard)
August 29, 2011 Filing 64 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by David Escamilla DEFENDANT TRAVIS COUNTY ATTORNEY DAVID ESCAMILLA'S ADVISORY TO THE COURT REGARDING PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. (Casas, Elaine)
August 23, 2011 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by David Escamilla, re 49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) filed by Defendant David Escamilla DEFENDANT TRAVIS COUNTY ATTORNEY DAVID ESCAMILLA'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT (Casas, Elaine)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING 60 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
August 19, 2011 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Allan E. Parker. by The Justice Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Appendix, # 5 Appendix, # 6 Appendix, # 7 Appendix)(Parker, Allan)
August 12, 2011 Filing 59 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, re 49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) filed by Defendant David Escamilla (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Grigg, Richard)
August 12, 2011 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, re 42 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, Plaintiff Alan Braid, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Grigg, Richard)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING 55 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING 50 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
August 9, 2011 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Members of the Texas House of Representatives. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Brief Amicus Brief)(Adams, Noel) Modified text on 8/9/2011 (dm, ).
August 9, 2011 Notice of Correction: re 55 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION to Amend/Correct. ***PLEASE NOTE: These motions have been terminated. They were docketed in error. Motion filed is a Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Correction has been made on the docket.*** (dm, )
August 8, 2011 Filing 54 SUPPLEMENT to 50 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief of Senator Dan Patrick and Representative Sid Miller in Support of Defendants by Kelly J. Shackelford. by Sid Miller, Dan Patrick. (Mateer, Jeffrey)
August 8, 2011 Filing 53 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by David Escamilla concerning Amici Curiae Brief. (Casas, Elaine)
August 8, 2011 Notice of Correction: re 50 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief of Senator Dan Patrick and Representative Sid Miller in Support of Defendants by Kelly J. Shackelford. ***PLEASE NOTE: Senator Dan Patrick and Representative Sid Miller have been added as Amicus Parties and correction has been made regarding filers of Motion. Motion was filed by Amicus Parties, not Defendants.*** (dm, )
August 5, 2011 Filing 52 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to 18 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 30 Order, 41 Supplemental Memorandum,, by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Response to plaintiffs' chart of challenged provisions, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 5, 2011 Filing 51 ANSWER to 40 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson.(Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 5, 2011 Filing 50 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief of Senator Dan Patrick and Representative Sid Miller in Support of Defendants by Kelly J. Shackelford. by Sid Miller and Dan Patrick. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Sasser, Hiram) Modified on 8/5/2011 to correct filers (dm, ).
August 4, 2011 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) by David Escamilla. (Casas, Elaine)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING 45 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
August 1, 2011 Filing 47 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by David Escamilla, re 42 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, Plaintiff Alan Braid, M.D. Amended Response in Opposition (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Appendix 2, # 3 Appendix 3)(Casas, Elaine)
August 1, 2011 Filing 46 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by David Escamilla, re 42 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, Plaintiff Alan Braid, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix 1, # 2 Appendix Appendix 2, # 3 Appendix Appendix 3)(Casas, Elaine)
August 1, 2011 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by David Escamilla. (Casas, Elaine)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Julie Rikelman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
July 26, 2011 Filing 43 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Alan Grigg for Julie Rikelman ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-3806576) by on behalf of Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grigg, Richard)
July 22, 2011 Filing 42 MOTION to Certify Class by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Proposed Order, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Grigg, Richard)
July 21, 2011 Filing 41 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to 18 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Appendix, # 2 Second Declaration of Alan Braid, M.D., # 3 Declaration of Nada Stotland, M.D., M.P.H., # 4 Declaration of Fred Campbell, M.D., # 5 Declaration of Curtis Boyd, M.D., # 6 Declaration of Scott J. Spear, M.D., # 7 Declaration of David M. Davis, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Proposed Order, # 12 Certificate of Service)(Grigg, Richard)
July 21, 2011 Filing 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT against David Escamilla, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson amending 1 Complaint., filed by Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, Alan Braid, M.D.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Grigg, Richard)
July 21, 2011 Filing 39 SUPPLEMENT by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Alan Morris, # 2 Affidavit Marc Allen Connelly, # 3 Affidavit Scott M. Freshour, # 4 Affidavit Dr. Marie Anderson, # 5 Affidavit Katharine Hill, # 6 Affidavit Molly White, # 7 Supplement ACOG Comm. on Ethics, Op. 439, # 8 Supplement Ultrasound Imaging in Early Pregnancy, # 9 Supplement Monitoring Medical Abortion)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
July 21, 2011 Filing 38 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, re 28 MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Alan Braid, MD filed by Defendant Mari Robinson, Defendant David Lakey, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Grigg, Richard)
July 21, 2011 Filing 37 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, re 26 MOTION to Strike the Declaration of David A. Grimes, MD filed by Defendant Mari Robinson, Defendant David Lakey, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Grigg, Richard)
July 21, 2011 Filing 36 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, re 27 MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Ann Drapkin Lyerly, MD filed by Defendant Mari Robinson, Defendant David Lakey, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Grigg, Richard)
July 20, 2011 Filing 35 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on July 6, 2011, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-916-5564. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 8/10/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2011. (Reznik, Lily)
