Texas Department of Transportation v. Craig et al Featured Case

The Texas Dept. of Transportation files a trademark infringement lawsuit over a steamy romance novel titled "Don't Mess with Texas" against defendant book publishers and author Christie Craig:


Photo credit: Christie Craig

Plaintiff: Texas Department of Transportation
Defendant: Barnes & Noble, Inc., Christie Craig, Grand Central Publishing and Hachette Book Group USA
Case Number: 1:2011cv00726
Filed: August 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Sam Sparks
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING 2 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
August 22, 2011 Filing 6 EXHIBITS by Barnes & Noble, Inc., Christie Craig, Grand Central Publishing, Hachette Book Group USA.. (dm, )
August 22, 2011 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Motion Hearing held on 8/22/2011 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Texas Department of Transportation. Court denied motion without prejudice to refiling. Written order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(dm, )
August 22, 2011 Filing 4 Report on Trademark and copy of complaint minus exhibits sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tdk, )
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, Set Motion Hearing for 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ( Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2011 01:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks.). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
August 19, 2011 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Texas Department of Transportation contained within complaint. (tdk, )
August 19, 2011 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Texas Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goetzel, Dwayne)
August 19, 2011 Case Assigned to Judge Sam Sparks. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (tdk, )
August 19, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0542-3872212). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Texas Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goetzel, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Department of Transportation v. Craig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christie Craig
Represented By: Robert M. Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Central Publishing
Represented By: Robert M. Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hachette Book Group USA
Represented By: Robert M. Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Department of Transportation
Represented By: Dwayne K. Goetzel
Represented By: Eric B. Meyertons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?