July 15, 2011 Filing 34 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to 32 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Grigg, Richard)
July 15, 2011 Filing 33 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 32 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (dm, )
July 15, 2011 Filing 32 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, re 22 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT TRAVIS COUNTY ATTORNEY DAVID ESCAMILLA'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant David Escamilla (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Grigg, Richard)
July 6, 2011 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Motion Hearing held on 7/6/2011 re 18 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, Alan Braid, M.D. Motion taken under advisement. Written order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(klw, )
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER for filing of supplements, briefs and responses regarding evidence, arguments and severability. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw, )
July 5, 2011 Filing 29 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson, re 18 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, Plaintiff Alan Braid, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Perkins, Daniel)
July 5, 2011 Filing 28 MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Alan Braid, MD by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perkins, Daniel)
July 5, 2011 Filing 27 MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Ann Drapkin Lyerly, MD by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perkins, Daniel)
July 5, 2011 Filing 26 MOTION to Strike the Declaration of David A. Grimes, MD by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perkins, Daniel)
July 5, 2011 Filing 25 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing- EMERGENCY by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perkins, Daniel)
July 5, 2011 Filing 24 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson.(Perkins, Daniel)
July 5, 2011 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, re 10 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, Plaintiff Alan Braid, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Grigg, Richard)
July 1, 2011 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT TRAVIS COUNTY ATTORNEY DAVID ESCAMILLA'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by David Escamilla. (Casas, Elaine)
July 1, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Franklin Mitchell on behalf of David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson (Mitchell, Jonathan)
July 1, 2011 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson, re 10 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, Plaintiff Alan Braid, M.D. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Hearing on 18 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2011 10:00 AM before Judge Sam Sparks.. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
June 30, 2011 Filing 18 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Facts Supporting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Declaration of David A. Grimes, M.D., # 3 Declaration of Anne Drapkin Lylerly, M.D., M.A., # 4 Declaration of Alan Braid, M.D., # 5 Proposed Order, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Grigg, Richard)
June 30, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arthur C. D'Andrea on behalf of David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson (D'Andrea, Arthur)
June 30, 2011 Filing 16 ***Document filed with wrong attachment, it will be re-filed.*** MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Facts Supporting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Declaration of David A. Grimes, M.D., # 3 Declaration of Anne Drapkin Lyerly, M.D., M.A., # 4 Declaration of Alan Braid, M.D., # 5 Proposed Order, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Grigg, Richard) Modified on 7/1/2011 (dm, ).
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jamie Levitt. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
June 21, 2011 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, Alan Braid, M.D.. Mari Robinson served on 6/14/2011, answer due 7/5/2011. (Grigg, Richard)
June 21, 2011 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, Alan Braid, M.D.. David Lakey, M.D. served on 6/14/2011, answer due 7/5/2011. (Grigg, Richard)
June 21, 2011 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, Alan Braid, M.D.. David Escamilla served on 6/14/2011, answer due 7/5/2011. (Grigg, Richard)
June 21, 2011 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Alan Grigg for Jamie A. Levitt ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-3722145) by on behalf of Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grigg, Richard)
June 17, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION to Certify Class by Alan Braid, M.D., Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Appendix, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Appendix, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Appendix, # 5 Proposed Order, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Grigg, Richard)
June 14, 2011 Text Order GRANTING 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bonnie Scott Jones. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Sam Sparks. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldm)
June 14, 2011 Text Order GRANTING 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Alexander Lawrence. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Sam Sparks. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldm)
June 14, 2011 Text Order GRANTING 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bebe Jill Anderson. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Sam Sparks. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldm)
June 13, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0542-3699135), filed by Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services, a class represented by Metropolitan OB-GYN, P.A., Alan Braid. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Grigg, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services et al v. Lakey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Braid, M.D.
Represented By: Bebe J. Anderson
Represented By: Richard Alan Grigg
Represented By: Susan L. Hays
Represented By: Bonnie Scott Jones
Represented By: J. Alexander Lawrence
Represented By: Jamie A. Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Attorney David Escamilla
Represented By: Elaine A. Casas
Represented By: Jennifer Kraber
Represented By: Sherine Elizabeth Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lakey, M.D.
Represented By: Arthur C. D'Andrea
Represented By: William T. Deane
Represented By: Jonathan Franklin Mitchell
Represented By: Daniel C. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mari Robinson
Represented By: Arthur C. D'Andrea
Represented By: William T. Deane
Represented By: Jonathan Franklin Mitchell
Represented By: Daniel C. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Texas Medical Providers Performing Abortion Services
Represented By: Metropolitan OB-GYN, P.A.; on behalf of itself and its patients seeking abortions
Represented By: Richard Alan Grigg
Represented By: Susan L. Hays
Represented By: Bonnie Scott Jones
Represented By: J. Alexander Lawrence
Represented By: Jamie A. Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?